blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

Deep link introduced in Malta Register

Click here for more information on the deep linking.

2019.01.28

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

Patent family: EP2752620 Family dossiers alerts: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):  

CN201310723853 EP13198505 EP15154581 EP15154582 EP15154583



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated





TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
EP2930425Global Dossier 04.07.2018B1
EP2930425 14.10.2015A1
Priority number Date
DE102013200016 02.01.2013
EP13198505 19.12.2013
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
EP2916073Global Dossier 20.02.2019B1
EP2916073 09.09.2015A1
Priority number Date
DE102013200016 02.01.2013
EP13198505 19.12.2013
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
EP2916072Global Dossier 13.06.2018B1
EP2916072 09.09.2015A1
Priority number Date
DE102013200016 02.01.2013
EP13198505 19.12.2013
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
PL2752620T 29.12.2017T3
Priority number Date
DE102013200016 02.01.2013
EP13198505 19.12.2013
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
PL2916072T 31.05.2019T3
Priority number Date
DE102013200016 02.01.2013
EP13198505 19.12.2013
EP15154581 19.12.2013
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
PL2930425T 31.12.2018T3
Priority number Date
DE102013200016 02.01.2013
EP13198505 19.12.2013
EP15154583 19.12.2013
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
US2014186782Global Dossier 03.07.2014A1
Priority number Date
DE102013200016 02.01.2013
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
JP6253404BGlobal Dossier 27.12.2017B2
JP2014132215 17.07.2014A
Priority number Date
DE102013200016 02.01.2013
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
CN103912890BGlobal Dossier 17.11.2017B
CN103912890 09.07.2014A
Priority number Date
DE102013200016 02.01.2013
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
EP2752620Global Dossier 19.07.2017B1
EP2752620 09.07.2014A1
Priority number Date
DE102013200016 02.01.2013
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
DE102013200016 03.07.2014A1
Priority number Date
DE102013200016 02.01.2013
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
RU2573862 27.01.2016C2
RU2013156815 27.06.2015A
Priority number Date
DE102013200016 02.01.2013
TypeType Divisional application
 EP2916072
 EP2916073
 EP2930425