Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2886641

EP2886641 - Method for obtaining palytoxin from palythoa aff. clavata, and specific uses of palytoxin [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  20.05.2016
Database last updated on 19.09.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip20.05.2016Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 22.06.2016  [2016/25]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Institut de Recherche pour le Développement
Le Sextant
44 bd de Dunkerque
CS 90009
13572 Marseille Cedex 02 / FR
For all designated states
Coral Biome SARL
163, Avenue de Luminy
Zone Luminy entreprises, Case 922
13288 Marseille Cedex 09 / FR
[2015/26]
Inventor(s)01 / DETOURNAY Olivier
4 chemin de Mordeau
13190 ALLAUCH / FR
02 / LORQUIN Jean
1195 chemin de la Fontaine de cinq sous
83330 LE BEAUSSET / FR
03 / GAULT Frèdéric
Chemin de la Pierra Mouraou
Allée du Ganeou
83330 LE BEAUSSET / FR
 [2015/26]
Representative(s)Barbot, Willy , et al
Simodoro-ip
82, rue Sylvabelle
13006 Marseille / FR
[N/P]
Former [2015/26]Barbot, Willy , et al
SIMODORO-ip
1 place des Prêcheurs
13100 Aix-en-Provence / FR
Application number, filing date13197854.617.12.2013
[2015/26]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2886641
Date:24.06.2015
Language:EN
[2015/26]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP29.07.2014
ClassificationInternational:C12N1/12, C07D493/08, A61K31/357, A61P35/00, A61P31/00, A61P17/00
[2015/26]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2016/03]
Former [2015/26]AL,  AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  HR,  HU,  IE,  IS,  IT,  LI,  LT,  LU,  LV,  MC,  MK,  MT,  NL,  NO,  PL,  PT,  RO,  RS,  SE,  SI,  SK,  SM,  TR 
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
TitleGerman:Verfahren zur Gewinnung von Palytoxin aus palythoa aff. clavata, und spezielle Verwendungen von Palytoxin[2015/26]
English:Method for obtaining palytoxin from palythoa aff. clavata, and specific uses of palytoxin[2015/26]
French:Procédé permettant d'obtenir la palytoxine à partir de palythoa aff. clavata et utilisations spécifiques de la palytoxine[2015/26]
Examination procedure10.12.2015Examination requested  [2016/03]
05.01.2016Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2016/25]
01.02.2016Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the Extended European Search Report/Written Opinion of the International Searching Authority/International Preliminary Examination Report/Supplementary international search report not received in time  [2016/25]
Fees paidRenewal fee
03.11.2015Renewal fee patent year 03
Cited inInternational search[X]WO2013012997  (UNIV LOUISIANA STATE [US]; PAUL DENNIS J [US]; GOULD HARRY J [US]) [X] 21 * page 1, paragraph 2 * * claims 1-15 *
 [A]  - JAMES D REIMER ET AL, "Molecular identification of symbiotic dinoflagellates (Symbiodinium spp.) from Palythoa spp. (Anthozoa: Hexacorallia) in Japan", CORAL REEFS ; JOURNAL OF THE INTERNATIONAL SOCIETY FOR REEF STUDIES, SPRINGER, BERLIN, DE, (20060914), vol. 25, no. 4, doi:10.1007/S00338-006-0151-4, ISSN 1432-0975, pages 521 - 527, XP019459567 [A] 1-12 * abstract * * page 521, column 2 *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1007/s00338-006-0151-4
