Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2749816

EP2749816 - Method for arranging of impingement cooling holes and effusion holes in a combustion chamber wall of a gas turbine [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  22.06.2018
Database last updated on 22.05.2019
FormerRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  05.03.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip22.06.2018Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 25.07.2018  [2018/30]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Rolls-Royce Deutschland Ltd & Co KG
Eschenweg 11
15827 Blankenfelde-Mahlow / DE
[2014/27]
Inventor(s)01 / Gerendas, Dr.-Ing. Miklós
Bahnhofsallee 4
15838 Am Mellensee / DE
02 / Fanter, Maren
Kantstr. 77a
14513 Teltow / DE
03 / Herzog, Volker
Flämingstr. 13
15738 Zeuthen / DE
 [2014/27]
Representative(s)Hoefer & Partner Patentanwälte mbB
Pilgersheimer Straße 20
81543 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2014/27]Hoefer & Partner
Pilgersheimer Straße 20
81543 München / DE
Application number, filing date13196228.409.12.2013
[2014/27]
Priority number, dateDE2012102537527.12.2012         Original published format: DE102012025375
[2014/27]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP2749816
Date:02.07.2014
Language:DE
[2014/27]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP2749816
Date:26.07.2017
Language:DE
[2017/30]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP28.06.2017
ClassificationInternational:F23R3/06
[2014/27]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2014/27]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
TitleGerman:Verfahren zur Anordnung von Prallkühllöchern und Effusionslöchern in einer Brennkammerwand einer Gasturbine[2014/27]
English:Method for arranging of impingement cooling holes and effusion holes in a combustion chamber wall of a gas turbine[2014/27]
French:Procédé d'agencement de trous de refroidissement par impact et d'orifices d'effusion dans une paroi de chambre de combustion d'une turbine à gaz[2014/27]
Examination procedure09.12.2013Examination requested  [2014/27]
27.01.2018Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2018/30]
06.03.2018Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time  [2018/30]
Fees paidRenewal fee
28.12.2015Renewal fee patent year 03
27.12.2016Renewal fee patent year 04
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
31.12.201705   M06   Not yet paid
Documents cited:Search[X]US2008264065  (GERENDAS MIKLOS [DE]) [X] 2-4 * paragraphs [0011] , [0012] , [ 0029] - paragraph [0031]; figures 3-5 *;
 [X]US2012255308  (CHANDLER PAUL I [GB], et al) [X] 2-4 * paragraphs [0003] , [0006] , [0044] , [0057]; figure 4 *;
 [X]US2004211188  (ALKABIE HISHAM [CA]) [X] 2-4 * paragraphs [0022] , [ 0023] , [ 0026] , [ 0027] , [ 0028]; figures 1-5 *;
 [X]US2011016874  (CHANDLER PAUL I [GB], et al) [X] 2-4 * paragraphs [0008] , [ 0009] , [ 0033] , [ 0034] , [ 0039] , [ 0041] , [ 0042]; figures 1-4 *
by applicantWO9216798
 US6237344
 EP1104871
 US5758504