Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2711772

EP2711772 - All-optical logic gates using nonlinear elements [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  15.11.2019
Database last updated on 07.12.2019
FormerExamination is in progress
Status updated on  07.08.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip30.11.2019New entry: Decision (+date) in appeal procedure 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Coveytech, LLC
1920 Golf Club Way
Braselton GA 30517 / US
[2014/13]
Inventor(s)01 / Covey, John Luther
1920 Gofl Club Way
Braselton, GA Georgia 30517 / US
 [2014/13]
Representative(s)Zacco Sweden AB
P.O. Box 5581
114 85 Stockholm / SE
[N/P]
Former [2014/45]Zacco Sweden AB
Valhallavägen 117
P.O. Box 5581
114 85 Stockholm / SE
Former [2014/13]Ydreskog, Margareta
Zacco Sweden AB
P.O. Box 5581
114 85 Stockholm / SE
Application number, filing date13197457.806.12.2006
[2014/13]
Priority number, dateUS2006035446814.02.2006         Original published format: US 354468
US2006035447514.02.2006         Original published format: US 354475
US2006035460114.02.2006         Original published format: US 354601
US2006035473114.02.2006         Original published format: US 354731
US2006035473414.02.2006         Original published format: US 354734
US2006035473514.02.2006         Original published format: US 354735
[2014/13]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2711772
Date:26.03.2014
Language:EN
[2014/13]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP19.02.2014
ClassificationInternational:G02F3/00, G02B6/122, B82Y20/00
[2014/13]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   NL,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2014/13]
TitleGerman:Vollständig optische logische Gates mit nichtlinearen Elementen[2014/13]
English:All-optical logic gates using nonlinear elements[2014/13]
French:Portes logiques entièrement optiques utilisant des éléments non linéaires[2014/13]
Examination procedure25.09.2014Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
25.09.2014Examination requested  [2014/45]
30.06.2015Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
29.10.2015Reply to a communication from the examining division
10.11.2016Date of oral proceedings
25.11.2016Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination {1}
25.11.2016Minutes of oral proceedings despatched
02.07.2019Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2019/51]
08.08.2019Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time  [2019/51]
Appeal following examination25.01.2017Appeal received No.  T0907/17
24.03.2017Statement of grounds filed
18.10.2019Result of appeal procedure: the application was deemed to be withdrawn
Parent application(s)   TooltipEP06844875.2  / EP1987392
EP11152701.6  / EP2312387
Fees paidRenewal fee
16.04.2014Renewal fee patent year 03
16.04.2014Renewal fee patent year 04
16.04.2014Renewal fee patent year 05
16.04.2014Renewal fee patent year 06
16.04.2014Renewal fee patent year 07
16.04.2014Renewal fee patent year 08
16.06.2015Renewal fee patent year 09
18.02.2016Renewal fee patent year 10
25.01.2017Renewal fee patent year 11
28.12.2017Renewal fee patent year 12
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
31.12.201409   M06   Fee paid on   16.06.2015
31.12.201510   M06   Fee paid on   18.02.2016
31.12.201611   M06   Fee paid on   25.01.2017
31.12.201813   M06   Not yet paid
Documents cited:Search[I]US2004033009  (SOLJACIC MARIN [US], et al) [I] 1-10 * abstract * * figures 1,5,7A * * paragraphs [0017] , [0018] , [0024] , [0041] , [0053] - [0055] *;
 [AD]US2005259999  (COVEY JOHN L [US]) [AD] 1-10 * the whole document *;
 [A]EP0373541  (TSNT TVORCHESTVA MOLODEZHI LIN [SU]) [A] 10 * paragraph [0017] *
by applicantUS2005259999