Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2746521

EP2746521 - Supporting plate of a winding tube of a roller shutter [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  24.06.2016
Database last updated on 21.01.2020
Most recent event   Tooltip19.10.2018Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): AL
published on 21.11.2018  [2018/47]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
BUBENDORFF
24, rue de Paris
68220 Attenschwiller / FR
[2014/26]
Inventor(s)01 / Bubendorf, Robert
48, Rue Wilson
F-68220 Attenschwiller / FR
 [2015/34]
Former [2014/26]01 / Bubendorf, Robert
48, Rue Wilson
F-68220 ATTENSCHWILLER / FR
Representative(s)Faetibold, Emmanuel
Cabinet Bleger-Rhein-Poupon
4A, rue de l'Industrie
67450 Mundolsheim / FR
[N/P]
Former [2015/34]Faetibold, Emmanuel
Cabinet Bleger-Rhein-Poupon
4A rue de l'Industrie
67450 Mundolsheim / FR
Former [2014/26]Faetibold, Emmanuel
Cabinet Bleger-Rhein 17, rue de la Forêt
67550 Vendenheim / FR
Application number, filing date13197880.117.12.2013
[2014/26]
Priority number, dateFR2012006221518.12.2012         Original published format: FR 1262215
[2014/26]
Filing languageFR
Procedural languageFR
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2746521
Date:25.06.2014
Language:FR
[2014/26]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2746521
Date:19.08.2015
Language:FR
[2015/34]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP19.03.2014
ClassificationInternational:E06B9/174, E06B9/72
[2015/17]
Former International [2014/26]E06B9/17, E06B9/174, E06B9/68
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2015/34]
Former [2014/26]AL,  AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  HR,  HU,  IE,  IS,  IT,  LI,  LT,  LU,  LV,  MC,  MK,  MT,  NL,  NO,  PL,  PT,  RO,  RS,  SE,  SI,  SK,  SM,  TR 
TitleGerman:Trägerplatte eines Wickelrohrs eines Rollladens[2014/26]
English:Supporting plate of a winding tube of a roller shutter[2014/26]
French:Joue support d'un tube d'enroulement d'un volet roulant[2014/26]
Examination procedure20.08.2014Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
20.08.2014Examination requested  [2014/40]
10.04.2015Communication of intention to grant the patent
06.07.2015Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
07.07.2015Fee for grant paid
07.07.2015Fee for publishing/printing paid
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  10.04.2015
Opposition(s)20.05.2016No opposition filed within time limit [2016/30]
Lapses during opposition  TooltipHU17.12.2013
AL19.08.2015
AT19.08.2015
BG19.08.2015
CY19.08.2015
CZ19.08.2015
DK19.08.2015
EE19.08.2015
FI19.08.2015
HR19.08.2015
LT19.08.2015
LV19.08.2015
MC19.08.2015
MK19.08.2015
MT19.08.2015
NL19.08.2015
RO19.08.2015
RS19.08.2015
SE19.08.2015
SI19.08.2015
SK19.08.2015
SM19.08.2015
TR19.08.2015
NO19.11.2015
GR20.11.2015
IE17.12.2015
LU17.12.2015
IS19.12.2015
PT21.12.2015
BE31.12.2015
[2018/47]
Former [2018/45]HU17.12.2013
AT19.08.2015
BG19.08.2015
CY19.08.2015
CZ19.08.2015
DK19.08.2015
EE19.08.2015
FI19.08.2015
HR19.08.2015
LT19.08.2015
LV19.08.2015
MC19.08.2015
MK19.08.2015
MT19.08.2015
NL19.08.2015
RO19.08.2015
RS19.08.2015
SE19.08.2015
SI19.08.2015
SK19.08.2015
SM19.08.2015
TR19.08.2015
NO19.11.2015
GR20.11.2015
IE17.12.2015
LU17.12.2015
IS19.12.2015
PT21.12.2015
BE31.12.2015
Former [2018/29]HU17.12.2013
AT19.08.2015
BG19.08.2015
CY19.08.2015
CZ19.08.2015
DK19.08.2015
EE19.08.2015
FI19.08.2015
HR19.08.2015
LT19.08.2015
LV19.08.2015
MC19.08.2015
MK19.08.2015
MT19.08.2015
NL19.08.2015
RO19.08.2015
RS19.08.2015
SE19.08.2015
SI19.08.2015