 [XA]  - R. J. QUINN ET AL, "Anticancer activity of zoanthids and the associated toxin, palytoxin, against ehrlich ascites tumor and P-388 lymphocytic leukemia in mice", JOURNAL OF PHARMACEUTICAL SCIENCES, (19740201), vol. 63, no. 2, doi:10.1002/jps.2600630217, ISSN 0022-3549, pages 257 - 260, XP055113357 [X] 21 * abstract * * page 258; table 1 * * page 259; tables II, III * * page 260; table IV * [A] 1-12

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1002/jps.2600630217
 [A]  - JAMES DAVIS REIMER ET AL, "Species Diversity of Shallow Water Zoanthids (Cnidaria: Anthozoa: Hexacorallia) in Florida", JOURNAL OF MARINE BIOLOGY, (20120101), vol. 10, no. 5114, doi:10.1046/j.1365-294X.2002.01652.x, ISSN 1687-9481, pages 57 - 14, XP055113398 [A] 1-12 * page 3; table 1 *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1155/2012/856079
 [A]  - HIDESHI NAKAMURA ET AL, "Studies on Polyketide Metabolites of a Symbiotic Dinoflagellate, Symbiodinium sp", BULLETIN OF THE CHEMICAL SOCIETY OF JAPAN, (19980101), vol. 71, no. 4, ISSN 0009-2673, page 781, XP055113408 [A] 1-12 * abstract * * page 782; figure 1 *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1246/bcsj.71.781
 [ID]  - BERESS L ET AL, "A method for the isolation of the caribbean palytoxin (C-PTX) from the coelenterate (zooanthid) Palythoa caribaeorum", TOXICON, ELMSFORD, NY, US, vol. 21, no. 2, doi:10.1016/0041-0101(83)90013-2, ISSN 0041-0101, (19830101), pages 285 - 290, (19830101), XP025508816 [ID] 1-12 * abstract * * page 285 *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/0041-0101(83)90013-2
 [A]  - NAKAMURA H ET AL, "Isolation of zooxanthellatoxins, novel vasoconstrictive substances from the zooxanthella Symbiodinium sp", TOXICON, ELMSFORD, NY, US, vol. 31, no. 4, doi:10.1016/0041-0101(93)90172-F, ISSN 0041-0101, (19930401), pages 371 - 376, (19930401), XP025828057 [A] 1-12 * page 371 *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/0041-0101(93)90172-F
 [ID]  - JONATHAN R. DEEDS ET AL, "Palytoxin Found in Palythoa sp. Zoanthids (Anthozoa, Hexacorallia) Sold in the Home Aquarium Trade", PLOS ONE, (20110101), vol. 6, no. 4, doi:10.1371/journal.pone.0018235, ISSN 1932-6203, page e18235, XP055113680 [ID] 1-12 * the whole document *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1371/journal.pone.0018235
 [X]  - TIBOR GÖRÖGH ET AL, "Head and neck cancer cells and xenografts are very sensitive to palytoxin: decrease of c-jun n-terminale kinase-3 expression enhances palytoxin toxicity", MOLECULAR CANCER, BIOMED CENTRAL, LONDON, GB, (20130214), vol. 12, no. 1, doi:10.1186/1476-4598-12-12, ISSN 1476-4598, page 12, XP021141886 [X] 21 * the whole document *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1186/1476-4598-12-12
 [X]  - CARMEN LOUZAO M ET AL, "Palytoxins and cytoskeleton: An overview", TOXICON, ELMSFORD, NY, US, vol. 57, no. 3, doi:10.1016/J.TOXICON.2010.09.017, ISSN 0041-0101, (20100928), pages 460 - 469, (20101007), XP028172532 [X] 21 * abstract *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.toxicon.2010.09.017
 [X]  - MIRELLA BELLOCCI ET AL, "The cytolytic and cytotoxic activities of palytoxin", TOXICON, ELMSFORD, NY, US, vol. 57, no. 3, doi:10.1016/J.TOXICON.2010.12.013, ISSN 0041-0101, (20101220), pages 449 - 459, (20101229), XP028172531 [X] 21 * 3. Conclusions and perspectives; page 456 *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.toxicon.2010.12.013
    [ ] - APPRILL AM; RD GATES, "Recognizing diversity in coral symbiotic dinoflagellate communities", MOL. ECOL., (2007), vol. 16, pages 1127 - 1134
