blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

Deep link introduced in Malta Register

Click here for more information on the deep linking.

2019.01.28

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

Patent family: EP2749816
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
US2014290258Global Dossier 02.10.2014A1
Priority number Date
DE102012025375 27.12.2012
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
EP2749816Global Dossier 26.07.2017A3
EP2749816 02.07.2014A2
Priority number Date
DE102012025375 27.12.2012
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
DE102012025375 17.07.2014A1
Priority number Date
DE102012025375 27.12.2012