Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2773003

EP2773003 - Pinch detection apparatus for opening-and-closing member, and opening-and-closing member apparatus [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  12.02.2016
Database last updated on 22.05.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip12.02.2016Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 16.03.2016  [2016/11]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
AISIN SEIKI KABUSHIKI KAISHA
1, Asahi-machi, 2-chome
Kariya-shi, Aichi 448-8650 / JP
[2014/36]
Inventor(s)01 / Bessho, Nobuyasu
c/o AISIN SEIKI KABUSHIKI KAISHA, Intellectual
Property Department
1, Asahi-machi 2-chome
Kariya-shi, Aichi 448-8650 / JP
02 / Maeda, Toshiro
c/o AISIN SEIKI KABUSHIKI KAISHA, Intellectual
Property Department
1, Asahi-machi 2-chome
Kariya-shi, Aichi 448-8650 / JP
03 / Yuasa, Daisuke
c/o AISIN SEIKI KABUSHIKI KAISHA, Intellectual
Property Department
1, Asahi-machi 2-chome
Kariya-shi, Aichi 448-8650 / JP
 [2014/36]
Representative(s)TBK
Bavariaring 4-6
80336 München / DE
[2014/36]
Application number, filing date13194777.228.11.2013
[2014/36]
Priority number, dateJP2013003855128.02.2013         Original published format: JP 2013038551
[2014/36]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2773003
Date:03.09.2014
Language:EN
[2014/36]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP05.06.2014
ClassificationInternational:H02H7/085, E05F15/00
[2014/36]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2014/36]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
TitleGerman:Einklemmerfassungsvorrichtung für Öffnungs- und Schliesselement sowie Öffnungs- und Schliesselementvorrichtung[2014/36]
English:Pinch detection apparatus for opening-and-closing member, and opening-and-closing member apparatus[2014/36]
French:Appareil de détection de pincement pour élément d'ouverture et de fermeture, et dispositif avec élément d'ouverture et de fermeture[2014/36]
Examination procedure11.12.2014Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
11.12.2014Examination requested  [2015/04]
02.06.2015Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
13.10.2015Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2016/11]
10.11.2015Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time  [2016/11]
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  02.06.2015
Fees paidPenalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
30.11.201503   M06   Not yet paid
Documents cited:Search[X]US2004124801  (JURADO CARLOS [US], et al) [X] 1-5,8-10 * paragraphs [0052] - [0065] - [0080] - [0091]; figures 24-26 *;
 [I]US5585702  (JACKSON JAMES A [US], et al) [I] 1,2,6,7 * column 1, line 21 - column 5, line 54; figures 1-5 *
by applicantJP3931732B
 JP2010110171