    [ ] - BAKER AC., "Flexibility and specificity in coral-algal symbiosis: diversity, ecology and biogeography of Symbiodinium", ANNU. REV. ECOL. EVOL. SYST., (2003), vol. 34, pages 661 - 689
    [ ] - BERESS L; J ZWICK; HJ KOLKENBROCK; PN KAUL; 0 WASSERMANN, "A method for the isolation of the caribbean palytoxin (C-PTX) from the coelenterate (zooanthid) Palythoa caribaeorum", TOXICON, (1983), vol. 21, pages 285 - 290
    [ ] - BERKELMANS R; MJH VAN OPPEN, "The role of zooxanthellae in the thermal tolerance of corals: a 'nugget of hope' for coral reefs in an era of climate change", PROC. R. SOC. LOND. B, (2006), vol. 273, pages 2305 - 2312
    [ ] - BRANLE F; F LEFRANC; I CAMBY; J JEUKEN; A GEURTS-MOESPOT; S SPRENGER; F SWEEP; R KISS R; I SALMON, "Evaluation of the efficiency of chemotherapy in in vivo orthotopic models of human glioma cells with and without lp/19q deletions and in C6 rat orthotopic allografts serving for the evaluation of surgery combined with chemotherapy", CANCER, (2002), vol. 95, pages 641 - 655
    [ ] - CHARLSON AT; NA ZELIADT NA; EV WATTENBERG, "Extracellular signal regulated kinase 5 mediates signals triggered by the novel tumor promoter palytoxin", TOXICOL APPL PHARMACOL, (2009), vol. 241, pages 143 - 153
    [ ] - CIMINIELLO P; C DELL'AVERSANO; E FATTORUSSO; M FORINO; L TARTAGLIONE; C GRILLO; N MELCHIORRE, "Putative palytoxin and its new analogue, ovatoxin-a, in Ostreopsis ovata collected along the Ligurian Coasts during the 2006 toxic outbreak", J. AM. SOC. MASS. SPECTROM., (2008), vol. 19, pages 111 - 120
    [ ] - CIMINIELLO P; C DELL'AVERSANO; E DELLOLACOVO; E FATTORUSSO; M FORINO; L GRAUSO; L TARTAGLIONE; C FLORIO; P LORENZON; M DE BORTOLI, "Stereostructure and biological activity of 42-hydroxy-palytoxin: a new palytoxin analogue from Hawaiian Palythoa subspecies", CHEM. RES. TOXICOL., (2009), vol. 22, pages 1851 - 1859
    [ ] - CIMINIELLO P; C DELL'AVERSANO; E DELLOLACOVO; E FATTORUSSO; M FORINO; L TARTAGLIONE, "LC-MS of palytoxin and its analogues: state of the art and future perspectives", TOXICON, (2011), vol. 57, pages 376 - 380
    [ ] - COFFROTH MA; SR SANTOS, "Genetic diversity of symbiotic dinoflagellates in the genus Symbiodinium", PROTIST, (2005), vol. 156, pages 19 - 34
    [ ] - DEBEIR 0; V MEGALIZZIB; N WARZEEA; R KISS; C DECAESTECKERA, "Videomicroscopic extraction of specific information on cell proliferation and migration in vitro", EXP. CELL RES., (2008), vol. 314, pages 2985 - 2998
    [ ] - DEL FAVERO G; C FLORIO; B CODAN; S SOSA; M POLI; 0 SBAIZERO; J MOLGO; A TUBARO; P LORENZON, "The stretch-activated channel blocker gd3+ reduces palytoxin toxicity in primary cultures of skeletal muscle cells", CHEM RES TOXICOL, (2012), vol. 25, pages 1912 - 1920
    [ ] - DEEDS JR; SM HANDY; K WHITE; JD REIMER, "Palytoxin found in Palythoa sp. Zoanthids (Anthozoa, Hexacorallia) sold in the home aquarium trade", PLOS ONE, (2011), vol. 6, pages 1 - 9
    [ ] - EDGAR RC, "MUSCLE: multiple sequence alignment with high accuracy and high throughput", NUCLEIC ACIDS RESEARCH, (2004), vol. 32, pages 1792 - 1797
    [ ] - FREDERICK R; C BRUYERE; C VANCRAEYNEST; J RENIERS; C MEINGUET; L POCHET; A BACKLUND; B MASEREEL; R KISS; J WOUTERS, "Novel trisubstituted harmine derivatives with original in vitro anticancer activity", J. MED. CHEM., (2012), vol. 55, pages 6489 - 6501
    [ ] - FORCIOLI D; PL MERLE; C CALIGARA; M CIOSI; C MUTI; P FRANCOUR; C CERRANO; D ALLEMAND, "Symbiont diversity is not involved in depth acclimation in the Mediterranean sea whip Eunicella singularis", MAR. ECOL. PROG. SER., (2011), vol. 439, pages 57 - 71
