Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2712547

EP2712547 - Integrated system for intravascular placement of a catheter [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  05.08.2016
Database last updated on 24.02.2020
Most recent event   Tooltip05.10.2018Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): TR
published on 07.11.2018  [2018/45]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
C. R. BARD, INC.
730 Central Avenue
Murray Hill, NJ 07974 / US
[2014/14]
Inventor(s)01 / Messerly, Shayne
172 East 650 South
UT, 84037 Kaysville / US
02 / Cox, Jeremy B.
685 Eighth Avenue
UT, 84103 Salt Lake City / US
03 / Misener, Anthony K.
298 South 800 East
UT, 84010 Bountiful / US
04 / Breiter, Catherine C.
2919 Kentucky Avenue
UT, 84117 Holladay / US
05 / Lemon, Ryan R.
7693 S. Mountain Estates Drive
UT, 84121 Cottonwood Heights / US
06 / Cook, Christian W.
6948 W. 7895 S.
Utah, 84081 West Jordan / US
07 / Bown, Matthew W.
1071 West 1850 North
UT, 84087 West Bountiful / US
08 / Burnside, Eddie K.
3107 Crestview Circle
UT, 84010 Bountiful / US
09 / Christian, Kelly J.
14611 Chaumont Court
UT, 84020 Draper / US
10 / Orome, Amir
2452 East Cliff Swallow Drive
UT, 84093 Sandy / US
11 / Stats, Jason R.
1752 West 250 North
UT, 84041 Layton / US
 [2014/17]
Representative(s)Hoffmann Eitle
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB
Arabellastraße 30
81925 München / DE
[2015/40]
Former [2014/14]HOFFMANN EITLE
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte
Arabellastrasse 4
81925 München / DE
Application number, filing date13194818.425.11.2008
[2014/14]
Priority number, dateUS20070990242P26.11.2007         Original published format: US 990242 P
US20080045944P17.04.2008         Original published format: US 45944 P
US20080091233P22.08.2008         Original published format: US 91233 P
US20080095451P09.09.2008         Original published format: US 95451 P
US20080095921P10.09.2008         Original published format: US 95921 P
[2014/14]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2712547
Date:02.04.2014
Language:EN
[2014/14]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2712547
Date:30.09.2015
Language:EN
[2015/40]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP28.02.2014
ClassificationInternational:A61B5/06, A61B19/00, A61B5/042, // A61B8/08, A61B19/08
[2014/14]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2015/40]
Former [2014/14]AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  HR,  HU,  IE,  IS,  IT,  LI,  LT,  LU,  LV,  MC,  MT,  NL,  NO,  PL,  PT,  RO,  SE,  SI,  SK,  TR 
TitleGerman:Integriertes System zur intravaskulären Platzierung eines Katheters[2014/14]
English:Integrated system for intravascular placement of a catheter[2014/14]
French:Système intégré de placement intravasculaire d'un cathéter[2014/14]
Examination procedure27.05.2014Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
29.07.2014Examination requested  [2014/36]
24.04.2015Communication of intention to grant the patent
18.08.2015Fee for grant paid
18.08.2015Fee for publishing/printing paid
18.08.2015Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Parent application(s)   TooltipEP08855396.1  / EP2219526
Divisional application(s)EP15179061.5  / EP2992825
EP17157118.5  / EP3202318
Opposition(s)01.07.2016No opposition filed within time limit [2016/36]
Fees paidRenewal fee
28.11.2013Renewal fee patent year 03
28.11.2013Renewal fee patent year 04
28.11.2013Renewal fee patent year 05
28.11.2013Renewal fee patent year 06
10.03.2015Renewal fee patent year 07
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
30.11.201407   M06   Fee paid on   10.03.2015
Lapses during opposition  TooltipHU25.11.2008
AT30.09.2015
BE30.09.2015
BG30.09.2015
CY30.09.2015
CZ30.09.2015
DK30.09.2015
EE30.09.2015
FI30.09.2015
HR30.09.2015
LT30.09.2015
LV30.09.2015
MC30.09.2015
MT30.09.2015
NL30.09.2015
PL30.09.2015
RO30.09.2015
SE30.09.2015
SI30.09.2015
SK30.09.2015
TR30.09.2015
IE25.11.2015
LU25.11.2015
CH30.11.2015
LI30.11.2015
NO30.12.2015
GR31.12.2015
IS30.01.2016
PT01.02.2016
[2018/45]
Former [2017/39]HU25.11.2008
AT30.09.2015
BE30.09.2015
BG30.09.2015
CY30.09.2015
CZ30.09.2015
