Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2752620

EP2752620 - Catalytic burner, particularly for a vehicle heating system [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  25.05.2018
Database last updated on 22.06.2019
FormerThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  16.06.2017
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  27.03.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip21.06.2019Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): MC
published on 24.07.2019 [2019/30]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Eberspächer Climate Control Systems GmbH & Co. KG
Eberspächer Strasse 24
73730 Esslingen / DE
[2014/28]
Inventor(s)01 / Eberspach, Günter
Seestraße 9
72649 Wolfschlugen / DE
02 / Beetz, Klaus
Liedolsheimer Ring 23
76149 Karlsruhe / DE
03 / Pfister, Wolfgang
Wittumhalde 2
73732 Esslingen / DE
 [2014/28]
Representative(s)Ruttensperger Lachnit Trossin Gomoll
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte
PartG mbB
Postfach 20 16 55
80016 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2014/44]RLTG
Ruttensperger Lachnit Trossin Gomoll
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte
Postfach 20 16 55
80016 München / DE
Former [2014/28]Ruttensperger, Bernhard , et al
Weickmann & Weickmann Patentanwälte Postfach 86 08 20
81635 München / DE
Application number, filing date13198505.319.12.2013
[2014/28]
Priority number, dateDE20131020001602.01.2013         Original published format: DE102013200016
[2014/28]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2752620
Date:09.07.2014
Language:DE
[2014/28]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2752620
Date:19.07.2017
Language:DE
[2017/29]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP17.03.2014
ClassificationInternational:F23C13/06, F23D5/12
[2014/28]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2017/29]
Former [2014/28]AL,  AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  HR,  HU,  IE,  IS,  IT,  LI,  LT,  LU,  LV,  MC,  MK,  MT,  NL,  NO,  PL,  PT,  RO,  RS,  SE,  SI,  SK,  SM,  TR 
TitleGerman:Katalytischer Brenner, insbesondere für eine Fahrzeugheizung[2014/28]
English:Catalytic burner, particularly for a vehicle heating system[2014/28]
French:Brûleur catalytique, notamment pour un chauffage de véhicule[2014/28]
Examination procedure30.12.2014Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
09.01.2015Examination requested  [2015/09]
28.03.2017Communication of intention to grant the patent
07.06.2017Fee for grant paid
07.06.2017Fee for publishing/printing paid
07.06.2017Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Divisional application(s)EP15154581.1  / EP2916072
EP15154582.9  / EP2916073
EP15154583.7  / EP2930425
The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  28.03.2017
Opposition(s)20.04.2018No opposition filed within time limit [2018/26]
Fees paidRenewal fee
04.01.2016Renewal fee patent year 03
02.01.2017Renewal fee patent year 04
Lapses during opposition  TooltipCZ19.07.2017
DK19.07.2017
EE19.07.2017
ES19.07.2017
FI19.07.2017
HR19.07.2017
IT19.07.2017
LT19.07.2017
LV19.07.2017
MC19.07.2017
MT19.07.2017
NL19.07.2017
RO19.07.2017
RS19.07.2017
SI19.07.2017
SK19.07.2017
SM19.07.2017
BG19.10.2017
NO19.10.2017