    [ ] - GLEIBS S; D MEBS; B WEERDING, "Studies on the origin and distribution of palytoxin in a Caribbean coral reef", TOXICON, (1995), vol. 33, pages 1531 - 1537
    [ ] - GÖRÖGH T; L BERESS; ES QUABIUS; P AMBROSCH; M HOFFMANN; HEAD; NECK, "cancer cells and xenografts are very sensitive to palytoxin: decrease of c-jun n-terminal kinase-3 expression enhances palytoxin toxicity", MOLECULAR CANCER, (2013), vol. 12, pages 1 - 11
    [ ] - GUILLARD RRL; JH RYTHER, "Studies of marine planktonic diatoms. I. Cyclotella nana Hustedt and Detonula confervacea Cleve", CAN. J. MICROBIOL., (1962), vol. 8, pages 229 - 239
    [ ] - HILGEMAN DW., "From a pump to a pore: how palytoxin opens the gates", PROC NATL ACAD SCI USA, (2003), vol. 100, pages 386 - 388
    [ ] - "Photoadaptation, photo acclimation and niche diversification in invertebrate-dinoflagellate symbioses", IGLESIAS-PRIETO R; RK TRENCH, Proceedings of the 8th International Coral Reef Symposium, SMITHSONIAN TROPICAL RESEARCH INSTITUTE, (1997), vol. 2, pages 1319 - 1324
    [ ] - INGRASSIA L; F LEFRANC; J DEWELLE; L POTTIER; V MATHIEU; S SPIEGL-KREINECKER; S SAUVAGE; M EL YAZIDI; M DEHOUX; W BERGER, "Structure-activity- relationship analysis of novel derivatives of narciclasine (an Amaryllidaceae isocarbostyril alkaloid) as potential anti-cancer agents", JMED CHEM, (2009), vol. 52, pages 1100 - 1114
    [ ] - JOHANNES RE; WJ WIEBE, "Method for determination of coral tissue biomass and composition", LIMNOL. OCEANOGR., (1970), vol. 15, pages 822 - 824
    [ ] - KAN Y; D UEMURA; Y HIRATA; M ISHIGURO; T IWASHITA, "Complete NMR signal assignment of palytoxin and N-acetylpalytoxin", TETRAHEDRON LETT, (2001), vol. 42, pages 3197 - 3202
    [ ] - "Chemistry of palytoxins and ostreocins", KATIKOU P., Phycotoxins, Chemistry and Biochemistry, BLACKWELL PUBLISHING, (2007), pages 75 - 93
    [ ] - KERBRAT AS; Z AMZIL; R PAWLOWIEZ; S GOLUBIC; M SIBAT; HT DARIUS; M CHINAIN; D LAURENT, "First evidence of palytoxin and 42-hydroxy-palytoxin in the marine cyanobacterium Trichodesmium", MAR. DRUGS, (2011), vol. 9, pages 543 - 560
    [ ] - KIMURA S; K HASHIMOTO, "Purification of the toxin in a zoanthid Palythoa tuberculosa", PUBL. SETO. MAR. BIOL. LAB., (1973), vol. 20, pages 713 - 718
    [ ] - LEFRANC F; I CAMBY; N BELOT; E BRUYNEEL; C CHABOTEAUX; J BROTCHI; M MAREEL; I SALMON; R KISS, "Gastrin significantly modifies the migratory abilities of experimental glioma cells", LAB INVEST, (2002), vol. 82, pages 1241 - 1252
    [ ] - LEFRANC F; T MIJATOVIC; Y KONDO; S SAUVAGE; I ROLAND; D KRSTIC; V VASIC; P GAILLY; S KONDO; G BLANCO, "Targeting the alpha-1 subunit of the sodium pump (the Na+/K+-ATPase) to combat glioblastoma cells", NEUROSURGERY, (2008), vol. 62, pages 211 - 222
    [ ] - LENOIR S; L TEN-HAGE; J TURQUET; JP QUOD; C BERNARD; MC HENNION, "First evidence of palytoxin analogues from an Ostreopsis mascarenensis (Dinophyceae) benthic bloom in southwestern Indian Ocean", J. PHYCOL., (2004), vol. 40, pages 1042 - 1051
    [ ] - LOUZAO MC; IR ARES; E CAGIDE, "Marine toxins and the cytoskeleton: a new view of palytoxin toxicity", FEBS J, (2008), vol. 275, pages 6067 - 6074
    [ ] - LOUZAO MC; IR ARES; E CAGIDE; B ESPINA; N VILARINO; A ALFONSO; MR VIEYTES; LM BOTANA, "Palytoxins and cytoskeleton: An overview", TOXICON, (2011), vol. 57, pages 460 - 469
