Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2750350

EP2750350 - System and method for deploying preconfigured software [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  02.02.2018
Database last updated on 16.11.2019
FormerThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  24.02.2017
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  14.02.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip15.11.2019Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): MK
published on 18.12.2019 [2019/51]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
AO Kaspersky Lab
39A/3 Leningradskoe Shosse
Moscow 125212 / RU
[2016/32]
Former [2014/27]For all designated states
Kaspersky Lab, ZAO
39A/3 Leningradskoe Shosse
Moscow 125212 / RU
Inventor(s)01 / Voronkov, Konstantin P.
c/o Kaspersky Lab ZAO
39A/3 Leningradskoe shosse
125212 Moscow / RU
02 / Deshevykh, Stepan N.
c/o Kaspersky Lab ZAO
39A/3 Leningradskoe shosse
125212 Moscow / RU
03 / Yablokov, Victor V.
c/o Kaspersky Lab ZAO
39A/3 Leningradskoe shosse
125212 Moscow / RU
 [2014/27]
Representative(s)Prock, Thomas
Marks & Clerk LLP
15 Fetter Lane
London EC4A 1BW / GB
[N/P]
Former [2014/27]Prock, Thomas
Marks & Clerk LLP
90 Long Acre
London WC2E 9RA / GB
Application number, filing date13195208.729.11.2013
[2014/27]
Priority number, dateRU2012015644925.12.2012         Original published format: RU 2012156449
US20131385179127.03.2013         Original published format: US201313851791
[2014/27]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2750350
Date:02.07.2014
Language:EN
[2014/27]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2750350
Date:29.03.2017
Language:EN
[2017/13]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP25.02.2014
ClassificationInternational:H04L29/06, H04L29/08, G06F9/445, // H04W12/12
[2014/27]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2014/27]
TitleGerman:System und Verfahren zur Anwendung vorkonfigurierter Software[2014/27]
English:System and method for deploying preconfigured software[2014/27]
French:Système et procédé de déploiement de logiciel préconfiguré[2014/27]
Examination procedure03.12.2013Examination requested  [2014/27]
05.01.2015Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
05.10.2016Communication of intention to grant the patent
14.02.2017Fee for grant paid
14.02.2017Fee for publishing/printing paid
14.02.2017Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  05.10.2016
Opposition(s)03.01.2018No opposition filed within time limit [2018/10]
Fees paidRenewal fee
30.11.2015Renewal fee patent year 03
28.11.2016Renewal fee patent year 04
Lapses during opposition  TooltipHU29.11.2013
AT29.03.2017
CY29.03.2017
CZ29.03.2017
DK29.03.2017
EE29.03.2017
ES29.03.2017
FI29.03.2017
HR29.03.2017
IT29.03.2017
LT29.03.2017
LV29.03.2017
MC29.03.2017
MK29.03.2017
NL29.03.2017
PL29.03.2017
RO29.03.2017
RS29.03.2017
SE29.03.2017
SI29.03.2017
