Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2745669

EP2745669 - Motor vehicle for harvesting bunches of grapes [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  06.10.2017
Database last updated on 24.08.2019
FormerExamination is in progress
Status updated on  20.01.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip06.10.2017Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 08.11.2017  [2017/45]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Marin, Augustin
12, Chemin Mané Brizil
56340 Carnac / FR
[2014/26]
Inventor(s)01 / see applicant
...
 [2014/26]
Representative(s)Roman, Alexis
Cabinet Roman
35 rue Paradis
B.P. 30064
13484 Marseille Cedex 20 / FR
[N/P]
Former [2014/26]Roman, Alexis
Cabinet Roman
35, rue Paradis
B.P. 30064
13484 Marseille Cedex 20 / FR
Application number, filing date13196927.112.12.2013
[2014/26]
Priority number, dateFR2012006273321.12.2012         Original published format: FR 1262733
[2014/26]
Filing languageFR
Procedural languageFR
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2745669
Date:25.06.2014
Language:FR
[2014/26]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP13.03.2014
ClassificationInternational:A01D46/28, A01D67/04, A01D46/24
[2014/26]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2014/26]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
TitleGerman:Motorbetriebenes Fahrzeug zum Ernten von Weintrauben[2014/26]
English:Motor vehicle for harvesting bunches of grapes[2014/26]
French:Véhicule motorisé pour la récolte de grappes de raisins[2014/26]
Examination procedure24.12.2014Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
24.12.2014Examination requested  [2015/07]
18.01.2017Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
30.05.2017Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2017/45]
28.06.2017Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time  [2017/45]
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  18.01.2017
Fees paidRenewal fee
30.12.2015Renewal fee patent year 03
02.01.2017Renewal fee patent year 04
Cited inInternational search[IY]EP1449421  (TOLAINI LOUIS [CA]) [I] 1,4,5,7 * abstract * * paragraphs [0002] , [00 7] , [0 20] - [0027] - [0 30] , [0 33] - [0334] - [0 37] - [0038] * [Y] 2,3,6
 [I]US3236329  (PRICE HAROLD A) [I] 1,6-8 * figures 1, 2, 9-10, 13-15 * * column 1, lines 9-34, 43-50, 59-63, 68-70 * * column 2, lines 4-14, 30-31 * * column 3, lines 41-48 * * column 4, lines 58-61 * * column 5, lines 32-34, 61-67 * * column 6, lines 11-16 *
 [I]US3485026  (DAVIS JOHN V) [I] 1,7 * abstract * * column 1, lines 11-20, 25-34, 47-53 * * column 3, lines 14-26 *
 [Y]WO9115107  (PAYTAS ANTHONY R [US]) [Y] 2,3 * abstract * * page 2, lines 20-22 * * page 22, line 21 - page 23, line 25 *
 [YA]FR2758229  (HUMEAU MICHEL [FR]) [Y] 6 * abstract * * page 1, lines 17-19 * * page 6, line 5 - page 7, line 15 * [A] 1
 ES2228237  [ ]
 US6070402  [ ]
 EP1449421  [ ]
 US3236329  [ ]
 US3485026  [ ]