Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2860657

EP2860657 - Determining a security status of potentially malicious files [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  10.02.2017
Database last updated on 22.03.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip12.10.2018Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): AL
published on 14.11.2018  [2018/46]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Kaspersky Lab, ZAO
39A/3 Leningradskoe Shosse
Moscow 125212 / RU
[2015/16]
Inventor(s)01 / Polyakov, Alexey A.
c/o Kaspersky Lab, ZAO
39A/3 Leningradskoe Shosse
125212 Moscow / RU
02 / Sapronov, Konstantin V.
c/o Kaspersky Lab, ZAO
39A/3 Leningradskoe Shosse
125212 Moscow / RU
 [2015/16]
Representative(s)Sloboshanin, Sergej , et al
V. Füner, Ebbinghaus, Finck, Hano Mariahilfplatz 3
81541 München / DE
[2015/16]
Application number, filing date13196597.211.12.2013
[2015/16]
Priority number, dateUS20131405085110.10.2013         Original published format: US201314050851
[2015/16]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2860657
Date:15.04.2015
Language:EN
[2015/16]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2860657
Date:06.04.2016
Language:EN
[2016/14]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP19.05.2014
ClassificationInternational:G06F21/56, H04L29/06
[2015/16]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2015/16]
TitleGerman:Bestimmung eines Sicherheitsstatus von potenziell bösartigen Dateien[2015/16]
English:Determining a security status of potentially malicious files[2015/16]
French:Déterminer un état de sécurité de fichiers potentiellement malveillants[2015/16]
Examination procedure11.12.2013Examination requested  [2015/16]
10.08.2015Communication of intention to grant the patent
10.11.2015Fee for grant paid
10.11.2015Fee for publishing/printing paid
19.11.2015Information about intention to grant a patent
19.11.2015Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  10.08.2015
Opposition(s)10.01.2017No opposition filed within time limit [2017/11]
Fees paidRenewal fee
29.12.2015Renewal fee patent year 03
Lapses during opposition  TooltipHU11.12.2013
AL06.04.2016
AT06.04.2016
BE06.04.2016
BG06.04.2016
CY06.04.2016
CZ06.04.2016
DK06.04.2016
EE06.04.2016
ES06.04.2016
FI06.04.2016
HR06.04.2016
IT06.04.2016
LT06.04.2016
LV06.04.2016
MC06.04.2016
MK06.04.2016
NL06.04.2016
PL06.04.2016
RO06.04.2016
RS06.04.2016
SE06.04.2016
SI06.04.2016
SK06.04.2016
SM06.04.2016
TR06.04.2016
NO06.07.2016
GR07.07.2016
IS06.08.2016
PT08.08.2016
IE11.12.2016
LU11.12.2016
MT11.12.2016
CH31.12.2016
LI31.12.2016
[2018/46]
Former [2018/45]HU11.12.2013
AT06.04.2016
BE06.04.2016
BG06.04.2016
CY06.04.2016
