Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2740566

EP2740566 - Compound machine tool [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  25.03.2016
Database last updated on 19.08.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip12.10.2018Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): AL
published on 14.11.2018  [2018/46]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
YI-DA Precision Machinery Co., Ltd.
1F., No. 25, Lane 55
Jingmei 1st St.
Taiping District
41146 Taichung City / TW
[2014/24]
Inventor(s)01 / Pu, Hank
1F., No. 25, Lane 55, Jingmei 1st St.
Taiping District
41146 Taichung City / TW
 [2014/24]
Representative(s)V.O.
P.O. Box 87930
2508 DH Den Haag / NL
[N/P]
Former [2014/24]Jansen, Cornelis Marinus , et al
V.O.
Johan de Wittlaan 7
2517 JR Den Haag / NL
Application number, filing date13196112.006.12.2013
[2014/24]
Priority number, dateTW2012014609707.12.2012         Original published format: TW 101146097
[2014/24]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2740566
Date:11.06.2014
Language:EN
[2014/24]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2740566
Date:20.05.2015
Language:EN
[2015/21]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP11.04.2014
ClassificationInternational:B23P23/02, B23P23/04, B23Q37/00, B23Q39/02, // B23B23/00, B23P25/00, H05B6/14
[2014/24]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2015/21]
Former [2014/24]AL,  AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  HR,  HU,  IE,  IS,  IT,  LI,  LT,  LU,  LV,  MC,  MK,  MT,  NL,  NO,  PL,  PT,  RO,  RS,  SE,  SI,  SK,  SM,  TR 
TitleGerman:Kombiniertes Maschinenwerkzeug[2014/24]
English:Compound machine tool[2014/24]
French:Machine-outil combinée[2014/24]
Examination procedure10.07.2014Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
10.07.2014Examination requested  [2014/34]
15.12.2014Communication of intention to grant the patent
10.04.2015Fee for grant paid
10.04.2015Fee for publishing/printing paid
10.04.2015Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  15.12.2014
Opposition(s)23.02.2016No opposition filed within time limit [2016/17]
Lapses during opposition  TooltipHU06.12.2013
AL20.05.2015
AT20.05.2015
BE20.05.2015
CY20.05.2015
CZ20.05.2015
DK20.05.2015
EE20.05.2015
ES20.05.2015
FI20.05.2015
HR20.05.2015
IT20.05.2015
LT20.05.2015
LV20.05.2015
MC20.05.2015
MK20.05.2015
MT20.05.2015
NL20.05.2015
PL20.05.2015
RO20.05.2015
RS20.05.2015
SE20.05.2015
SI20.05.2015
SK20.05.2015
SM20.05.2015
TR20.05.2015
BG20.08.2015
NO20.08.2015
GR21.08.2015
IS20.09.2015
PT21.09.2015
IE06.12.2015
LU06.12.2015
[2018/46]
Former [2018/45]HU06.12.2013
AT20.05.2015
BE20.05.2015
CY20.05.2015
CZ20.05.2015
DK20.05.2015
EE20.05.2015
ES20.05.2015
FI20.05.2015
HR20.05.2015
IT20.05.2015
LT20.05.2015
LV20.05.2015
MC20.05.2015
MK20.05.2015
MT20.05.2015
NL20.05.2015
PL20.05.2015
RO20.05.2015
RS20.05.2015
SE20.05.2015
SI20.05.2015
SK20.05.2015
SM20.05.2015
TR20.05.2015
BG20.08.2015
NO20.08.2015
GR21.08.2015
IS20.09.2015
PT21.09.2015
IE06.12.2015
LU06.12.2015
Former [2018/29]HU06.12.2013
AT20.05.2015
BE20.05.2015
CY20.05.2015
CZ20.05.2015
DK20.05.2015
EE20.05.2015
ES20.05.2015
FI20.05.2015
HR20.05.2015
IT20.05.2015
LT20.05.2015
LV20.05.2015
MC20.05.2015
MK20.05.2015
MT20.05.2015
NL20.05.2015
PL20.05.2015
RO20.05.2015
RS20.05.2015
SE20.05.2015
SI20.05.2015
SK20.05.2015
SM20.05.2015
BG20.08.2015
NO20.08.2015
GR21.08.2015
IS20.09.2015
PT21.09.2015
IE06.12.2015
LU06.12.2015
Former [2017/39]HU06.12.2013
AT20.05.2015
BE20.05.2015
CY20.05.2015
CZ20.05.2015
DK20.05.2015
EE20.05.2015
ES20.05.2015
FI20.05.2015
HR20.05.2015
IT20.05.2015
LT20.05.2015
LV20.05.2015
MC20.05.2015
MT20.05.2015
NL20.05.2015
