blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability
Register Forum

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News flashes

New version of the European Patent Register - SPC information for Unitary Patents.

2024-03-06

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP2818900

EP2818900 - Color filter substrate and method for fabricating the same, and display panel and display device [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  19.08.2016
Database last updated on 15.06.2024
Most recent event   Tooltip12.10.2018Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): AL
published on 14.11.2018  [2018/46]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Shanghai Tianma Micro-electronics Co., Ltd.
889 Huiqing Rd. Pudong New District
Shanghai 201201 / CN
For all designated states
Tianma Micro-Electronics Co., Ltd.
22th hangdu Building South
Shennan Road
Central Futian District
518052 Shenzhen / CN
[2015/01]
Inventor(s)01 / Li, Hong
889 Huiqing Rd.
Pudong New District
201201 Shanghai / CN
02 / Wu, Tianyi
889 Huiqing Rd.
Pudong New District
201201 Shanghai / CN
 [2015/01]
Representative(s)Dantz, Jan Henning, et al
Loesenbeck - Specht - Dantz
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte
Am Zwinger 2
33602 Bielefeld / DE
[2015/01]
Application number, filing date13197598.917.12.2013
[2015/01]
Priority number, dateCN20131027074028.06.2013         Original published format: CN201310270740
[2015/01]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2818900
Date:31.12.2014
Language:EN
[2015/01]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2818900
Date:14.10.2015
Language:EN
[2015/42]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP27.03.2014
ClassificationIPC:G02B5/20
[2015/01]
CPC:
G02B5/201 (EP,US); G02F1/133514 (US)
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2015/01]
TitleGerman:Farbfiltersubstrat und Verfahren zu seiner Herstellung, und Anzeigetafel und Anzeigevorrichtung[2015/01]
English:Color filter substrate and method for fabricating the same, and display panel and display device[2015/01]
French:Substrat de filtre coloré et son procédé de fabrication et panneau d'affichage et dispositif d'affichage[2015/01]
Examination procedure22.09.2014Examination requested  [2015/01]
11.05.2015Communication of intention to grant the patent
01.09.2015Fee for grant paid
01.09.2015Fee for publishing/printing paid
01.09.2015Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  11.05.2015
Opposition(s)15.07.2016No opposition filed within time limit [2016/38]
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Lapses during opposition  TooltipHU17.12.2013
AL14.10.2015
AT14.10.2015
BE14.10.2015
BG14.10.2015
CY14.10.2015
CZ14.10.2015
DK14.10.2015
EE14.10.2015
ES14.10.2015
FI14.10.2015
HR14.10.2015
IT14.10.2015
LT14.10.2015
LV14.10.2015