GR20.10.2017
IS19.11.2017
IE19.12.2017
LU19.12.2017
BE31.12.2017
CH31.12.2017
LI31.12.2017
[2019/30]
Former [2018/52]CZ19.07.2017
DK19.07.2017
EE19.07.2017
ES19.07.2017
FI19.07.2017
HR19.07.2017
IT19.07.2017
LT19.07.2017
LV19.07.2017
MT19.07.2017
NL19.07.2017
RO19.07.2017
RS19.07.2017
SI19.07.2017
SK19.07.2017
SM19.07.2017
BG19.10.2017
NO19.10.2017
GR20.10.2017
IS19.11.2017
IE19.12.2017
LU19.12.2017
BE31.12.2017
CH31.12.2017
LI31.12.2017
Former [2018/50]CZ19.07.2017
DK19.07.2017
EE19.07.2017
ES19.07.2017
FI19.07.2017
HR19.07.2017
IT19.07.2017
LT19.07.2017
LV19.07.2017
MT19.07.2017
NL19.07.2017
RO19.07.2017
RS19.07.2017
SI19.07.2017
SK19.07.2017
SM19.07.2017
BG19.10.2017
NO19.10.2017
GR20.10.2017
IS19.11.2017
IE19.12.2017
LU19.12.2017
BE31.12.2017
Former [2018/45]CZ19.07.2017
DK19.07.2017
EE19.07.2017
ES19.07.2017
FI19.07.2017
HR19.07.2017
IT19.07.2017
LT19.07.2017
LV19.07.2017
MT19.07.2017
NL19.07.2017
RO19.07.2017
RS19.07.2017
SI19.07.2017
SK19.07.2017
SM19.07.2017
BG19.10.2017
NO19.10.2017
GR20.10.2017
IS19.11.2017
IE19.12.2017
LU19.12.2017
Former [2018/43]CZ19.07.2017
DK19.07.2017
EE19.07.2017
ES19.07.2017
FI19.07.2017
HR19.07.2017
IT19.07.2017
LT19.07.2017
LV19.07.2017
MT19.07.2017
NL19.07.2017
RO19.07.2017
RS19.07.2017
SI19.07.2017
SK19.07.2017
SM19.07.2017
BG19.10.2017
NO19.10.2017
GR20.10.2017
IS19.11.2017
LU19.12.2017
Former [2018/39]CZ19.07.2017
DK19.07.2017
EE19.07.2017
ES19.07.2017
FI19.07.2017
HR19.07.2017
IT19.07.2017
LT19.07.2017
LV19.07.2017
NL19.07.2017
RO19.07.2017
RS19.07.2017
SI19.07.2017
SK19.07.2017
SM19.07.2017
BG19.10.2017
NO19.10.2017
GR20.10.2017
IS19.11.2017
Former [2018/24]CZ19.07.2017
DK19.07.2017
EE19.07.2017
ES19.07.2017
FI19.07.2017
HR19.07.2017
IT19.07.2017
LT19.07.2017
LV19.07.2017
NL19.07.2017
RO19.07.2017
RS19.07.2017
SK19.07.2017
SM19.07.2017
BG19.10.2017
NO19.10.2017
GR20.10.2017
IS19.11.2017
Former [2018/21]CZ19.07.2017
DK19.07.2017
ES19.07.2017
FI19.07.2017
HR19.07.2017
LT19.07.2017
LV19.07.2017
NL19.07.2017
RS19.07.2017
BG19.10.2017
NO19.10.2017
GR20.10.2017
IS19.11.2017
Former [2018/12]ES19.07.2017
FI19.07.2017
HR19.07.2017
LT19.07.2017
LV19.07.2017
NL19.07.2017
RS19.07.2017
BG19.10.2017
NO19.10.2017
GR20.10.2017
IS19.11.2017
Former [2018/11]ES19.07.2017
FI19.07.2017
HR19.07.2017
LT19.07.2017
NL19.07.2017
RS19.07.2017
BG19.10.2017
NO19.10.2017
GR20.10.2017
IS19.11.2017
Former [2018/08]FI19.07.2017
LT19.07.2017
NL19.07.2017
NO19.10.2017
Former [2018/07]LT19.07.2017
NO19.10.2017
Documents cited:Search[XYI]DE19950894  (EBERSPAECHER J GMBH & CO [DE]) [X] 1-6,8 * column 2, line 32 - column 4, line 65 * * figures 1,2 * [Y] 13,17-19,22 [I] 7,9-12,14-16,20,21;
 [XI]WO2006074622  (WEBASTO AG FAHRZEUGTECHNIK [DE], et al) [X] 1,2,9 * page 14, line 9 - page 16, line 22 * * figures 1,2 * [I] 3-8,10-22;
 [YD]WO2007003649  (ZEMISSION AB [SE], et al) [YD] 13,19,22 * page 2, line 22 - page 11, line 32 * * figures 1,2 *;
 [Y]EP1970624  (EBERSPAECHER J GMBH & CO [DE]) [Y] 17,18 * page 3, paragraph 17 - page 7, paragraph 26 * * figures 1-3 *;
 [Y]WO2010074767  (VACCA INC [US]) [Y] 17,18 * page 10, paragraph 127 - page 25, paragraph 171 * * figures 1,2 *;
 [A]FR2329936  (FOND FRANCO BELGES [FR]) [A] 1-22 * page 1, line 33 - page 4, line 17 * * figures 1,2 *
by applicantWO2007003649