PL20.05.2015
RO20.05.2015
RS20.05.2015
SE20.05.2015
SI20.05.2015
SK20.05.2015
BG20.08.2015
NO20.08.2015
GR21.08.2015
IS20.09.2015
PT21.09.2015
IE06.12.2015
LU06.12.2015
Former [2016/45]AT20.05.2015
BE20.05.2015
CZ20.05.2015
DK20.05.2015
EE20.05.2015
ES20.05.2015
FI20.05.2015
HR20.05.2015
IT20.05.2015
LT20.05.2015
LV20.05.2015
MC20.05.2015
PL20.05.2015
RO20.05.2015
RS20.05.2015
SI20.05.2015
SK20.05.2015
BG20.08.2015
NO20.08.2015
GR21.08.2015
IS20.09.2015
PT21.09.2015
IE06.12.2015
LU06.12.2015
Former [2016/36]AT20.05.2015
BE20.05.2015
CZ20.05.2015
DK20.05.2015
EE20.05.2015
ES20.05.2015
FI20.05.2015
HR20.05.2015
IT20.05.2015
LT20.05.2015
LV20.05.2015
MC20.05.2015
PL20.05.2015
RO20.05.2015
RS20.05.2015
SI20.05.2015
SK20.05.2015
BG20.08.2015
NO20.08.2015
GR21.08.2015
IS20.09.2015
PT21.09.2015
LU06.12.2015
Former [2016/34]AT20.05.2015
CZ20.05.2015
DK20.05.2015
EE20.05.2015
ES20.05.2015
FI20.05.2015
HR20.05.2015
IT20.05.2015
LT20.05.2015
LV20.05.2015
MC20.05.2015
PL20.05.2015
RO20.05.2015
RS20.05.2015
SI20.05.2015
SK20.05.2015
BG20.08.2015
NO20.08.2015
GR21.08.2015
IS20.09.2015
PT21.09.2015
LU06.12.2015
BE31.12.2015
Former [2016/33]AT20.05.2015
CZ20.05.2015
DK20.05.2015
EE20.05.2015
ES20.05.2015
FI20.05.2015
HR20.05.2015
IT20.05.2015
LT20.05.2015
LV20.05.2015
MC20.05.2015
PL20.05.2015
RO20.05.2015
RS20.05.2015
SI20.05.2015
SK20.05.2015
BG20.08.2015
NO20.08.2015
GR21.08.2015
IS20.09.2015
PT21.09.2015
BE31.12.2015
Former [2016/24]AT20.05.2015
CZ20.05.2015
DK20.05.2015
EE20.05.2015
ES20.05.2015
FI20.05.2015
HR20.05.2015
IT20.05.2015
LT20.05.2015
LV20.05.2015
PL20.05.2015
RO20.05.2015
RS20.05.2015
SI20.05.2015
SK20.05.2015
BG20.08.2015
NO20.08.2015
GR21.08.2015
IS20.09.2015
PT21.09.2015
BE31.12.2015
Former [2016/21]AT20.05.2015
CZ20.05.2015
DK20.05.2015
EE20.05.2015
ES20.05.2015
FI20.05.2015
HR20.05.2015
IT20.05.2015
LT20.05.2015
LV20.05.2015
PL20.05.2015
RO20.05.2015
RS20.05.2015
SK20.05.2015
BG20.08.2015
NO20.08.2015
GR21.08.2015
IS20.09.2015
PT21.09.2015
Former [2016/10]AT20.05.2015
CZ20.05.2015
DK20.05.2015
EE20.05.2015
ES20.05.2015
FI20.05.2015
HR20.05.2015
LT20.05.2015
LV20.05.2015
PL20.05.2015
RO20.05.2015
RS20.05.2015
SK20.05.2015
BG20.08.2015
NO20.08.2015
GR21.08.2015
IS20.09.2015
PT21.09.2015
Former [2016/09]AT20.05.2015
DK20.05.2015
EE20.05.2015
ES20.05.2015
FI20.05.2015
HR20.05.2015
LT20.05.2015
LV20.05.2015
RS20.05.2015
BG20.08.2015
NO20.08.2015
GR21.08.2015
IS20.09.2015
PT21.09.2015
Former [2016/07]AT20.05.2015
DK20.05.2015
ES20.05.2015
FI20.05.2015
HR20.05.2015
LT20.05.2015
LV20.05.2015
RS20.05.2015
BG20.08.2015
NO20.08.2015
GR21.08.2015
IS20.09.2015
PT21.09.2015
Former [2015/51]AT20.05.2015
ES20.05.2015
FI20.05.2015
HR20.05.2015
LT20.05.2015
LV20.05.2015
RS20.05.2015
BG20.08.2015
NO20.08.2015
GR21.08.2015
IS20.09.2015
PT21.09.2015
Former [2015/50]ES20.05.2015
FI20.05.2015
HR20.05.2015
LT20.05.2015
LV20.05.2015
RS20.05.2015
BG20.08.2015
NO20.08.2015
GR21.08.2015
IS20.09.2015
PT21.09.2015
Former [2015/49]ES20.05.2015
FI20.05.2015
HR20.05.2015
LT20.05.2015
LV20.05.2015
RS20.05.2015
NO20.08.2015
GR21.08.2015
PT21.09.2015
Documents cited:Search[A]EP0827807  (KAWASAKI HEAVY IND LTD [JP]) [A] 1-9 * column 6, line 22 - line 49 * * column 9, line 48 - column 10, line 1 * * figures 1,2 * * the whole document *;
 [A]DE202010002818U  (J G WEISSER SOEHNE GMBH & CO K [DE]) [A] 1-9 * the whole document *;
 [A]DE102011003004  (MAG IAS GMBH [DE]) [A] 1-9 * paragraphs [0042] , [0043] , [0048]; figure - *;
 [A]US2706234  (MACY JAMES R) [A] 1-9 * column 2, line 17 - line 62 * * column 3, line 20 - line 25 * * figure - *;
 [A]EP2388093  (YI DA PREC MACHINERY CO LTD [TW]) [A] 1-9 * paragraphs [0002] , [0013]; figures 2,5-7 *