    [ ] - MIJATOVIC T; V MATHIEU; JF GAUSSIN; N DE NEVE; F RIBAUCOUR; E VAN QUAQUEBEKE; P DUMONT; F DARRO; R KISS, "Cardenolide-induced lysosomal membrane permeabilization contributes therapeutic benefits in experimental human non-small-cell-lung cancers", NEOPLASIA, (2006), vol. 8, pages 402 - 412
    [ ] - MIJATOVIC T; I ROLAND; E VAN QUAQUEBEKE; B NILSSON; A MATHIEU; F VAN VYNCKT; F DARRO; G BLANCO; V FACCHINI; R KISS, "The alpha- subunit of the sodium pump could represent a novel target to combat non-small cell lung cancers", JPATHOL, (2007), vol. 212, pages 170 - 179
    [ ] - MIJATOVIC T; E VAN QUAQUEBEKE; B DELEST; 0 DEBEIR; F DARRO; R KISS, "Cardiotonic steroids on the road to anti-cancer therapy", BBA REV CANCER, (2007), vol. 1776, pages 32 - 57
    [ ] - MOORE RE; PJ SCHEUER, "Palytoxin, new marine toxin from a Coelenterate", SCIENCE, (1971), vol. 172, pages 495 - 498
    [ ] - MORERA C; MA VILLANUEVA, "Heat treatment and viability assessment by Evans blue in cultured Symbiodinium kawagutii cells", WORLD J. MICROBIOL. BIOTECHNOL, (2009), vol. 25, pages 1125 - 1128
    [ ] - OKU N; NU SATA; S MATSUNAGA; H UCHIDA; N FUSETANI, "Identification of palytoxin as a principle which causes morphological changes inrat 3Y1 cells in the zoanthid Palythoa aff. margaritae", TOXICON, (2004), vol. 43, pages 21 - 25
    [ ] - PAZ B; P RIOBO; JM FRANCO, "Preliminary study for rapid determination of phycotoxins in microalgae whole cells using matrix-assisted laser desorption ionization time-of-flight mass spectrometry", RAPID COMMUN. MASS SPECTROM., (2011), vol. 25, pages 3627 - 3639
    [ ] - PELIN M; BOSCOLO S; POLI M; SOSA S; TUBARO A; C FLORIO, "Characterization ofpalytoxin binding to HaCaT cells using a monoclonal anti-palytoxin antibody", MAR. DRUGS, (2013), vol. 11, pages 584 - 598
    [ ] - PEY A; T ZAMOUM; D ALLEMAND; P FURLA; PL MERLE, "Depth dependant thermotolerance of the symbiotic Mediterranean gorgonian Eunicella singularis: evidence from cellular stress markers", J. EXP. MAR. BIOL. ECOL., (2011), vol. 404, pages 73 - 78
    [ ] - POCHON X; RD GATES, "A new Symbiodinium clade (Dinophyceae) from soritid foraminifera in Hawai'i", MOL. PHYLOGENET. EVOL., (2010), vol. 56, pages 492 - 497
    [ ] - QUINN RJ; M KASHIWAGI; RE MOORE; TR NORTON, "Anticancer activity of zoanthids and the associated toxin, palytoxin, against ehrlich ascites tumor and p-388 lymphocytic leukemia in mice", J. PHARMAC SCI, (1974), vol. 63, pages 257 - 260
    [ ] - RAMOS V; V VASCONCELOS, "Palytoxin and analogs: Biological and ecological effects", MAR. DRUGS, (2010), vol. 8, pages 2021 - 2037
    [ ] - REIMER JD; C FOORD; Y IREI, "Species Diversity of Shallow Water Zoanthids (Cnidaria: Anthozoa: Hexacorallia) in Florida", J. MARINE BIOL., (2012), pages 1 - 14
    [ ] - RICHIER S; PL MERLE; P FURLA; D PIGOZZI; F SOLA; D ALLEMAND, "Characterization of superoxide dismutases in anoxia- and hyperoxia-tolerant symbiotic cnidarians", BIOCHIM. BIOPHYS. ACTA, (2003), vol. 1621, pages 84 - 91
    [ ] - RODRIGUES AM; ACG ALMEIDA; AFC INFANTOSI, "Effect of palytoxin on the sodiumpotassium pump: model and simulation", PHYS BIOL, (2008), vol. 5, page 036005
    [ ] - ROSSI R; V CASTELLANO; E SCALCO; L SERPE; A ZINGONE; V SOPRANO, "New palytoxin-like molecules in Mediterranean Ostreopsis cf. ovata (dinoflagellates) and in Palythoa tuberculosa detected by liquid chromatography-electrospray ionization time-of-flight mass spectrometry", TOXICON, (2010), vol. 56, pages 1381 - 1387
