Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2881236

EP2881236 - Molding machine for making thermoplastic composites [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  30.12.2018
Database last updated on 13.12.2019
FormerThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  19.01.2018
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  02.08.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip30.08.2019Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): MC
published on 02.10.2019  [2019/40]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Chaei Hsin Enterprise Co., Ltd.
No.208-22, Jhongcing Rd.
Situn District
40761 Taichung City / TW
[2015/24]
Inventor(s)01 / Wang, Shui Mu
No.208-22, Jhongcing Rd., Situn District
40761 Taichung City / TW
 [2015/24]
Representative(s)Cabinet Chaillot
16/20, avenue de l'Agent Sarre
B.P. 74
92703 Colombes Cedex / FR
[N/P]
Former [2015/24]Chaillot, Geneviève
Cabinet Chaillot 16-20 Avenue de l'Agent Sarre B.P. 74
92703 Colombes Cedex / FR
Application number, filing date13195959.505.12.2013
[2015/24]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2881236
Date:10.06.2015
Language:EN
[2015/24]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2881236
Date:21.02.2018
Language:EN
[2018/08]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP03.06.2014
ClassificationInternational:B29C51/36, B29C51/14, B29L31/50, // B29C70/68, B29C51/40, B29D35/14, B29C43/36
[2017/31]
Former International [2015/24]B29C51/36, B29C51/14, // B29C70/68, B29C51/40, B29D35/14
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2015/24]
TitleGerman:Pressformmaschine zur Herstellung thermoplastischer Verbundwerkstoffe[2015/24]
English:Molding machine for making thermoplastic composites[2015/24]
French:Machine de moulage permettant de fabriquer des composites thermoplastiques[2015/24]
Examination procedure24.12.2013Examination requested  [2015/24]
16.02.2015Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
03.08.2017Communication of intention to grant the patent
21.09.2017Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
04.12.2017Fee for grant paid
04.12.2017Fee for publishing/printing paid
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  03.08.2017
Opposition(s)22.11.2018No opposition filed within time limit [2019/05]
Fees paidRenewal fee
31.12.2015Renewal fee patent year 03
31.12.2016Renewal fee patent year 04
01.01.2018Renewal fee patent year 05
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAL21.02.2018
AT21.02.2018
CY21.02.2018
CZ21.02.2018
DK21.02.2018
EE21.02.2018
FI21.02.2018
HR21.02.2018
LT21.02.2018
LV21.02.2018
MC21.02.2018
RO21.02.2018
RS21.02.2018
SE21.02.2018
SI21.02.2018
SK21.02.2018
SM21.02.2018
BG21.05.2018
NO21.05.2018
GR22.05.2018
[2019/40]
Former [2019/13]AL21.02.2018
AT21.02.2018
CY21.02.2018
CZ21.02.2018
DK21.02.2018
EE21.02.2018
FI21.02.2018
HR21.02.2018
LT21.02.2018
LV21.02.2018
RO21.02.2018
RS21.02.2018
SE21.02.2018
SI21.02.2018
SK21.02.2018
SM21.02.2018
BG21.05.2018
NO21.05.2018
GR22.05.2018
Former [2018/52]AL21.02.2018
AT21.02.2018
CY21.02.2018
CZ21.02.2018
DK21.02.2018
EE21.02.2018
FI21.02.2018
HR21.02.2018
LT21.02.2018
LV21.02.2018
RO21.02.2018
RS21.02.2018
SE21.02.2018
SK21.02.2018
SM21.02.2018
BG21.05.2018
NO21.05.2018
GR22.05.2018
Former [2018/51]AL21.02.2018
AT21.02.2018
CY21.02.2018
CZ21.02.2018
DK21.02.2018
EE21.02.2018
FI21.02.2018
HR21.02.2018
LT21.02.2018
LV21.02.2018
RO21.02.2018
RS21.02.2018
SE21.02.2018
SK21.02.2018
BG21.05.2018
NO21.05.2018
GR22.05.2018
Former [2018/50]AL21.02.2018
AT21.02.2018
CY21.02.2018
CZ21.02.2018
EE21.02.2018
FI21.02.2018
HR21.02.2018
LT21.02.2018
LV21.02.2018
RO21.02.2018
RS21.02.2018
SE21.02.2018
SK21.02.2018
BG21.05.2018
NO21.05.2018
GR22.05.2018
Former [2018/46]AL21.02.2018
AT21.02.2018
CY21.02.2018
FI21.02.2018
HR21.02.2018
LT21.02.2018
LV21.02.2018
RS21.02.2018
SE21.02.2018
BG21.05.2018
NO21.05.2018
GR22.05.2018
Former [2018/40]AT21.02.2018
CY21.02.2018
FI21.02.2018
HR21.02.2018
LT21.02.2018
LV21.02.2018
RS21.02.2018
SE21.02.2018
BG21.05.2018
NO21.05.2018
GR22.05.2018
Former [2018/37]CY21.02.2018
FI21.02.2018
HR21.02.2018
LT21.02.2018
NO21.05.2018
GR22.05.2018
Former [2018/35]CY21.02.2018
FI21.02.2018
HR21.02.2018
LT21.02.2018
NO21.05.2018
Cited inInternational search[I]US4740417  (TORNERO ROGER [US]) [I] 1-7 * column 3, line 53 - column 5, line 56; figures 2A-2D *
 [A]WO2011159240  (PAKIT INT TRADING CO INC [BB]; NILSSON BJOERN [SE]) [A] 1-7 * page 6, line 30 - page 9, line 31; figures 1-3c *
 [A]US2007102843  (WAATTI TODD A [US]) [A] 1 * paragraph [0027]; figure 2 *
 [A]US2008093753  (SCHUETZ MARK [US]) [A] 1 * paragraphs [0021] - [0029]; figure . *
 [A]EP2103420  (VERTEX L L C [US]) [A] 1-7 * paragraphs [0016] - [0023]; figures 2,2A *
 [A]EP1216807  (VIBRAM SPA [IT]) [A] 1 * paragraphs [0015] - [0025]; figure - *