blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

European Patent Register Assistant updated

In order to offer you the best possible learning experience we have launched an updated version of the European Patent Register Assistant online tutorial to include recent changes in the Register.

2019.08.29

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

All documents: EP2886641 Dossier alert: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):   EP2886641



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated






Date Document type Procedure Number of pages
Total number of pages: 112
25.05.2016 Refund of fees Search / examination 1
13.05.2016 Closing of application Search / examination 1
01.02.2016 Application deemed to be withdrawn (non-reply to Written Opinion) Search / examination 1
18.12.2015 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
18.12.2015 Letter concerning fees and payments Search / examination 1
18.12.2015 Payment of fees and costs Search / examination 1
10.12.2015 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
10.12.2015 Letter concerning fees and payments Search / examination 1
10.12.2015 Payment of fees and costs Search / examination 1
10.12.2015 Payment of fees and costs Search / examination 1
03.11.2015 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
03.11.2015 Letter concerning fees and payments Search / examination 1
03.11.2015 Payment of fees and costs Search / examination 1
03.11.2015 Payment of fees and costs Search / examination 1
29.06.2015 Reminder period for payment of examination fee/designation fee and correction of deficiencies in Written Opinion/amendment Search / examination 2
28.05.2015 Notification of forthcoming publication Search / examination 2
30.04.2015 Communication of amended entries concerning the representative Search / examination 1
25.04.2015 Designation of inventor Search / examination 1
25.04.2015 Letter concerning the inventor Search / examination 1
17.04.2015 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
17.04.2015 Designation of inventor Search / examination 1
17.04.2015 Designation of inventor Search / examination 1
17.04.2015 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
17.04.2015 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
17.04.2015 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
17.04.2015 Letter concerning the inventor Search / examination 1
17.04.2015 Letter concerning the inventor Search / examination 1
17.04.2015 Request for change of applicant's representative Search / examination 1
29.07.2014 Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report Search / examination 1
29.07.2014 European search opinion Search / examination 5
29.07.2014 European search report Search / examination 7
20.06.2014 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
20.06.2014 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 2
20.06.2014 Letter concerning fees and payments Search / examination 1
22.04.2014 Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report Search / examination 2
22.04.2014 Partial European search report Search / examination 5
10.04.2014 Search started Search / examination 1
07.02.2014 Deficiency in designation of inventor Search / examination 1
07.01.2014 Payment of fees and costs Search / examination 1
07.01.2014 Payment of fees and costs Search / examination 1
17.12.2013 Abstract Search / examination 1
17.12.2013 Acknowledgement of receipt of electronic submission of the request for grant of a European patent Search / examination 2
17.12.2013 Claims Search / examination 3
17.12.2013 Converted Sequence Listing Search / examination 2
17.12.2013 Description Search / examination 32
17.12.2013 Document concerning representation Search / examination 1
17.12.2013 Drawings Search / examination 9
17.12.2013 Request for grant of a European patent Search / examination 4