DK30.09.2015
EE30.09.2015
FI30.09.2015
HR30.09.2015
LT30.09.2015
LV30.09.2015
MC30.09.2015
MT30.09.2015
NL30.09.2015
PL30.09.2015
RO30.09.2015
SE30.09.2015
SI30.09.2015
SK30.09.2015
IE25.11.2015
LU25.11.2015
CH30.11.2015
LI30.11.2015
NO30.12.2015
GR31.12.2015
IS30.01.2016
PT01.02.2016
Former [2017/03]AT30.09.2015
BE30.09.2015
CZ30.09.2015
DK30.09.2015
EE30.09.2015
FI30.09.2015
HR30.09.2015
LT30.09.2015
LV30.09.2015
MC30.09.2015
NL30.09.2015
PL30.09.2015
RO30.09.2015
SE30.09.2015
SI30.09.2015
SK30.09.2015
IE25.11.2015
LU25.11.2015
CH30.11.2015
LI30.11.2015
NO30.12.2015
GR31.12.2015
IS30.01.2016
PT01.02.2016
Former [2016/49]AT30.09.2015
CZ30.09.2015
DK30.09.2015
EE30.09.2015
FI30.09.2015
HR30.09.2015
LT30.09.2015
LV30.09.2015
MC30.09.2015
NL30.09.2015
PL30.09.2015
RO30.09.2015
SE30.09.2015
SI30.09.2015
SK30.09.2015
IE25.11.2015
LU25.11.2015
CH30.11.2015
LI30.11.2015
NO30.12.2015
GR31.12.2015
IS30.01.2016
PT01.02.2016
Former [2016/45]AT30.09.2015
CZ30.09.2015
DK30.09.2015
EE30.09.2015
FI30.09.2015
HR30.09.2015
LT30.09.2015
LV30.09.2015
MC30.09.2015
NL30.09.2015
PL30.09.2015
RO30.09.2015
SE30.09.2015
SK30.09.2015
IE25.11.2015
LU25.11.2015
CH30.11.2015
LI30.11.2015
NO30.12.2015
GR31.12.2015
IS30.01.2016
PT01.02.2016
Former [2016/39]AT30.09.2015
CZ30.09.2015
DK30.09.2015
EE30.09.2015
FI30.09.2015
HR30.09.2015
LT30.09.2015
LV30.09.2015
MC30.09.2015
NL30.09.2015
PL30.09.2015
RO30.09.2015
SE30.09.2015
SK30.09.2015
LU25.11.2015
CH30.11.2015
LI30.11.2015
NO30.12.2015
GR31.12.2015
IS30.01.2016
PT01.02.2016
Former [2016/34]AT30.09.2015
CZ30.09.2015
EE30.09.2015
FI30.09.2015
HR30.09.2015
LT30.09.2015
LV30.09.2015
MC30.09.2015
NL30.09.2015
PL30.09.2015
RO30.09.2015
SE30.09.2015
SK30.09.2015
LU25.11.2015
CH30.11.2015
LI30.11.2015
NO30.12.2015
GR31.12.2015
IS30.01.2016
PT01.02.2016
Former [2016/31]AT30.09.2015
CZ30.09.2015
EE30.09.2015
FI30.09.2015
HR30.09.2015
LT30.09.2015
LV30.09.2015
MC30.09.2015
NL30.09.2015
PL30.09.2015
RO30.09.2015
SE30.09.2015
SK30.09.2015
LU25.11.2015
NO30.12.2015
GR31.12.2015
IS30.01.2016
PT01.02.2016
Former [2016/28]AT30.09.2015
CZ30.09.2015
EE30.09.2015
FI30.09.2015
HR30.09.2015
LT30.09.2015
LV30.09.2015
MC30.09.2015
NL30.09.2015
PL30.09.2015
RO30.09.2015
SE30.09.2015
SK30.09.2015
NO30.12.2015
GR31.12.2015
IS30.01.2016
PT01.02.2016
Former [2016/24]AT30.09.2015
CZ30.09.2015
EE30.09.2015
FI30.09.2015
HR30.09.2015
LT30.09.2015
LV30.09.2015
NL30.09.2015
PL30.09.2015
RO30.09.2015
SE30.09.2015
SK30.09.2015
NO30.12.2015
GR31.12.2015
IS30.01.2016
PT01.02.2016
Former [2016/23]CZ30.09.2015
EE30.09.2015
FI30.09.2015
HR30.09.2015
LT30.09.2015
LV30.09.2015
NL30.09.2015
RO30.09.2015
SE30.09.2015
SK30.09.2015
NO30.12.2015
GR31.12.2015
IS30.01.2016
Former [2016/22]CZ30.09.2015
EE30.09.2015
FI30.09.2015
HR30.09.2015
LT30.09.2015
LV30.09.2015
NL30.09.2015
SE30.09.2015
NO30.12.2015
GR31.12.2015
IS30.01.2016
Former [2016/10]FI30.09.2015
HR30.09.2015
LT30.09.2015
LV30.09.2015
SE30.09.2015
NO30.12.2015
GR31.12.2015
Former [2016/09]FI30.09.2015
LT30.09.2015
LV30.09.2015
NO30.12.2015
GR31.12.2015
Former [2016/08]LT30.09.2015
NO30.12.2015
Former [2016/07]LT30.09.2015
Documents cited:Search[A]US2006173407  (SHAUGHNESSY MICHAEL C [US], et al) [A] 1,2,4,7 * abstract * * paragraph [0046] - paragraph [0048] * * paragraph [0056] - paragraph [0072] * * figures 1,2,4,14,16,18,21-24 *;
 [A]US5243995  (MAIER HANS O [DE]) [A] 1-5 * abstract * * column 1, line 65 - column 4, line 29 * * figure 1 *;
 [A]EP1504713  (SURGICAL NAVIGATION TECH [US]) [A] 1,2,7,8 * abstract * * paragraph [0015] * * paragraph [0022] * * paragraph [0141] - paragraph [0144] * * figure 20 *;
 [A]EP0928976  (IBM [US]) [A] 1,2,7,8 * abstract * * paragraph [0001] - paragraph [0031] * * paragraph [0044] - paragraph [0049] * * figure 1A *;
 [A]US2007265526  (GOVARI ASSAF [IL], et al) [A] 1,2,7 * the whole document *;
 [A]US2007225610  (MICKLEY TIMOTHY J [US], et al) [A] 1,2,12 * abstract * * paragraph [0021] - paragraph [0032] * * figure 1 *;
 [A]US6132368  (COOPER THOMAS G [US]) [A] 1,12 * abstract * * column 7, line 12 - line 42 * * figures 3A-B *
by applicantUS5775322
 US5879297
 US6129668
 US6216028
 US6263230
 US5099845
 US20060466602