Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2750056

EP2750056 - Structuring ambiguous structured search queries on online social networks [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusExamination is in progress
Status updated on  29.04.2016
Database last updated on 09.12.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip25.09.2019Change: Date of oral proceedings 
25.09.2019Deletion: Date of cancellation oral proceedings 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Facebook, Inc.
1601 Willow Road
Menlo Park, CA 94025 / US
[2014/27]
Inventor(s)01 / Lee, Yofay Kari
c/o Facebook, Inc.
1601 Willow Road
Menlo Park, CA California 94025 / US
02 / Peiris, Keith L.
c/o Facebook, Inc.
1601 Willow Road
Menlo Park, CA California 94025 / US
03 / Maschmeyer, William R.
c/o Facebook, Inc.
1601 Willow Road
Menlo Park, CA California 94025 / US
04 / Rasmussen, Lars Eilstrup
c/o Facebook, Inc.
1601 Willow Road
Menlo Park, CA California 94025 / US
05 / Duck, Joshua Keith
c/o Facebook, Inc.
1601 Willow Road
Menlo Park, CA California 94025 / US
 [2014/27]
Representative(s)Schröer, Gernot H.
Meissner Bolte Patentanwälte
Rechtsanwälte Partnerschaft mbB
Bankgasse 3
90402 Nürnberg / DE
[N/P]
Former [2014/27]Schröer, Gernot H.
Meissner, Bolte & Partner GbR
Bankgasse 3
90402 Nürnberg / DE
Application number, filing date13197982.518.12.2013
[2014/27]
Priority number, dateUS20121373210131.12.2012         Original published format: US201213732101
[2014/27]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2750056
Date:02.07.2014
Language:EN
[2014/27]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP28.03.2014
ClassificationInternational:G06F17/30, G06Q50/00
[2014/27]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2014/27]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
TitleGerman:Strukturierung unklar strukturierter Suchanfragen auf sozialen Online-Netzwerken[2014/27]
English:Structuring ambiguous structured search queries on online social networks[2014/27]
French:Structuration des interrogations de recherche structurée ambiguës sur des réseaux sociaux en ligne[2014/27]
Examination procedure30.12.2014Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
30.12.2014Examination requested  [2015/08]
18.12.2015Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
27.04.2016Reply to a communication from the examining division
09.11.2016Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 11.11.2016
11.11.2016Date of oral proceedings (cancelled)
22.11.2016Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination {1}
Appeal following examination25.01.2017Appeal received No.  T1089/17
03.04.2017Statement of grounds filed
07.02.2020Date of oral proceedings
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  18.12.2015
Fees paidRenewal fee
10.12.2015Renewal fee patent year 03
13.12.2016Renewal fee patent year 04
12.12.2017Renewal fee patent year 05
31.12.2018Renewal fee patent year 06
Documents cited:Search[I]US2012059708  (GALAS DANIEL [US], et al) [I] 1-14 * paragraphs [0025] - [0026] - [0 56] , [0 96] *;
 [A]  - SEBASTIAN MARIUS KIRSCH ET AL, Beyond the Web: Retrieval in Social Information Spaces, ADVANCES IN INFORMATION RETRIEVAL LECTURE NOTES IN COMPUTER SCIENCE;;LNCS, SPRINGER, BERLIN, DE, PAGE(S) 84 - 95, (20060101), ISBN 978-3-540-33347-0, XP019030207 [A] 1-14 * the whole document *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1007/11735106_9
 [I]  - RENAUD DELBRU ET AL, "Searching web data: An entity retrieval and high-performance indexing model", WEB SEMANTICS: SCIENCE, SERVICES AND AGENTS ON THE WORLD WIDE WEB, (20110513), vol. 10, doi:10.1016/j.websem.2011.04.004, ISSN 1570-8268, pages 33 - 58, XP055093888 [I] 1-14 * page 48, column 2, paragraphs 3-4 * * page 35, column 1, paragraphs 1-3; figure 6 * * page 40, column 1, paragraph 5 *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.websem.2011.04.004
by applicantUS20060503093
 US20100977027
 US20100978265