SK29.03.2017
SM29.03.2017
BG29.06.2017
NO29.06.2017
GR30.06.2017
IS29.07.2017
PT31.07.2017
IE29.11.2017
LU29.11.2017
MT29.11.2017
BE30.11.2017
CH30.11.2017
LI30.11.2017
[2019/51]
Former [2019/46]HU29.11.2013
AT29.03.2017
CY29.03.2017
CZ29.03.2017
DK29.03.2017
EE29.03.2017
ES29.03.2017
FI29.03.2017
HR29.03.2017
IT29.03.2017
LT29.03.2017
LV29.03.2017
MC29.03.2017
NL29.03.2017
PL29.03.2017
RO29.03.2017
RS29.03.2017
SE29.03.2017
SI29.03.2017
SK29.03.2017
SM29.03.2017
BG29.06.2017
NO29.06.2017
GR30.06.2017
IS29.07.2017
PT31.07.2017
IE29.11.2017
LU29.11.2017
MT29.11.2017
BE30.11.2017
CH30.11.2017
LI30.11.2017
Former [2019/31]HU29.11.2013
AT29.03.2017
CZ29.03.2017
DK29.03.2017
EE29.03.2017
ES29.03.2017
FI29.03.2017
HR29.03.2017
IT29.03.2017
LT29.03.2017
LV29.03.2017
MC29.03.2017
NL29.03.2017
PL29.03.2017
RO29.03.2017
RS29.03.2017
SE29.03.2017
SI29.03.2017
SK29.03.2017
SM29.03.2017
BG29.06.2017
NO29.06.2017
GR30.06.2017
IS29.07.2017
PT31.07.2017
IE29.11.2017
LU29.11.2017
MT29.11.2017
BE30.11.2017
CH30.11.2017
LI30.11.2017
Former [2018/50]AT29.03.2017
CZ29.03.2017
DK29.03.2017
EE29.03.2017
ES29.03.2017
FI29.03.2017
HR29.03.2017
IT29.03.2017
LT29.03.2017
LV29.03.2017
MC29.03.2017
NL29.03.2017
PL29.03.2017
RO29.03.2017
RS29.03.2017
SE29.03.2017
SI29.03.2017
SK29.03.2017
SM29.03.2017
BG29.06.2017
NO29.06.2017
GR30.06.2017
IS29.07.2017
PT31.07.2017
IE29.11.2017
LU29.11.2017
MT29.11.2017
BE30.11.2017
CH30.11.2017
LI30.11.2017
Former [2018/45]AT29.03.2017
CZ29.03.2017
DK29.03.2017
EE29.03.2017
ES29.03.2017
FI29.03.2017
HR29.03.2017
IT29.03.2017
LT29.03.2017
LV29.03.2017
MC29.03.2017
NL29.03.2017
PL29.03.2017
RO29.03.2017
RS29.03.2017
SE29.03.2017
SI29.03.2017
SK29.03.2017
SM29.03.2017
BG29.06.2017
NO29.06.2017
GR30.06.2017
IS29.07.2017
PT31.07.2017
IE29.11.2017
LU29.11.2017
MT29.11.2017
CH30.11.2017
LI30.11.2017
Former [2018/43]AT29.03.2017
CZ29.03.2017
DK29.03.2017
EE29.03.2017
ES29.03.2017
FI29.03.2017
HR29.03.2017
IT29.03.2017
LT29.03.2017
LV29.03.2017
MC29.03.2017
NL29.03.2017
PL29.03.2017
RO29.03.2017
RS29.03.2017
SE29.03.2017
SI29.03.2017
SK29.03.2017
SM29.03.2017
BG29.06.2017
NO29.06.2017
GR30.06.2017
IS29.07.2017
PT31.07.2017
LU29.11.2017
MT29.11.2017
CH30.11.2017
LI30.11.2017
Former [2018/41]AT29.03.2017
CZ29.03.2017
DK29.03.2017
EE29.03.2017
ES29.03.2017
FI29.03.2017
HR29.03.2017
IT29.03.2017
LT29.03.2017
LV29.03.2017
MC29.03.2017
NL29.03.2017
PL29.03.2017
RO29.03.2017
RS29.03.2017
SE29.03.2017
SI29.03.2017
SK29.03.2017
SM29.03.2017
BG29.06.2017
NO29.06.2017
GR30.06.2017
IS29.07.2017
PT31.07.2017
LU29.11.2017
CH30.11.2017
LI30.11.2017
Former [2018/33]AT29.03.2017
CZ29.03.2017
DK29.03.2017
EE29.03.2017
ES29.03.2017
FI29.03.2017
HR29.03.2017
IT29.03.2017
LT29.03.2017
LV29.03.2017
MC29.03.2017
NL29.03.2017
PL29.03.2017
RO29.03.2017
RS29.03.2017
SE29.03.2017
SI29.03.2017
SK29.03.2017
SM29.03.2017
BG29.06.2017
NO29.06.2017
GR30.06.2017
IS29.07.2017
PT31.07.2017