SK19.08.2015
SM19.08.2015
NO19.11.2015
GR20.11.2015
IE17.12.2015
LU17.12.2015
IS19.12.2015
PT21.12.2015
BE31.12.2015
Former [2017/39]HU17.12.2013
AT19.08.2015
BG19.08.2015
CY19.08.2015
CZ19.08.2015
DK19.08.2015
EE19.08.2015
FI19.08.2015
HR19.08.2015
LT19.08.2015
LV19.08.2015
MC19.08.2015
MT19.08.2015
NL19.08.2015
RO19.08.2015
RS19.08.2015
SE19.08.2015
SI19.08.2015
SK19.08.2015
NO19.11.2015
GR20.11.2015
IE17.12.2015
LU17.12.2015
IS19.12.2015
PT21.12.2015
BE31.12.2015
Former [2016/45]AT19.08.2015
CZ19.08.2015
DK19.08.2015
EE19.08.2015
FI19.08.2015
LT19.08.2015
LV19.08.2015
MC19.08.2015
NL19.08.2015
RO19.08.2015
RS19.08.2015
SE19.08.2015
SI19.08.2015
SK19.08.2015
NO19.11.2015
GR20.11.2015
IE17.12.2015
LU17.12.2015
IS19.12.2015
PT21.12.2015
BE31.12.2015
Former [2016/36]AT19.08.2015
CZ19.08.2015
DK19.08.2015
EE19.08.2015
FI19.08.2015
LT19.08.2015
LV19.08.2015
MC19.08.2015
NL19.08.2015
RO19.08.2015
RS19.08.2015
SE19.08.2015
SI19.08.2015
SK19.08.2015
NO19.11.2015
GR20.11.2015
LU17.12.2015
IS19.12.2015
PT21.12.2015
BE31.12.2015
Former [2016/34]AT19.08.2015
CZ19.08.2015
DK19.08.2015
EE19.08.2015
FI19.08.2015
LT19.08.2015
LV19.08.2015
MC19.08.2015
NL19.08.2015
RO19.08.2015
RS19.08.2015
SE19.08.2015
SK19.08.2015
NO19.11.2015
GR20.11.2015
LU17.12.2015
IS19.12.2015
PT21.12.2015
BE31.12.2015
Former [2016/33]AT19.08.2015
CZ19.08.2015
DK19.08.2015
EE19.08.2015
FI19.08.2015
LT19.08.2015
LV19.08.2015
MC19.08.2015
NL19.08.2015
RO19.08.2015
RS19.08.2015
SE19.08.2015
SK19.08.2015
NO19.11.2015
GR20.11.2015
IS19.12.2015
PT21.12.2015
BE31.12.2015
Former [2016/24]AT19.08.2015
CZ19.08.2015
DK19.08.2015
EE19.08.2015
FI19.08.2015
LT19.08.2015
LV19.08.2015
NL19.08.2015
RO19.08.2015
RS19.08.2015
SE19.08.2015
SK19.08.2015
NO19.11.2015
GR20.11.2015
IS19.12.2015
PT21.12.2015
BE31.12.2015
Former [2016/23]AT19.08.2015
CZ19.08.2015
DK19.08.2015
EE19.08.2015
FI19.08.2015
LT19.08.2015
LV19.08.2015
NL19.08.2015
RO19.08.2015
RS19.08.2015
SE19.08.2015
SK19.08.2015
NO19.11.2015
GR20.11.2015
IS19.12.2015
PT21.12.2015
Former [2016/22]AT19.08.2015
CZ19.08.2015
DK19.08.2015
EE19.08.2015
FI19.08.2015
LT19.08.2015
LV19.08.2015
NL19.08.2015
RS19.08.2015
SE19.08.2015
NO19.11.2015
GR20.11.2015
IS19.12.2015
PT21.12.2015
Former [2016/20]AT19.08.2015
DK19.08.2015
FI19.08.2015
LT19.08.2015
LV19.08.2015
NL19.08.2015
RS19.08.2015
SE19.08.2015
NO19.11.2015
GR20.11.2015
IS19.12.2015
PT21.12.2015
Former [2016/14]AT19.08.2015
FI19.08.2015
LT19.08.2015
LV19.08.2015
NL19.08.2015
RS19.08.2015
SE19.08.2015
NO19.11.2015
GR20.11.2015
IS19.12.2015
PT21.12.2015
Former [2016/11]AT19.08.2015
FI19.08.2015
LT19.08.2015
LV19.08.2015
RS19.08.2015
SE19.08.2015
NO19.11.2015
GR20.11.2015
IS19.12.2015
PT21.12.2015
Former [2016/10]FI19.08.2015
LT19.08.2015
LV19.08.2015
RS19.08.2015
SE19.08.2015
NO19.11.2015
GR20.11.2015
IS19.12.2015
PT21.12.2015
Former [2016/09]FI19.08.2015
LT19.08.2015
LV19.08.2015
NO19.11.2015
GR20.11.2015
Former [2016/08]LT19.08.2015
NO19.11.2015
Former [2016/07]LT19.08.2015
Documents cited:Search[XI]EP1947287  (BUBENDORFF SA [FR]) [X] 1,5 * paragraphs [0018] - [0020] - [0022] , [0025] - [0027] - [0029] - [0032]; figures 1, 3 * [I] 2-4;
 [XI]BE1018808  (RENSON VENTILATION NV [BE]) [X] 1,5 * figures 1, 4, 5; claim 1 * [I] 2-4;
 [A]WO8602970  (GLATZEL DONALD LAWRENCE, et al) [A] 1-5 * page 9, lines 5-16; figures 1, 2 *;
 [A]US2004129849  (WALKER MARK A [US], et al) [A] 1-5 * paragraphs [0020] - [0022]; figures 1-8 *;
 [A]EP1106775  (SIMBAC S P A [IT]) [A] 1-5 * paragraph [0015]; figure 1 *
by applicantFR2550270
 EP1947287
 EP0728904
 BE1018808
 US2004129849
 EP1106775