Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2747444

EP2747444 - Method for accessing a service offered by a remote server by using a QR code [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  22.05.2015
Database last updated on 17.08.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip22.05.2015Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 24.06.2015  [2015/26]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Neotion
L'Optimum - Entree B
Z.I. Les Paluds
165, Avenue Marin Blanc
13685 Aubagne / FR
[2014/26]
Inventor(s)01 / GENEVOIS, Christophe
Impasse Raspus
15, Avenue Ghirardelli
13830 LA BEDOULE / FR
 [2014/26]
Representative(s)Roman, Alexis
Cabinet Roman
35 rue Paradis
B.P. 30064
13484 Marseille Cedex 20 / FR
[N/P]
Former [2014/26]Roman, Alexis
Cabinet Roman
35, rue Paradis
B.P. 30064
13484 Marseille Cedex 20 / FR
Application number, filing date13196371.210.12.2013
[2014/26]
Priority number, dateFR2012006223518.12.2012         Original published format: FR 1262235
[2014/26]
Filing languageFR
Procedural languageFR
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2747444
Date:25.06.2014
Language:FR
[2014/26]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP25.02.2014
ClassificationInternational:H04N21/4784, H04N21/41, H04N21/472, H04N21/258, H04N21/45, H04N21/441, H04N21/418, H04N21/81, H04N21/426
[2014/26]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2014/26]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
TitleGerman:Zugangsverfahren zu einem von einem Fernserver vorgeschlagenen Dienst mit Hilfe eines QR-Code[2014/26]
English:Method for accessing a service offered by a remote server by using a QR code[2014/26]
French:Procédé pour accéder à un service proposé par un serveur distant à l'aide d'un code QR[2014/26]
Examination procedure10.12.2013Examination requested  [2014/26]
06.01.2015Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2015/26]
03.02.2015Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time  [2015/26]
Documents cited:Search[X]US2012215830  (ANGUIANO JASON [US]) [X] 1,8 * paragraph [0010] - paragraph [0026] * * figures 1, 3C *;
 [IY]US2012155838  (GERHARDS KEITH [US], et al) [I] 1-6,8 * figure 1 * * paragraph [0015] - paragraph [0019] * * paragraph [0025] - paragraph [0035] * * paragraph [0045] * [Y] 7;
 [I]US2012130851  (MINNICK DAN J [US], et al) [I] 1-6,8 * figures 1, 3B * * paragraph [0010] - paragraph [0019] *;
 [A]US2008092154  (HOGYOKU ITARU [JP]) [A] 1-8 * figures 1-3, 6 * * paragraph [0061] - paragraph [0092] *;
 [Y]US2003171096  (ILAN GABRIEL [IL], et al) [Y] 7 * figures 7, 11A * * paragraph [0062] - paragraph [0071] * * paragraph [0075] * * paragraph [0080] - paragraph [0085] *;
 [A]  "Companion Devices are a TV's best friends and Internet Players already know that", Neotion white paper, (20120930), URL: http://www.neotion.com/media/download.php, (20130729), XP055073374 [A] 1-8 * the whole document *