EP2745906 - Method for the mechanical separation of solids from waste water [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 24.08.2018 Database last updated on 23.04.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 16.01.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.08.2018 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 26.09.2018 [2018/39] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Gassner, Kurt Untermallebarn 58 2011 Sierndorf / AT | [2014/26] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [2014/26] | Representative(s) | Babeluk, Michael Patentanwalt Florianigasse 26/3 1080 Wien / AT | [N/P] |
Former [2014/26] | Babeluk, Michael Patentanwalt Mariahilfer Gürtel 39/17 1150 Wien / AT | Application number, filing date | 13198699.4 | 20.12.2013 | [2014/26] | Priority number, date | AT20120050611 | 21.12.2012 Original published format: AT 506112012 | [2014/26] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2745906 | Date: | 25.06.2014 | Language: | DE | [2014/26] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 13.03.2014 | Classification | IPC: | B01D33/04, B01D33/067, B01D33/21, B01D33/46, B01D33/50, B01D33/68, B01D33/80, B01D29/09, B01D29/60, B01D29/64, B01D29/68, B01D29/86 | [2014/26] | CPC: |
B01D29/09 (EP);
B01D29/605 (EP);
B01D29/6484 (EP);
B01D29/684 (EP);
B01D29/865 (EP);
B01D33/04 (EP);
B01D33/067 (EP);
B01D33/21 (EP);
B01D33/466 (EP);
B01D33/50 (EP);
B01D33/68 (EP);
B01D33/807 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2014/26] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Mechanischen Feststoffabscheidung aus Abwasser | [2014/26] | English: | Method for the mechanical separation of solids from waste water | [2014/26] | French: | Procédé de séparation mécanique de solides dans les eaux usées | [2014/26] | Examination procedure | 16.12.2014 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 16.12.2014 | Examination requested [2015/04] | 12.09.2016 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 11.01.2017 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 11.10.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 24.04.2018 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2018/39] | 16.05.2018 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2018/39] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 12.09.2016 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 17.12.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 21.12.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 21.12.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]EP0590749 (MATSURA MANUFACTURING CO LTD [JP], et al) [X] 9,12 * the whole document * [Y] 1-4,7,8,10,11,13,14; | [Y]FR1542227 (BOWSER INC) [Y] 1-4,7,8,10,11,13,14 * the whole document *; | [XI]EP2508240 (KIM KYU TAE [KR]) [X] 9 * figures 5,6 * [I] 10,14; | [A]DE3641658 (ALLWEILER AG [DE]) [A] 1-14 * the whole document * |