Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2819055

EP2819055 - System and method for detecting malicious software using malware trigger scenarios [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  10.03.2017
Database last updated on 18.05.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip12.10.2018Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): AL
published on 14.11.2018  [2018/46]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Kaspersky Lab, ZAO
39A/3 Leningradskoe Shosse
Moscow 125212 / RU
[2015/01]
Inventor(s)01 / Eliseev, Evgeny Y.
c/o Kaspersky Lab, ZAO
39A/3 Leningradskoe Shosse
125212 Moscow / RU
02 / Yablokov, Victor V.
c/o Kaspersky Lab, ZAO
39A/3 Leningradskoe Shosse
125212 Moscow / RU
 [2015/01]
Representative(s)Sloboshanin, Sergej , et al
V. Füner, Ebbinghaus, Finck, Hano Mariahilfplatz 3
81541 München / DE
[2015/01]
Application number, filing date13196430.610.12.2013
[2015/01]
Priority number, dateRU2013012955528.06.2013         Original published format: RU 2013129555
US20131405271812.10.2013         Original published format: US201314052718
[2015/01]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2819055
Date:31.12.2014
Language:EN
[2015/01]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2819055
Date:04.05.2016
Language:EN
[2016/18]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP20.02.2014
ClassificationInternational:G06F21/56
[2015/01]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2015/01]
TitleGerman:System und Verfahren zur Erkennung bösartiger Software mittels Schadprogrammauslösungsszenarien[2015/01]
English:System and method for detecting malicious software using malware trigger scenarios[2015/01]
French:Système et procédé de détection de logiciel malveillant au moyen de scénarios de déclenchement d'un logiciel malveillant[2015/01]
Examination procedure10.12.2013Examination requested  [2015/01]
03.06.2014Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
30.04.2015Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
22.07.2015Reply to a communication from the examining division
25.11.2015Communication of intention to grant the patent
25.02.2016Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO
25.02.2016Fee for grant paid
25.02.2016Fee for publishing/printing paid
16.03.2016Information about intention to grant a patent
16.03.2016Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  30.04.2015
Opposition(s)07.02.2017No opposition filed within time limit [2017/15]
Fees paidRenewal fee
29.12.2015Renewal fee patent year 03
Lapses during opposition  TooltipHU10.12.2013
AL04.05.2016
AT04.05.2016
BE04.05.2016
BG04.05.2016
CY04.05.2016
CZ04.05.2016
DK04.05.2016
EE04.05.2016
ES04.05.2016
FI04.05.2016
HR04.05.2016
IS04.05.2016
IT04.05.2016
LT04.05.2016
LV04.05.2016
MC04.05.2016
MK04.05.2016
NL04.05.2016
PL04.05.2016
RO04.05.2016
RS04.05.2016
SE04.05.2016
SI04.05.2016
SK04.05.2016
SM04.05.2016
TR04.05.2016
NO04.08.2016
GR05.08.2016
PT05.09.2016
IE10.12.2016