CH30.11.2017
LI30.11.2017
Former [2018/25]AT29.03.2017
CZ29.03.2017
DK29.03.2017
EE29.03.2017
ES29.03.2017
FI29.03.2017
HR29.03.2017
IT29.03.2017
LT29.03.2017
LV29.03.2017
NL29.03.2017
PL29.03.2017
RO29.03.2017
RS29.03.2017
SE29.03.2017
SI29.03.2017
SK29.03.2017
SM29.03.2017
BG29.06.2017
NO29.06.2017
GR30.06.2017
IS29.07.2017
PT31.07.2017
Former [2018/09]AT29.03.2017
CZ29.03.2017
DK29.03.2017
EE29.03.2017
ES29.03.2017
FI29.03.2017
HR29.03.2017
IT29.03.2017
LT29.03.2017
LV29.03.2017
NL29.03.2017
PL29.03.2017
RO29.03.2017
RS29.03.2017
SE29.03.2017
SK29.03.2017
SM29.03.2017
BG29.06.2017
NO29.06.2017
GR30.06.2017
IS29.07.2017
PT31.07.2017
Former [2017/51]AT29.03.2017
CZ29.03.2017
EE29.03.2017
ES29.03.2017
FI29.03.2017
HR29.03.2017
IT29.03.2017
LT29.03.2017
LV29.03.2017
NL29.03.2017
PL29.03.2017
RO29.03.2017
RS29.03.2017
SE29.03.2017
SK29.03.2017
SM29.03.2017
BG29.06.2017
NO29.06.2017
GR30.06.2017
IS29.07.2017
PT31.07.2017
Former [2017/50]AT29.03.2017
CZ29.03.2017
EE29.03.2017
ES29.03.2017
FI29.03.2017
HR29.03.2017
IT29.03.2017
LT29.03.2017
LV29.03.2017
NL29.03.2017
PL29.03.2017
RO29.03.2017
RS29.03.2017
SE29.03.2017
SK29.03.2017
BG29.06.2017
NO29.06.2017
GR30.06.2017
IS29.07.2017
Former [2017/49]AT29.03.2017
CZ29.03.2017
EE29.03.2017
ES29.03.2017
FI29.03.2017
HR29.03.2017
IT29.03.2017
LT29.03.2017
LV29.03.2017
NL29.03.2017
RO29.03.2017
RS29.03.2017
SE29.03.2017
SK29.03.2017
BG29.06.2017
NO29.06.2017
GR30.06.2017
IS29.07.2017
Former [2017/48]CZ29.03.2017
FI29.03.2017
HR29.03.2017
LT29.03.2017
LV29.03.2017
NL29.03.2017
RS29.03.2017
SE29.03.2017
BG29.06.2017
NO29.06.2017
GR30.06.2017
Former [2017/41]FI29.03.2017
HR29.03.2017
LT29.03.2017
LV29.03.2017
NL29.03.2017
RS29.03.2017
SE29.03.2017
BG29.06.2017
NO29.06.2017
GR30.06.2017
Documents cited:Search[I]US2007157288  (LIM KENG [US]) [I] 1-15 * figures 6,14 * * paragraphs [0048] , [0065] , [0069] * * paragraphs [0446] - [0447] * * paragraphs [0087] , [0091] , [0098] * * paragraphs [0103] , [0444] , [0446] - [0447] * * paragraphs [0449] , [0458] , [0460] * * paragraphs [0469] - [0480] - [0482] *;
 [A]US2012284704  (FRIEDMAN ROBERT U [US], et al) [A] 1-15 * figure 2 * * paragraphs [0012] , [0016] , [0063] * * paragraphs [0064] , [0065] , [0096] * * paragraph [0097] *;
 [A]US8131281  (HILDNER STEVEN [US], et al) [A] 1-15 * abstract * * figures 3A,6 * * paragraphs [0005] , [0006] , [0010] - [0012] * * paragraphs [0030] , [0031] , [0035] * * paragraphs [0054] , [0056] , [0077] * * paragraphs [0082] , [0109] , [0124] *;
 [A]US2012311659  (NARAIN ARVIND [US], et al) [A] 1-15 * figures 3,4 * * page 11, line 25 - page 12, line 14 * * page 13, line 1 - line 4 * * page 13, line 50 - page 14, line 61 * * page 15, line 3 - line 33 * * page 25, line 6 - line 41 * * page 27, line 4 - line 30 *;
 [A]US7996879  (FANG CHAO [CN], et al) [A] 1-15 * column 4, line 17 - line 34 * * column 8, line 40 - line 66 *
by applicantUS8181253