Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2020085783 | Global Dossier | 19.03.2020 | A1 | Priority number | Date | EP13197854 | 17.12.2013 | WO2014EP03411 | 17.12.2014 | US201415105684 | 17.12.2014 | US201916399432 | 30.04.2019 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2016310462 | Global Dossier | 27.10.2016 | A1 | Priority number | Date | EP13197854 | 17.12.2013 | WO2014EP03411 | 17.12.2014 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP3087172 | Global Dossier | 01.04.2020 | B1 | EP3087172 | 02.11.2016 | A1 | Priority number | Date | EP13197854 | 17.12.2013 | EP14821509 | 17.12.2014 | WO2014EP03411 | 17.12.2014 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2015090591 | Global Dossier | 25.06.2015 | A1 | Priority number | Date | EP13197854 | 17.12.2013 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP2886641 | Global Dossier | 24.06.2015 | A1 | Priority number | Date | EP13197854 | 17.12.2013 |