CZ06.04.2016
DK06.04.2016
EE06.04.2016
ES06.04.2016
FI06.04.2016
HR06.04.2016
IT06.04.2016
LT06.04.2016
LV06.04.2016
MC06.04.2016
MK06.04.2016
NL06.04.2016
PL06.04.2016
RO06.04.2016
RS06.04.2016
SE06.04.2016
SI06.04.2016
SK06.04.2016
SM06.04.2016
TR06.04.2016
NO06.07.2016
GR07.07.2016
IS06.08.2016
PT08.08.2016
IE11.12.2016
LU11.12.2016
MT11.12.2016
CH31.12.2016
LI31.12.2016
Former [2018/43]HU11.12.2013
AT06.04.2016
BE06.04.2016
BG06.04.2016
CY06.04.2016
CZ06.04.2016
DK06.04.2016
EE06.04.2016
ES06.04.2016
FI06.04.2016
HR06.04.2016
IT06.04.2016
LT06.04.2016
LV06.04.2016
MC06.04.2016
MK06.04.2016
NL06.04.2016
PL06.04.2016
RO06.04.2016
RS06.04.2016
SE06.04.2016
SI06.04.2016
SK06.04.2016
SM06.04.2016
NO06.07.2016
GR07.07.2016
IS06.08.2016
PT08.08.2016
IE11.12.2016
LU11.12.2016
MT11.12.2016
CH31.12.2016
LI31.12.2016
Former [2018/38]HU11.12.2013
AT06.04.2016
BE06.04.2016
BG06.04.2016
CY06.04.2016
CZ06.04.2016
DK06.04.2016
EE06.04.2016
ES06.04.2016
FI06.04.2016
HR06.04.2016
IT06.04.2016
LT06.04.2016
LV06.04.2016
MC06.04.2016
MK06.04.2016
NL06.04.2016
PL06.04.2016
RO06.04.2016
RS06.04.2016
SE06.04.2016
SI06.04.2016
SK06.04.2016
SM06.04.2016
NO06.07.2016
GR07.07.2016
IS06.08.2016
PT08.08.2016
IE11.12.2016
LU11.12.2016
CH31.12.2016
LI31.12.2016
Former [2018/30]HU11.12.2013
AT06.04.2016
BE06.04.2016
CY06.04.2016
CZ06.04.2016
DK06.04.2016
EE06.04.2016
ES06.04.2016
FI06.04.2016
HR06.04.2016
IT06.04.2016
LT06.04.2016
LV06.04.2016
MC06.04.2016
MK06.04.2016
NL06.04.2016
PL06.04.2016
RO06.04.2016
RS06.04.2016
SE06.04.2016
SI06.04.2016
SK06.04.2016
SM06.04.2016
NO06.07.2016
GR07.07.2016
IS06.08.2016
PT08.08.2016
IE11.12.2016
LU11.12.2016
CH31.12.2016
LI31.12.2016
Former [2017/49]AT06.04.2016
BE06.04.2016
CZ06.04.2016
DK06.04.2016
EE06.04.2016
ES06.04.2016
FI06.04.2016
HR06.04.2016
IT06.04.2016
LT06.04.2016
LV06.04.2016
MC06.04.2016
NL06.04.2016
PL06.04.2016
RO06.04.2016
RS06.04.2016
SE06.04.2016
SI06.04.2016
SK06.04.2016
SM06.04.2016
NO06.07.2016
GR07.07.2016
IS06.08.2016
PT08.08.2016
IE11.12.2016
LU11.12.2016
CH31.12.2016
LI31.12.2016
Former [2017/47]AT06.04.2016
BE06.04.2016
CZ06.04.2016
DK06.04.2016
EE06.04.2016
ES06.04.2016
FI06.04.2016
HR06.04.2016
IT06.04.2016
LT06.04.2016
LV06.04.2016
MC06.04.2016
NL06.04.2016
PL06.04.2016
RO06.04.2016
RS06.04.2016
SE06.04.2016
SI06.04.2016
SK06.04.2016
SM06.04.2016
NO06.07.2016
GR07.07.2016
IS06.08.2016
PT08.08.2016
Former [2017/37]AT06.04.2016
BE06.04.2016
CZ06.04.2016
DK06.04.2016
EE06.04.2016
ES06.04.2016
FI06.04.2016
HR06.04.2016
IT06.04.2016
LT06.04.2016
LV06.04.2016
NL06.04.2016
PL06.04.2016
RO06.04.2016
RS06.04.2016
SE06.04.2016
SI06.04.2016
SK06.04.2016
SM06.04.2016
NO06.07.2016
GR07.07.2016
IS06.08.2016
