Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2884247

EP2884247 - Spectrometer for generating a two dimensional spectrum [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  20.05.2016
Database last updated on 14.07.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip20.05.2016Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 22.06.2016  [2016/25]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Nederlandse Organisatie voor toegepast- natuurwetenschappelijk onderzoek TNO
Anna van Buerenplein 1
2595 DA 's-Gravenhage / NL
[2015/25]
Inventor(s)01 / Moddemeijer, Kees
c/o TNO-PLT
Schoemakerstraat 97
2628 VK Delft / NL
02 / Daniel, Perez Calero
c/o TNO-PLT
Schoemakerstraat 97
2628 VK Delft / NL
03 / Duivenvoorde, Tom
c/o TNO-PLT
Schoemakerstraat 97
2628 VK Delft / NL
04 / Sandtke, Marijn
c/o TNO-PLT
Schoemakerstraat 97
2628 VK Delft / NL
05 / Day, James Peter Robert
c/o TNO-PLT
Schoemakerstraat 97
2628 VK Delft / NL
 [2015/25]
Representative(s)V.O.
P.O. Box 87930
2508 DH Den Haag / NL
[N/P]
Former [2015/25]Jansen, Cornelis Marinus , et al
V.O.
Johan de Wittlaan 7
2517 JR Den Haag / NL
Application number, filing date13197479.216.12.2013
[2015/25]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2884247
Date:17.06.2015
Language:EN
[2015/25]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP20.05.2014
ClassificationInternational:G01J3/02, G01J3/18, G01J3/28
[2015/25]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2015/25]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
TitleGerman:Spektrometer zur Erzeugung eines zweidimensionalen Spektrums[2015/25]
English:Spectrometer for generating a two dimensional spectrum[2015/25]
French:Spectromètre pour générer un spectre à deux dimensions[2015/25]
Examination procedure16.12.2013Examination requested  [2015/25]
18.12.2015Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2016/25]
01.02.2016Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time  [2016/25]
Fees paidPenalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
31.12.201503   M06   Not yet paid
Documents cited:Search[X]US3658423  (ELLIOTT WILLIAM G) [X] 1-15 * column 3, line 11 - column 4, line 32; figures 3,4 *;
 [I]US5565983  (BARNARD THOMAS W [US]) [I] 1-15 * abstract *;
 [I]US3922089  (DANIELSSON NILS ALLAN, et al) [I] 1-15 * abstract *;
 [I]US5018856  (HARNLY JAMES M [US], et al) [I] 1-15 * abstract *;
 [A]US4995721  (KRUPA ROBERT J [US], et al) [A] 2,3 * abstract *;
 [A]US2009091754  (ZHANG JINGYUN [US]) [A] 2,3 * abstract *;
 [A]US2009091753  (BEARDSLEY BURT JAY [US], et al) [A] 2,3 * abstract *;
 [A]US7595875  (MITCHELL THOMAS A [US]) [A] 1,14 * the whole document *;
 [A]EP1806606  (FUJITSU LTD [JP]) [A] 1,14 * paragraphs [0010] , [0 22]; figures 2,3 *;
 [A]US2006038997  (JULIAN JASON P [US], et al) [A] 2,3 * abstract *
by applicantEP1754032