blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

Deep link introduced in Malta Register

Click here for more information on the deep linking.

2019.01.28

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

Event history: EP2749816


Date  Description European Patent Bulletin date, issue number
22.06.2018 Application deemed to be withdrawn published on  25.07.2018  [2018/30]
05.03.2018 New entry: Application deemed to be withdrawn: despatch of communication + time limit
03.02.2018 New entry: Additional fee for renewal fee: despatch of communication + time limit
23.06.2017 Publication of search report published on  26.07.2017  [2017/30]
23.06.2017 Change - classification published on  26.07.2017  [2017/30]
06.01.2017 New entry: Renewal fee paid
08.01.2016 New entry: Renewal fee paid
02.07.2014 Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin published on  02.07.2014  [2014/27]
30.05.2014 Request for examination filed published on  02.07.2014  [2014/27]