Extract from the Register of European Patents

Legal status: EP2711772

Designated contracting statesAT 
BE 
BG 
CH 
CY 
CZ 
DE 
DK 
EE 
ES 
FI 
FR 
GB 
GR 
HU 
IE 
IS 
IT 
LI 
LT 
LU 
LV 
MC 
NL 
PL 
PT 
RO 
SE 
SI 
SK 
TR 
Examination procedure08.08.2019Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time  [2019/51]
Fees paidRenewal fee
16.04.2014Renewal fee patent year 03
16.04.2014Renewal fee patent year 04
16.04.2014Renewal fee patent year 05
16.04.2014Renewal fee patent year 06
16.04.2014Renewal fee patent year 07
16.04.2014Renewal fee patent year 08
16.06.2015Renewal fee patent year 09
18.02.2016Renewal fee patent year 10
25.01.2017Renewal fee patent year 11
28.12.2017Renewal fee patent year 12
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
31.12.201409   M06   Fee paid on   16.06.2015
31.12.201510   M06   Fee paid on   18.02.2016
31.12.201611   M06   Fee paid on   25.01.2017
31.12.201813   M06   Not yet paid
Appeal following examination25.01.2017APPEAL FILED
24.03.2017APPEAL STATEMENT OF GROUNDS FILED
18.10.2019APPEAL RESULT
INPADOC data   TooltipThe EPO does not accept any responsibility for the accuracy of legal status data relating to the post-grant phase, including but not limited to their completeness and fitness for specific purposes, nor can it guarantee that such data are up to date. For authoritative information, please refer to the relevant national patent authority.
Event date:26.03.2014 
Event description:DIVISIONAL APPLICATION: REFERENCE TO EARLIER APPLICATION
Ref Document Number:2312387
Country of Ref Document:EP
Kind Code of Ref Document:P
 
Event date:26.03.2014 
Event description:DIVISIONAL APPLICATION: REFERENCE TO EARLIER APPLICATION
Ref Document Number:1987392
Country of Ref Document:EP
Kind Code of Ref Document:P
 
Event date:26.03.2014 
Event description:DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES
Kind Code of Ref Document:A1
Designated State(s):AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR
 
Event date:05.11.2014 
Event description:REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED
Effective DATE:20140925
 
Event date:05.11.2014 
Event description:DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTED)
Designated State(s):AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR
 
Event date:29.07.2015 
Event description:FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT DESPATCHED
Effective DATE:20150630
 
Event date:18.12.2019 
Event description:APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN
Effective DATE:20190702