Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2724699

EP2724699 - Table and slide assemblies for patient transfer device [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusExamination is in progress
Status updated on  07.07.2017
Database last updated on 18.02.2020
Most recent event   Tooltip19.08.2019New entry: Renewal fee paid 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
ConMediSys, Inc.
1909 W. Braker Lane, Bldg. E, Suite 200
Austin, TX 78758 / US
[2014/18]
Inventor(s)01 / Patterson, Richard A.
210 Liz Lane
Georgetown, TX Texas 78628 / US
02 / Gravell, Lawrence R.
11706 Three Oaks Trail
Austin, TX Texas 78731 / US
 [2014/18]
Representative(s)Office Kirkpatrick
Avenue Wolfers, 32
1310 La Hulpe / BE
[N/P]
Former [2014/18]Bird Goën & Co
Wetenschapspark Arenberg
Gaston Geenslaan 9
3001 Heverlee / BE
Application number, filing date13197491.709.08.2008
[2014/18]
Priority number, dateUS2007083767113.08.2007         Original published format: US 837671
US2008018884708.08.2008         Original published format: US 188847
[2014/18]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP2724699
Date:30.04.2014
Language:EN
[2014/18]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP2724699
Date:25.06.2014
Language:EN
[2014/26]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP28.05.2014
ClassificationInternational:A61G7/14
[2014/18]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2014/18]
TitleGerman:Tisch und Schlitten-Anordnungen für eine Patiententransfervorrichtung[2014/18]
English:Table and slide assemblies for patient transfer device[2014/18]
French:Ensembles table et dispositif coulissant pour dispositif de transfert de patient[2014/18]
Examination procedure19.12.2014Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
19.12.2014Examination requested  [2015/05]
11.07.2017Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
15.11.2017Reply to a communication from the examining division
23.10.2018Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
14.02.2019Reply to a communication from the examining division
Parent application(s)   TooltipEP08795208.1  / EP2187856
Fees paidRenewal fee
16.12.2013Renewal fee patent year 03
16.12.2013Renewal fee patent year 04
16.12.2013Renewal fee patent year 05
16.12.2013Renewal fee patent year 06
29.10.2014Renewal fee patent year 07
10.08.2015Renewal fee patent year 08
11.08.2016Renewal fee patent year 09
14.08.2017Renewal fee patent year 10
10.08.2018Renewal fee patent year 11
15.08.2019Renewal fee patent year 12
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
31.08.201407   M06   Fee paid on   29.10.2014
Documents cited:Search[XI]EP1348415  (DAIHEN CORP [JP]) [X] 4,6 * paragraphs [0029] - [0041]; figures 6a-b, 7-19 * [I] 1,3;
 [XI]US2007079439  (PATTERSON RICHARD A [US], et al) [X] 1,3 * paragraphs [0067] - [0068]; figures 12-13 * [I] 4,6;
 [A]US3854152  (CHEZ D) [A] 1-6 * column 3, line 9 - column 4, line 44; figure 2 *;
 [A]US3493979  (KOLL LAUREL A, et al) [A] 1-6 * column 11, line 47 - column 12, line 69; figures 5,7-10 *
by applicantUS5540321
 US4914769
 US2007079438