Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2887779

EP2887779 - Silver wire bonding on printed circuit boards and IC-substrates [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  27.05.2016
Database last updated on 25.01.2020
Most recent event   Tooltip27.05.2016Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 29.06.2016  [2016/26]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Atotech Deutschland GmbH
Erasmusstrasse 20
10553 Berlin / DE
[2015/26]
Inventor(s)01 / Özkök, Mustafa
Heerstrasse 592
13591 Berlin / DE
02 / Ramos, Gustavo
Leipziger Strasse 44
10117 Berlin / DE
 [2015/26]
Representative(s)Wonnemann, Jörg
Atotech Deutschland GmbH Patent Management Erasmusstrasse 20
10553 Berlin / DE
[2015/26]
Application number, filing date13198900.620.12.2013
[2015/26]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2887779
Date:24.06.2015
Language:EN
[2015/26]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP10.06.2014
ClassificationInternational:H05K3/24, H01L23/00
[2015/26]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2015/26]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
TitleGerman:Silberdrahtbonden auf Druckleiterplatten und IC-Substraten[2015/26]
English:Silver wire bonding on printed circuit boards and IC-substrates[2015/26]
French:Liaison de fil d'argent sur des cartes de circuits imprimés et substrat de circuit imprimé[2015/26]
Examination procedure20.12.2013Examination requested  [2015/26]
05.01.2016Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2016/26]
03.02.2016Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time  [2016/26]
Fees paidRenewal fee
22.12.2015Renewal fee patent year 03
Documents cited:Search[Y]US2013288475  (OEZKOEK MUSTAFA [DE], et al) [Y] 1,2,4-7,9-15 * claims 1-3,8,15,16 * * paragraphs [0003] , [0005] , [0026] , [0036] *;
 [YD]WO2013076548  (MICROBONDS INC [CA]) [YD] 1-15 * claims 1,2,6 * * paragraphs [0013] - [0016] *;
 [YD]US2007104929  (YIM KYU H [KR], et al) [YD] 3,8 * claims 1,4,5 * * paragraphs [0065] , [0076] * * tables 3,5 *;
 [A]US2005048798  (BOJKOV CHRISTO P [US], et al) [A] 1-15 * claims 6,7,10 * * paragraphs [0033] - [0034] *
by applicantUS5235139
 US6733823
 US2007104929
 US2006055023
 US5175609
 EP0697805
 US2012186852
 US5882736
 US5292361
 US4424241
 US4341846
 US4279951
 US4255194
 DE19745601
 US2008277140
 US2008138507
 WO2013076548