MC14.10.2015
MK14.10.2015
MT14.10.2015
NL14.10.2015
PL14.10.2015
RO14.10.2015
RS14.10.2015
SE14.10.2015
SI14.10.2015
SK14.10.2015
SM14.10.2015
TR14.10.2015
IE17.12.2015
LU17.12.2015
FR31.12.2015
NO14.01.2016
GR15.01.2016
IS14.02.2016
PT15.02.2016
[2018/46]
Former [2018/45]HU17.12.2013
AT14.10.2015
BE14.10.2015
BG14.10.2015
CY14.10.2015
CZ14.10.2015
DK14.10.2015
EE14.10.2015
ES14.10.2015
FI14.10.2015
HR14.10.2015
IT14.10.2015
LT14.10.2015
LV14.10.2015
MC14.10.2015
MK14.10.2015
MT14.10.2015
NL14.10.2015
PL14.10.2015
RO14.10.2015
RS14.10.2015
SE14.10.2015
SI14.10.2015
SK14.10.2015
SM14.10.2015
TR14.10.2015
IE17.12.2015
LU17.12.2015
FR31.12.2015
NO14.01.2016
GR15.01.2016
IS14.02.2016
PT15.02.2016
Former [2018/32]HU17.12.2013
AT14.10.2015
BE14.10.2015
BG14.10.2015
CY14.10.2015
CZ14.10.2015
DK14.10.2015
EE14.10.2015
ES14.10.2015
FI14.10.2015
HR14.10.2015
IT14.10.2015
LT14.10.2015
LV14.10.2015
MC14.10.2015
MK14.10.2015
MT14.10.2015
NL14.10.2015
PL14.10.2015
RO14.10.2015
RS14.10.2015
SE14.10.2015
SI14.10.2015
SK14.10.2015
SM14.10.2015
IE17.12.2015
LU17.12.2015
FR31.12.2015
NO14.01.2016
GR15.01.2016
IS14.02.2016
PT15.02.2016
Former [2017/39]HU17.12.2013
AT14.10.2015
BE14.10.2015
BG14.10.2015
CY14.10.2015
CZ14.10.2015
DK14.10.2015
EE14.10.2015
ES14.10.2015
FI14.10.2015
HR14.10.2015
IT14.10.2015
LT14.10.2015
LV14.10.2015
MC14.10.2015
MT14.10.2015
NL14.10.2015
PL14.10.2015
RO14.10.2015
RS14.10.2015
SE14.10.2015
SI14.10.2015
SK14.10.2015
SM14.10.2015
IE17.12.2015
LU17.12.2015
FR31.12.2015
NO14.01.2016
GR15.01.2016
IS14.02.2016
PT15.02.2016
Former [2017/03]AT14.10.2015
BE14.10.2015
CZ14.10.2015
DK14.10.2015
EE14.10.2015
ES14.10.2015
FI14.10.2015
HR14.10.2015
IT14.10.2015
LT14.10.2015
LV14.10.2015
MC14.10.2015
NL14.10.2015
PL14.10.2015
RO14.10.2015
RS14.10.2015
SE14.10.2015
SI14.10.2015
SK14.10.2015
SM14.10.2015
IE17.12.2015
LU17.12.2015
FR31.12.2015
NO14.01.2016
GR15.01.2016
IS14.02.2016
PT15.02.2016
Former [2016/50]AT14.10.2015
CZ14.10.2015
DK14.10.2015
EE14.10.2015
ES14.10.2015
FI14.10.2015
HR14.10.2015
IT14.10.2015
LT14.10.2015
LV14.10.2015
MC14.10.2015
NL14.10.2015
PL14.10.2015
RO14.10.2015
RS14.10.2015
SE14.10.2015
SI14.10.2015
SK14.10.2015
SM14.10.2015
IE17.12.2015
LU17.12.2015
BE31.12.2015
FR31.12.2015
NO14.01.2016
GR15.01.2016
IS14.02.2016
PT15.02.2016
Former [2016/49]AT14.10.2015
CZ14.10.2015
DK14.10.2015
EE14.10.2015
ES14.10.2015
FI14.10.2015
HR14.10.2015
IT14.10.2015
LT14.10.2015
LV14.10.2015
MC14.10.2015
NL14.10.2015
PL14.10.2015
RO14.10.2015
RS14.10.2015
SE14.10.2015
SI14.10.2015
SK14.10.2015
SM14.10.2015
IE17.12.2015
LU17.12.2015
BE31.12.2015
NO14.01.2016
GR15.01.2016
IS14.02.2016
PT15.02.2016
Former [2016/45]AT14.10.2015
CZ14.10.2015
DK14.10.2015
EE14.10.2015
ES14.10.2015
FI14.10.2015
HR14.10.2015
IT14.10.2015
LT14.10.2015
LV14.10.2015
MC14.10.2015
NL14.10.2015
PL14.10.2015
RO14.10.2015