LU10.12.2016
MT10.12.2016
CH31.12.2016
LI31.12.2016
[2018/46]
Former [2018/45]HU10.12.2013
AT04.05.2016
BE04.05.2016
BG04.05.2016
CY04.05.2016
CZ04.05.2016
DK04.05.2016
EE04.05.2016
ES04.05.2016
FI04.05.2016
HR04.05.2016
IS04.05.2016
IT04.05.2016
LT04.05.2016
LV04.05.2016
MC04.05.2016
MK04.05.2016
NL04.05.2016
PL04.05.2016
RO04.05.2016
RS04.05.2016
SE04.05.2016
SI04.05.2016
SK04.05.2016
SM04.05.2016
TR04.05.2016
NO04.08.2016
GR05.08.2016
PT05.09.2016
IE10.12.2016
LU10.12.2016
MT10.12.2016
CH31.12.2016
LI31.12.2016
Former [2018/43]HU10.12.2013
AT04.05.2016
BE04.05.2016
BG04.05.2016
CY04.05.2016
CZ04.05.2016
DK04.05.2016
EE04.05.2016
ES04.05.2016
FI04.05.2016
HR04.05.2016
IS04.05.2016
IT04.05.2016
LT04.05.2016
LV04.05.2016
MC04.05.2016
MK04.05.2016
NL04.05.2016
PL04.05.2016
RO04.05.2016
RS04.05.2016
SE04.05.2016
SI04.05.2016
SK04.05.2016
SM04.05.2016
NO04.08.2016
GR05.08.2016
PT05.09.2016
IE10.12.2016
LU10.12.2016
MT10.12.2016
CH31.12.2016
LI31.12.2016
Former [2018/38]HU10.12.2013
AT04.05.2016
BE04.05.2016
BG04.05.2016
CY04.05.2016
CZ04.05.2016
DK04.05.2016
EE04.05.2016
ES04.05.2016
FI04.05.2016
HR04.05.2016
IS04.05.2016
IT04.05.2016
LT04.05.2016
LV04.05.2016
MC04.05.2016
MK04.05.2016
NL04.05.2016
PL04.05.2016
RO04.05.2016
RS04.05.2016
SE04.05.2016
SI04.05.2016
SK04.05.2016
SM04.05.2016
NO04.08.2016
GR05.08.2016
PT05.09.2016
IE10.12.2016
LU10.12.2016
CH31.12.2016
LI31.12.2016
Former [2018/30]HU10.12.2013
AT04.05.2016
BE04.05.2016
CY04.05.2016
CZ04.05.2016
DK04.05.2016
EE04.05.2016
ES04.05.2016
FI04.05.2016
HR04.05.2016
IS04.05.2016
IT04.05.2016
LT04.05.2016
LV04.05.2016
MC04.05.2016
MK04.05.2016
NL04.05.2016
PL04.05.2016
RO04.05.2016
RS04.05.2016
SE04.05.2016
SI04.05.2016
SK04.05.2016
SM04.05.2016
NO04.08.2016
GR05.08.2016
PT05.09.2016
IE10.12.2016
LU10.12.2016
CH31.12.2016
LI31.12.2016
Former [2017/49]AT04.05.2016
BE04.05.2016
CZ04.05.2016
DK04.05.2016
EE04.05.2016
ES04.05.2016
FI04.05.2016
HR04.05.2016
IT04.05.2016
LT04.05.2016
LV04.05.2016
MC04.05.2016
NL04.05.2016
PL04.05.2016
RO04.05.2016
RS04.05.2016
SE04.05.2016
SI04.05.2016
SK04.05.2016
SM04.05.2016
NO04.08.2016
GR05.08.2016
PT05.09.2016
IE10.12.2016
LU10.12.2016
CH31.12.2016
LI31.12.2016
Former [2017/37]AT04.05.2016
BE04.05.2016
CZ04.05.2016
DK04.05.2016
EE04.05.2016
ES04.05.2016
FI04.05.2016
HR04.05.2016
IT04.05.2016
LT04.05.2016
LV04.05.2016
MC04.05.2016
NL04.05.2016
PL04.05.2016
RO04.05.2016
RS04.05.2016
SE04.05.2016
SI04.05.2016
SK04.05.2016
SM04.05.2016
NO04.08.2016
GR05.08.2016
PT05.09.2016
Former [2017/11]AT04.05.2016
BE04.05.2016
CZ04.05.2016
DK04.05.2016
EE04.05.2016
ES04.05.2016
FI04.05.2016
HR04.05.2016
IT04.05.2016
LT04.05.2016
LV04.05.2016
NL04.05.2016
PL04.05.2016
RO04.05.2016
RS04.05.2016
SE04.05.2016
SK04.05.2016
SM04.05.2016
NO04.08.2016
GR05.08.2016
PT05.09.2016
Former [2017/10]BE04.05.2016
CZ04.05.2016
DK04.05.2016
EE04.05.2016
ES04.05.2016
FI04.05.2016
HR04.05.2016
IT04.05.2016
LT04.05.2016
LV04.05.2016
NL04.05.2016
PL04.05.2016
RO04.05.2016
RS04.05.2016
