EP2878322 - Needle cap remover and drug delivery device [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 04.11.2015 Database last updated on 23.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.11.2015 | Refusal of application | published on 02.12.2015 [2015/49] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Sanofi-Aventis Deutschland GmbH Brüningstrasse 50 65929 Frankfurt am Main / DE | [2015/23] | Application number, filing date | 13194895.2 | 28.11.2013 | [2015/23] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2878322 | Date: | 03.06.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/23] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 06.08.2014 | Classification | IPC: | A61M5/32 | [2015/23] | CPC: |
A61M5/3204 (EP,US);
A61M5/3257 (US);
A61M2005/3267 (EP,US);
A61M5/326 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2015/23] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Nadelkappenabzieher und Arzneimittelabgabevorrichtung | [2015/23] | English: | Needle cap remover and drug delivery device | [2015/23] | French: | Extracteur de bouchon d'aiguille et dispositif d'administration de médicament | [2015/23] | Examination procedure | 28.11.2013 | Examination requested [2015/23] | 22.06.2015 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: Examination on filing A.90(5) [2015/49] | 02.07.2015 | Application refused, date of legal effect [2015/49] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US4636201 (AMBROSE WILLIAM A [US], et al) [X] 1-3,11 * figure - * * column 3, lines 11-13, 28-53 *; | [X]WO2012073032 (OVAL MEDICAL TECHNOLOGIES LTD [GB], et al) [X] 1-4,11 * figure 1a * * page 8, line 29 - page 9, line 2 * * page 11, line 12 - page 11, line 18 *; | [X]US2010069846 (STAMP KEVIN [GB]) [X] 1,11 * figures 9, 10 * * paragraphs [0098] - [0105] - [ 145] * * claim 13 *; | [X]US2007265568 (TSALS IZRAIL [US], et al) [X] 1,11 * figures 1, 2 * * paragraphs [0043] , [0 51] , [0 62] , [0 63] * * claim 11 * |