    [ ] - ROSSINI GP; A BIGIANI, "Palytoxin action on the Na+,K+-ATPase and the disruption of ion equilibria in biological systems", TOXICON, (2011), vol. 57, pages 429 - 439
    [ ] - ROWAN R., "Coral bleaching: thermal adaptation in reef coral symbionts", NATURE, (2004), vol. 430, page 742
    [ ] - SANTIAGO-VAZQUEZ L; RANZER L; R KERR., "Comparison of two total RNA extraction protocols using the marine gorgonian coral Pseudopterogorgia elizabethae and its symbiont Symbiodinium sp", ELECTRON. J. BIOTECHNOL., (2006), vol. 9
    [ ] - SATOH E; T ISHII T; M NISHIMURA, "Palytoxin-induced increase in cytosolic-free Ca2+ in mouse spleen cells", EUR J PHARMACOL, (2003), vol. 465, pages 9 - 13
    [ ] - STAT M; E MORRIS; RD GATES, "Functional diversity in coral-dinoflagellate symbiosis", PROC. NATL. ACAD. SCI., (2008), vol. 105, pages 9256 - 9261
    [ ] - STAT M; RD GATES, "Clade D Symbiodinium in scleractinian corals: a ''nugget'' of hope, a selfish opportunist, an ominous sign, or all of the above?", J. MAR. BIOL., (2011), page E730715
    [ ] - TAMURA K; D PETERSON; N PETERSON; G STECHER; M NEI; S KUMAR, "MEGA 5: Molecular Evolutionary Genetics Analysis using Maximum Likelihood, Evolutionary Distance, and Maximum Parsimony Methods", MOLECULAR BIOLOGY AND EVOLUTION, (2011), vol. 28, pages 2731 - 2739
    [ ] - TANIYAMA S; 0 ARAKAWA; M TERADA; S NISHIO; T TAKATANI; Y MAHMUD; T NOGUCHI, "Ostreopsis sp., a possible origin of palytoxin (PTX) in parrot fish Scarusovifrons", TOXICON, (2003), vol. 42, pages 29 - 33
    [ ] - TCHERNOV D; MY GORBUNOV; C DE VARGAS; S NARAYAN YADAV; AJ MILLIGAN; M HAGGBLOM; PG FALKOWSKI, "Membrane lipids of symbiotic algae are diagnostic of sensitivity to thermal bleaching in corals", PROC. NATL. ACAD. SCI., (2004), vol. 101, pages 13531 - 13535
    [ ] - UEMURA D; Y HIRATA; T IWASHITA; H NAOKI, "Studies on palytoxins", TETRAHEDRON, (1985), vol. 41, pages 1007 - 1117
    [ ] - UKENA T; M SATAKE; M USAMI; Y OSHIMA; H NAOKI; T FUJITA; Y KAN; T YASUMOTO, "Structure elucidation of ostreocin d, a palytoxin analog isolated from the dinoflagellate Ostreopsis siamensis", BIOSCI. BIOTECHNOL. BIOCHEM., (2001), vol. 65, pages 2585 - 2588
    [ ] - VALVERDE I; J LAGO; A REBOREDA; JM VIEITES; AG CABADO, "Characteristics of palytoxin-induced cytotoxicity in neuroblastoma cells", TOXICOL. IN VITRO, (2008), vol. 22, pages 1432 - 1439
    [ ] - VAN GOIETSENOVEN G; J HUTTON; JP BECKER; B LALLEMAND; F ROBERT; F LEFRANC; C PIRKER; G VANDENBUSSCHE; P VAN ANTWERPEN; A EVIDENTE, "Targeting of eEFIA with Amaryllidaceae isocarbostyrils as a strategy to combat melanomas", FASEB J, (2010), vol. 24, pages 4575 - 4584
    [ ] - WARNER ME; WKFITT; GW SCHMIDT, "Damage to photosystem 11 in symbiotic dinoflagellates: a determinant of coral bleaching", PROC. NATL. ACAD. SCI., (1999), vol. 96, pages 8007 - 8012
    [ ] - WATTENBERG EV, "Modulation of protein kinase signaling cascades by palytoxin", TOXICON, (2011), vol. 57, pages 440 - 448
    [ ] - WILES JS; JA VICK; MK CHRISTENSEN, "Toxicological evaluation of palytoxin in several animal species", TOXICON, (1974), vol. 12, pages 427 - 433
    [ ] - "Polyether toxins involved in seafood poisoning", YASUMOTO T; M MURATA, ACS Symposium Series, AMERICAN CHEMICAL SOCIETY, (1990), vol. 418, pages 120 - 132
    [ ] - ZAMOUM T; P FURLA, "Methods and techniques : Symbiodinium isolation by NaOH treatment", J. EXP. BIOL, (2012), vol. 215, pages 3875 - 3880