SE04.05.2016
SK04.05.2016
NO04.08.2016
GR05.08.2016
PT05.09.2016
Former [2017/09]CZ04.05.2016
DK04.05.2016
EE04.05.2016
ES04.05.2016
FI04.05.2016
HR04.05.2016
IT04.05.2016
LT04.05.2016
LV04.05.2016
NL04.05.2016
RO04.05.2016
RS04.05.2016
SE04.05.2016
NO04.08.2016
GR05.08.2016
PT05.09.2016
Former [2017/07]DK04.05.2016
ES04.05.2016
FI04.05.2016
HR04.05.2016
IT04.05.2016
LT04.05.2016
LV04.05.2016
NL04.05.2016
RS04.05.2016
SE04.05.2016
NO04.08.2016
GR05.08.2016
PT05.09.2016
Former [2017/04]ES04.05.2016
FI04.05.2016
HR04.05.2016
IT04.05.2016
LT04.05.2016
LV04.05.2016
NL04.05.2016
RS04.05.2016
SE04.05.2016
NO04.08.2016
GR05.08.2016
PT05.09.2016
Former [2016/52]ES04.05.2016
FI04.05.2016
HR04.05.2016
LT04.05.2016
LV04.05.2016
NL04.05.2016
RS04.05.2016
SE04.05.2016
NO04.08.2016
GR05.08.2016
PT05.09.2016
Former [2016/51]ES04.05.2016
FI04.05.2016
HR04.05.2016
LT04.05.2016
LV04.05.2016
NL04.05.2016
RS04.05.2016
NO04.08.2016
GR05.08.2016
PT05.09.2016
Former [2016/50]ES04.05.2016
FI04.05.2016
HR04.05.2016
LT04.05.2016
LV04.05.2016
NL04.05.2016
RS04.05.2016
NO04.08.2016
Former [2016/49]FI04.05.2016
LT04.05.2016
NL04.05.2016
NO04.08.2016
Former [2016/46]LT04.05.2016
NO04.08.2016
Documents cited:Search[XI]US2013122861  (KIM YOUNG-WOOK [KR], et al) [X] 1-3,6-9 * paragraph [0003] * * paragraph [0013] - paragraph [0015] * * paragraph [0031] - paragraph [0032] * * paragraph [0036] * * paragraph [0082] - paragraph [0084] * [I] 4,10;
 [XI]US2002116635  (SHEYMOV VICTOR I [US]) [X] 1-3,7-9 * paragraph [0007] * * paragraph [0013] * * paragraph [0016] * * paragraph [0019] * * paragraph [0039] * * paragraph [0045] - paragraph [0047] * [I] 4,10;
 [XI]WO2010132860  (LYNXXIT INC [US], et al) [X] 1-3,7-9 * paragraph [0012] * * paragraph [0015] * * paragraph [0046] - paragraph [0048] * * paragraph [0060] * [I] 4,5,10,11;
 [I]WO2012027669  (VERISIGN INC [US], et al) [I] 1-12 * paragraph [0048] * * paragraph [0075] * * paragraph [0115] - paragraph [0116] * * paragraph [0119] *
 [I]  DAVID BRUMLEY ET AL, "Automatically Identifying Trigger-based Behavior in Malware", ISBN 0-387-68766-1, (20080101), BOTNET DETECTION : COUNTERING THE LARGEST SECURITY THREAT; [ADVANCES IN INFORMATION SECURITY ; V. 51], SPRINGER, NEW YORK ; LONDON, PAGE(S) 65 - 88, URL: http://rd.springer.com/chapter/10.1007%2F978-0-387-68768-1_4, (20130621), XP002699269 [I] 1,2,4,7,8,10 * abstract * * page 2, paragraph 3 * * page 4, paragraph 5 - paragraph 6 * * step 1; page 7 * * Section 1.3.1; page 9 * * Section 1.3.5; page 16 *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1007/978-0-387-68768-1_4
 [XI]  JEDIDIAH R. CRANDALL ET AL, "Temporal search: Detecting Hidden Malware Timebombs with Virtual Machines", ACM SIGOPS OPERATING SYSTEMS REVIEW, (20061020), vol. 40, no. 5, doi:10.1145/1168917.1168862, ISSN 0163-5980, page 25, XP055100954 [X] 1,2,7,8 * page 1, column 2, paragraph 1 - paragraph 2 * * the whole document * [I] 4,10

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1145/1168917.1168862