blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

Deep link introduced in Malta Register

Click here for more information on the deep linking.

2019.01.28

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

All documents: EP2749816 Dossier alert: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):   EP2749816



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated






Date Document type Procedure Number of pages
Total number of pages: 72
18.06.2018 Final instructions (application deemed to be withdrawn/application refused) Search / examination 1
06.03.2018 Application deemed to be withdrawn (non-payment of examination fee/designation fee/non-reply to Written Opinion) Search / examination 2
02.02.2018 Notice drawing attention to the payment of the renewal fee and additional fee Search / examination 2
31.07.2017 Reminder period for payment of examination fee/designation fee and correction of deficiencies in Written Opinion/amendment Search / examination 2
28.06.2017 Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report Search / examination 1
28.06.2017 European search opinion Search / examination 3
28.06.2017 European search report Search / examination 2
28.06.2017 Information on Search Strategy Search / examination 1
21.06.2017 Search started Search / examination 1
28.05.2015 Document concerning representation Search / examination 1
04.06.2014 Notification of forthcoming publication Search / examination 2
28.03.2014 Modified abstract Search / examination 2
10.12.2013 Letter concerning the priority Search / examination 1
10.12.2013 Priority document Search / examination 21
09.12.2013 Abstract Search / examination 2
09.12.2013 Acknowledgement of receipt of electronic submission of the request for grant of a European patent Search / examination 2
09.12.2013 Claims Search / examination 2
09.12.2013 Description Search / examination 11
09.12.2013 Designation of inventor Search / examination 1
09.12.2013 Designation of inventor Search / examination 1
09.12.2013 Designation of inventor Search / examination 1
09.12.2013 Drawings Search / examination 4
09.12.2013 Priority search results Search / examination 1
09.12.2013 Request for grant of a European patent Search / examination 5