RS14.10.2015
SE14.10.2015
SK14.10.2015
SM14.10.2015
IE17.12.2015
LU17.12.2015
BE31.12.2015
NO14.01.2016
GR15.01.2016
IS14.02.2016
PT15.02.2016
Former [2016/39]AT14.10.2015
CZ14.10.2015
DK14.10.2015
EE14.10.2015
ES14.10.2015
FI14.10.2015
HR14.10.2015
IT14.10.2015
LT14.10.2015
LV14.10.2015
MC14.10.2015
NL14.10.2015
PL14.10.2015
RO14.10.2015
RS14.10.2015
SE14.10.2015
SK14.10.2015
SM14.10.2015
LU17.12.2015
BE31.12.2015
NO14.01.2016
GR15.01.2016
IS14.02.2016
PT15.02.2016
Former [2016/38]AT14.10.2015
CZ14.10.2015
EE14.10.2015
ES14.10.2015
FI14.10.2015
HR14.10.2015
IT14.10.2015
LT14.10.2015
LV14.10.2015
MC14.10.2015
NL14.10.2015
PL14.10.2015
RO14.10.2015
RS14.10.2015
SE14.10.2015
SK14.10.2015
SM14.10.2015
LU17.12.2015
BE31.12.2015
NO14.01.2016
GR15.01.2016
IS14.02.2016
PT15.02.2016
Former [2016/36]AT14.10.2015
CZ14.10.2015
EE14.10.2015
ES14.10.2015
FI14.10.2015
HR14.10.2015
IT14.10.2015
LT14.10.2015
LV14.10.2015
MC14.10.2015
NL14.10.2015
PL14.10.2015
RO14.10.2015
RS14.10.2015
SE14.10.2015
SK14.10.2015
LU17.12.2015
BE31.12.2015
NO14.01.2016
GR15.01.2016
IS14.02.2016
PT15.02.2016
Former [2016/34]AT14.10.2015
CZ14.10.2015
ES14.10.2015
FI14.10.2015
HR14.10.2015
IT14.10.2015
LT14.10.2015
LV14.10.2015
MC14.10.2015
NL14.10.2015
PL14.10.2015
RS14.10.2015
SE14.10.2015
LU17.12.2015
BE31.12.2015
NO14.01.2016
GR15.01.2016
IS14.02.2016
PT15.02.2016
Former [2016/33]AT14.10.2015
ES14.10.2015
FI14.10.2015
HR14.10.2015
IT14.10.2015
LT14.10.2015
LV14.10.2015
MC14.10.2015
NL14.10.2015
PL14.10.2015
RS14.10.2015
SE14.10.2015
BE31.12.2015
NO14.01.2016
GR15.01.2016
IS14.02.2016
PT15.02.2016
Former [2016/25]AT14.10.2015
ES14.10.2015
FI14.10.2015
HR14.10.2015
IT14.10.2015
LT14.10.2015
LV14.10.2015
NL14.10.2015
PL14.10.2015
RS14.10.2015
SE14.10.2015
BE31.12.2015
NO14.01.2016
GR15.01.2016
IS14.02.2016
PT15.02.2016
Former [2016/24]AT14.10.2015
ES14.10.2015
FI14.10.2015
HR14.10.2015
IT14.10.2015
LT14.10.2015
NL14.10.2015
PL14.10.2015
RS14.10.2015
SE14.10.2015
BE31.12.2015
NO14.01.2016
GR15.01.2016
IS14.02.2016
PT15.02.2016
Former [2016/23]ES14.10.2015
HR14.10.2015
IT14.10.2015
LT14.10.2015
NL14.10.2015
RS14.10.2015
SE14.10.2015
NO14.01.2016
IS14.02.2016
Former [2016/22]ES14.10.2015
IT14.10.2015
LT14.10.2015
NL14.10.2015
NO14.01.2016
IS14.02.2016
Former [2016/21]ES14.10.2015
IT14.10.2015
LT14.10.2015
NO14.01.2016
Former [2016/20]ES14.10.2015
LT14.10.2015
Documents cited:Search[A]US2003007033  (ITO TATSUYA [JP], et al) [A] 1-10 * figure 7(c) *;
 [A]US6738204  (CHUANG LI-SEN [TW], et al) [A] 1-10 * figures 4B,6B *;
 [A]US2009035518  (WANG WEI-YA [TW], et al) [A] 1-10 * figures 7A,7C,7D *;
 [A]EP0616233  (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD [JP]) [A] 1-10 * figures 2,8-10 *;
 [A]US2008302952  (YAMASHITA KAZUYOSHI [JP], et al) [A] 1-10 * figure 5B *
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.