PT08.08.2016
Former [2017/11]AT06.04.2016
BE06.04.2016
CZ06.04.2016
DK06.04.2016
EE06.04.2016
ES06.04.2016
FI06.04.2016
HR06.04.2016
IT06.04.2016
LT06.04.2016
LV06.04.2016
NL06.04.2016
PL06.04.2016
RO06.04.2016
RS06.04.2016
SE06.04.2016
SK06.04.2016
SM06.04.2016
NO06.07.2016
GR07.07.2016
IS06.08.2016
PT08.08.2016
Former [2017/10]AT06.04.2016
BE06.04.2016
CZ06.04.2016
DK06.04.2016
EE06.04.2016
ES06.04.2016
FI06.04.2016
HR06.04.2016
IT06.04.2016
LT06.04.2016
LV06.04.2016
NL06.04.2016
PL06.04.2016
RO06.04.2016
RS06.04.2016
SE06.04.2016
SK06.04.2016
NO06.07.2016
GR07.07.2016
IS06.08.2016
PT08.08.2016
Former [2017/09]AT06.04.2016
BE06.04.2016
CZ06.04.2016
DK06.04.2016
EE06.04.2016
ES06.04.2016
FI06.04.2016
HR06.04.2016
IT06.04.2016
LT06.04.2016
LV06.04.2016
NL06.04.2016
PL06.04.2016
RO06.04.2016
RS06.04.2016
SE06.04.2016
NO06.07.2016
GR07.07.2016
IS06.08.2016
PT08.08.2016
Former [2017/07]AT06.04.2016
BE06.04.2016
DK06.04.2016
ES06.04.2016
FI06.04.2016
HR06.04.2016
IT06.04.2016
LT06.04.2016
LV06.04.2016
NL06.04.2016
PL06.04.2016
RS06.04.2016
SE06.04.2016
NO06.07.2016
GR07.07.2016
IS06.08.2016
PT08.08.2016
Former [2017/03]AT06.04.2016
BE06.04.2016
ES06.04.2016
FI06.04.2016
HR06.04.2016
IT06.04.2016
LT06.04.2016
LV06.04.2016
NL06.04.2016
PL06.04.2016
RS06.04.2016
SE06.04.2016
NO06.07.2016
GR07.07.2016
IS06.08.2016
PT08.08.2016
Former [2016/52]AT06.04.2016
ES06.04.2016
FI06.04.2016
HR06.04.2016
LT06.04.2016
LV06.04.2016
NL06.04.2016
PL06.04.2016
RS06.04.2016
SE06.04.2016
NO06.07.2016
GR07.07.2016
IS06.08.2016
PT08.08.2016
Former [2016/51]AT06.04.2016
ES06.04.2016
FI06.04.2016
HR06.04.2016
LT06.04.2016
LV06.04.2016
NL06.04.2016
PL06.04.2016
RS06.04.2016
NO06.07.2016
GR07.07.2016
IS06.08.2016
PT08.08.2016
Former [2016/50]AT06.04.2016
ES06.04.2016
FI06.04.2016
HR06.04.2016
LT06.04.2016
LV06.04.2016
NL06.04.2016
PL06.04.2016
RS06.04.2016
NO06.07.2016
IS06.08.2016
Former [2016/49]FI06.04.2016
LT06.04.2016
NL06.04.2016
PL06.04.2016
NO06.07.2016
IS06.08.2016
Former [2016/48]LT06.04.2016
NL06.04.2016
NO06.07.2016
IS06.08.2016
Former [2016/46]LT06.04.2016
NL06.04.2016
NO06.07.2016
Former [2016/44]NL06.04.2016
Documents cited:Search[A]EP2169583  (SYMANTEC CORP [US]) [A] 1-12 * paragraph [0020] - paragraph [0027] * * paragraph [0034] - paragraph [0039] * * paragraph [0042] - paragraph [0045] *;
 [A]WO9938080  (HO ANDREW P [US]) [A] 1-12 * page 1 - page 2 *;
 [A]US7694150  (KIRBY ALAN J [US]) [A] 1-12 * column 2, line 64 - column 3, line 6 * * column 9, line 37 - column 10, line 12 *;
 [A]US2004153644  (MCCORKENDALE BRUCE [US], et al) [A] 1-12 * paragraph [0008] - paragraph [0012] * * paragraph [0031] - paragraph [0032] * * paragraph [0043] - paragraph [0054] *