blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

Deep link introduced in Malta Register

Click here for more information on the deep linking.

2019.01.28

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

All documents: EP2752620 Dossier alert: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):   EP2752620



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated






Date Document type Procedure Number of pages
Total number of pages: 292
24.05.2018 Communication regarding the expiry of opposition period Search / examination 1
20.07.2017 Transmission of the certificate Search / examination 1
22.06.2017 Decision to grant a European patent Search / examination 2
07.06.2017 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 2
07.06.2017 English translation of the claims Search / examination 3
07.06.2017 French translation of claims Search / examination 3
07.06.2017 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 2
28.03.2017 Bibliographic data of the European patent application Search / examination 2
28.03.2017 Communication about intention to grant a European patent Search / examination 5
28.03.2017 Intention to grant (signatures) Search / examination 1
28.03.2017 Text intended for grant Search / examination 36
28.03.2017 Text intended for grant (clean copy) Search / examination 36
01.03.2017 Examination started Search / examination 1
24.10.2016 Notification regarding date of start of examination with possibility to withdraw Search / examination 1
07.09.2015 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 2
07.09.2015 Amended claims with annotations Search / examination 1
07.09.2015 Amended description with annotations Search / examination 1
07.09.2015 Claims Search / examination 1
07.09.2015 Description Search / examination 1
07.09.2015 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
07.09.2015 Matter concerning the application Search / examination 2
03.02.2015 Statement of non-availability of priority search results Search / examination 1
30.01.2015 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
30.01.2015 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
30.01.2015 Statement of non-availability of priority search results Search / examination 1
28.01.2015 Invitation to file a copy of search results(priority) Search / examination 1
05.01.2015 Amended description filed after receipt of (European) search report Search / examination 10
05.01.2015 Amendments received before examination Search / examination 6
05.01.2015 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
05.01.2015 Matter concerning the application Search / examination 1
31.12.2014 Amended claims filed after receipt of (European) search report Search / examination 3
31.12.2014 Amended claims with annotations Search / examination 5
31.12.2014 Amended description filed after receipt of (European) search report Search / examination 10
31.12.2014 Amended description with annotations Search / examination 9
31.12.2014 Amendments received before examination Search / examination 6
30.12.2014 Amended claims filed after receipt of (European) search report Search / examination 3
30.12.2014 Amended claims with annotations Search / examination 5
30.12.2014 Amended description with annotations Search / examination 9
30.12.2014 Amendments received before examination Search / examination 6
30.12.2014 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
30.12.2014 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
30.09.2014 Communication of amended entries concerning the representative Search / examination 1
10.09.2014 Request for change of applicant's representative Search / examination 6
14.07.2014 Reminder period for payment of examination fee/designation fee and correction of deficiencies in Written Opinion/amendment Search / examination 2
12.06.2014 Notification of forthcoming publication Search / examination 2
17.03.2014 Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report Search / examination 1
17.03.2014 European search opinion Search / examination 5
17.03.2014 European search report Search / examination 2
15.01.2014 Letter concerning the priority Search / examination 1
15.01.2014 Priority document Search / examination 38
19.12.2013 Abstract Search / examination 1
19.12.2013 Acknowledgement of receipt of electronic submission of the request for grant of a European patent Search / examination 2
19.12.2013 Claims Search / examination 5
19.12.2013 Description Search / examination 21
19.12.2013 Designation of inventor Search / examination 1
19.12.2013 Designation of inventor Search / examination 1
19.12.2013 Designation of inventor Search / examination 1
19.12.2013 Document concerning representation Search / examination 1
19.12.2013 Drawings Search / examination 10
19.12.2013 Request for grant of a European patent Search / examination 5