EP2712519 - Connecting device and method for creating a connection between a first component and a second component [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 25.09.2020 Database last updated on 23.04.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 25.05.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.10.2023 | New entry: Reply to examination report | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Baur, Franz Hochsträss 13 87534 Oberstaufen / DE | For all designated states Haser, Franz Buchenegg 5 87534 Oberstaufen / DE | For all designated states Lamello AG Hauptstrasse 149 4416 Bubendorf / CH | [2014/14] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Baur, Franz Hochsträss 13 87534 Oberstaufen / DE | 02 /
Haser, Franz Buchenegg 5 87534 Oberstaufen / DE | 03 /
Schneider, Wilfried Gstaltenstrasse 20 4416 Bubendorf / CH | 04 /
Jeker, Patrick Lüttengraben 14 4225 Brislach / CH | [2014/14] | Representative(s) | DTS Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Schnekenbühl und Partner mbB Brienner Straße 1 80333 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2014/14] | Hoeger, Stellrecht & Partner Patentanwälte Uhlandstrasse 14c 70182 Stuttgart / DE | Application number, filing date | 13198396.7 | 03.05.2008 | [2014/14] | Priority number, date | EP20070009267 | 08.05.2007 Original published format: EP 07009267 | [2014/14] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2712519 | Date: | 02.04.2014 | Language: | DE | [2014/14] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP2712519 | Date: | 22.11.2017 | Language: | DE | [2017/47] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 19.10.2017 | Classification | IPC: | A47B87/00, F16B12/20 | [2014/14] | CPC: |
B23C3/30 (EP,US);
B23C3/34 (US);
B23C5/08 (EP,US);
B23C5/1054 (EP,US);
B23C5/14 (US);
B27F5/023 (EP,US);
F16B12/2036 (EP,US);
A47B2230/0059 (EP,US);
A47B2230/0062 (EP,US);
A47B2230/0077 (US);
A47B87/002 (EP,US);
B23C2220/36 (US);
B23C2220/40 (US);
B23C2270/18 (US);
F16B2200/30 (EP,US);
Y10T29/49826 (EP,US);
Y10T403/55 (EP,US);
Y10T403/553 (EP,US);
Y10T403/59 (EP,US);
Y10T403/61 (EP,US);
Y10T403/7009 (EP,US);
Y10T407/19 (EP,US);
Y10T409/303752 (EP,US);
Y10T409/304424 (EP,US);
Y10T409/306216 (EP,US);
Y10T409/30644 (EP,US);
Y10T409/306552 (EP,US);
Y10T409/30672 (EP,US);
Y10T409/307056 (EP,US);
Y10T409/30784 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2018/26] |
Former [2014/14] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Verbindungsmittel und Verfahren zum Herstellen einer Verbindung eines ersten Bauteils und eines zweiten Bauteils | [2014/14] | English: | Connecting device and method for creating a connection between a first component and a second component | [2014/14] | French: | Moyen d'attache et procédé de fabrication d'une liaison entre un premier composant et un second | [2014/14] | Examination procedure | 19.12.2013 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 22.05.2018 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 22.05.2018 | Examination requested [2018/26] | 24.09.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 22.01.2021 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 31.05.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 13.01.2022 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 21.03.2022 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 30.06.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 25.10.2023 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP08749312.8 / EP2142042 | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued (EP20080749312) is 03.04.2012 | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the examination report | 21.03.2022 | Request for further processing filed | 21.03.2022 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 30.03.2022 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.12.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 19.12.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 19.12.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 19.12.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 26.05.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 19.05.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 22.03.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 29.05.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 23.05.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 27.05.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | 31.03.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 13 | 28.05.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 14 | 19.05.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 15 | 17.05.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 16 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]US1427658 (HENRI VENTRE) [X] 1-9,14,15 * the whole document * [I] 10-13; | [XI]DE1803365 (MARSTRAND EVEN) [X] 1-9,14,15 * the whole document * [I] 10-13; | [XI]US3813118 (LIBER M) [X] 1-9,14,15 * the whole document * [I] 10-13; | [XI]US3964511 (CATTERMOLE DAVID CHRISTOPHER) [X] 1-9,14,15 * the whole document *[I] 10-13; | [AD]DE19604243 (KNAPP GMBH FRIEDRICH [DE]) [AD] 1-15 * the whole document *; | [AD]DE19807663 (BAUR [DE], et al) [AD] 10,11 * the whole document * | by applicant | DE19604243 | DE19807663 |