Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2762858

EP2762858 - Integrated interferometric optical sensor circuit [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  21.06.2019
Database last updated on 15.07.2019
FormerThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  13.07.2018
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  25.02.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip21.06.2019No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 24.07.2019 [2019/30]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Universiteit Gent
Sint-Pietersnieuwstraat 25
9000 Gent / BE
For all designated states
IMEC VZW
Kapeldreef 75
3001 Leuven / BE
[2017/52]
Former [2014/32]For all designated states
Universiteit Gent
Sint-Pietersnieuwstraat 25
9000 Gent / BE
For all designated states
IMEC
Kapeldreef 75
3001 Leuven / BE
Inventor(s)01 / Bienstman, Peter
Willem Wenemaerstraat 31
9000 Gent / BE
02 / Claes, Tom
Vijverstraat 2
9030 Mariakerke / BE
 [2018/33]
Former [2014/32]01 / Bienstman, Peter
Willem Wenemaerstraat 31
9000 Gent / BE
02 / Claes, Tom
Kraanlei 5
9000 Gent / BE
Representative(s)Wauters, Davy Erik Angelo , et al
DenK iP bvba
Leuvensesteenweg 203
3190 Boortmeerbeek / BE
[2014/32]
Application number, filing date13197306.714.12.2013
[2014/32]
Priority number, dateEP2012019878720.12.2012         Original published format: EP 12198787
[2014/32]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2762858
Date:06.08.2014
Language:EN
[2014/32]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2762858
Date:15.08.2018
Language:EN
[2018/33]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP10.04.2014
ClassificationInternational:G01N21/45
[2014/32]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2018/33]
Former [2014/32]AL,  AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  HR,  HU,  IE,  IS,  IT,  LI,  LT,  LU,  LV,  MC,  MK,  MT,  NL,  NO,  PL,  PT,  RO,  RS,  SE,  SI,  SK,  SM,  TR 
TitleGerman:Integrierte optische Sensorschalter[2014/32]
English:Integrated interferometric optical sensor circuit[2014/32]
French:Circuit de capteur optique intégré[2014/32]
Examination procedure05.02.2015Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
05.02.2015Examination requested  [2015/12]
26.02.2018Communication of intention to grant the patent
09.07.2018Fee for grant paid
09.07.2018Fee for publishing/printing paid
09.07.2018Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Divisional application(s)EP18182329.5  / EP3431965
The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  26.02.2018
Opposition(s)16.05.2019No opposition filed within time limit [2019/30]
Fees paidRenewal fee
22.12.2015Renewal fee patent year 03
23.12.2016Renewal fee patent year 04
21.12.2017Renewal fee patent year 05
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAL15.08.2018
AT15.08.2018
CZ15.08.2018
DK15.08.2018
EE15.08.2018
FI15.08.2018
HR15.08.2018
LT15.08.2018
LV15.08.2018
RO15.08.2018
RS15.08.2018
SK15.08.2018
SM15.08.2018
BG15.11.2018
NO15.11.2018
GR16.11.2018
IS15.12.2018
[2019/26]
Former [2019/24]AL15.08.2018
AT15.08.2018
CZ15.08.2018
EE15.08.2018
FI15.08.2018
HR15.08.2018
LT15.08.2018
LV15.08.2018
RO15.08.2018
RS15.08.2018
SK15.08.2018
BG15.11.2018
NO15.11.2018
GR16.11.2018
IS15.12.2018
Former [2019/22]AL15.08.2018
AT15.08.2018
CZ15.08.2018
FI15.08.2018
HR15.08.2018
LT15.08.2018
LV15.08.2018
RO15.08.2018
RS15.08.2018
BG15.11.2018
NO15.11.2018
GR16.11.2018
IS15.12.2018
Former [2019/12]AL15.08.2018
AT15.08.2018
FI15.08.2018
HR15.08.2018
LT15.08.2018
LV15.08.2018
RS15.08.2018
BG15.11.2018
NO15.11.2018
GR16.11.2018
IS15.12.2018
Former [2019/11]AT15.08.2018
FI15.08.2018
HR15.08.2018
LT15.08.2018
RS15.08.2018
BG15.11.2018
NO15.11.2018
GR16.11.2018
IS15.12.2018
Former [2019/10]AT15.08.2018
FI15.08.2018
LT15.08.2018
RS15.08.2018
BG15.11.2018
NO15.11.2018
GR16.11.2018
IS15.12.2018
Former [2019/08]FI15.08.2018
LT15.08.2018
NO15.11.2018
IS15.12.2018
Former [2019/07]LT15.08.2018
Documents cited:Search[A]US2012214707  (YMETI AUREL [NL], et al) [A] 1-13 * figure 4 *;
 [A]  - LUFF B J ET AL, "Integrated Optical Mach-Zehnder Biosensor", JOURNAL OF LIGHTWAVE TECHNOLOGY, IEEE SERVICE CENTER, NEW YORK, NY, US, (19980416), vol. 16, no. 4, ISSN 0733-8724, XP011029089 [A] 1-13 * figure 1 *
 [AD]  - BERNINI R ET AL, "Generalized Mach-Zehnder interferometers for sensing applications", SENSORS AND ACTUATORS B: CHEMICAL: INTERNATIONAL JOURNAL DEVOTED TO RESEARCH AND DEVELOPMENT OF PHYSICAL AND CHEMICAL TRANSDUCERS, ELSEVIER S.A, SWITZERLAND, (20040218), vol. 100, no. 1-2, doi:10.1016/J.SNB.2003.12.023, ISSN 0925-4005, pages 72 - 74, XP004509051 [AD] 1-13 * the whole document *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.snb.2003.12.023
 [AD]  - TOM CLAES ET AL, "Vernier-cascade label-free biosensor with integrated arrayed waveguide grating for wavelength interrogation with low-cost broadband source", OPTICS LETTERS, OSA, OPTICAL SOCIETY OF AMERICA, WASHINGTON, DC, US, vol. 36, no. 17, doi:10.1364/OL.36.003320, ISSN 0146-9592, (20110917), pages 3320 - 3322, (20110819), XP001569459 [AD] 1-13 * the whole document *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1364/OL.36.003320
by applicant   - CLAES, OPTICS LETTERS, (2011), vol. 36, pages 3320 - 3322
    - XIA, IEEE PHOTONICS ANNUAL MEETING, (2010), pages 329 - 330
    - CASTELLO, OPTICS LETTERS, (2011), vol. 36, pages 2707 - 2709