Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2887655

EP2887655 - Adaptive colour filter for digital sensor [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  02.11.2018
Database last updated on 22.07.2019
FormerExamination is in progress
Status updated on  30.12.2016
Most recent event   Tooltip02.11.2018Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 05.12.2018  [2018/49]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Swiss Timing Ltd.
Rue de l'Envers 1
2606 Corgémont / CH
[2015/26]
Inventor(s)01 / Richard, Pascal
Chemin du Milieu 4
2606 Corgémont / CH
02 / Blondeau, Fabien
Ch. des Bassins 10
2054 Chézard St-Martin / CH
 [2015/26]
Representative(s)Goulette, Ludivine , et al
ICB
Ingénieurs Conseils en Brevets SA
Faubourg de l'Hôpital 3
2001 Neuchâtel / CH
[N/P]
Former [2015/26]Gilligmann, Benoît Philippe , et al
ICB
Ingénieurs Conseils en Brevets SA
Faubourg de l'Hôpital 3
2001 Neuchâtel / CH
Application number, filing date13199039.220.12.2013
[2015/26]
Filing languageFR
Procedural languageFR
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2887655
Date:24.06.2015
Language:FR
[2015/26]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP23.04.2014
ClassificationInternational:H04N9/04
[2015/26]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2016/08]
Former [2015/26]AL,  AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  HR,  HU,  IE,  IS,  IT,  LI,  LT,  LU,  LV,  MC,  MK,  MT,  NL,  NO,  PL,  PT,  RO,  RS,  SE,  SI,  SK,  SM,  TR 
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
TitleGerman:Adaptiver Farbfilter für digitalen Sensor[2015/26]
English:Adaptive colour filter for digital sensor[2015/26]
French:Filtre couleur adaptatif pour capteur numérique[2015/26]
Examination procedure25.11.2015Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
04.01.2016Examination requested  [2016/08]
04.01.2017Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
11.04.2017Reply to a communication from the examining division
03.07.2018Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2018/49]
27.07.2018Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time  [2018/49]
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  04.01.2017
Fees paidRenewal fee
23.12.2015Renewal fee patent year 03
22.12.2016Renewal fee patent year 04
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
31.12.201705   M06   Not yet paid
Documents cited:Search[XY]US2010253833  (DEEVER AARON T [US], et al) [X] 1-7 * paragraphs [0002] , [0050] , [0086] , [0091] , [0119] - [0129]; figures 7,19 * [Y] 8;
 [X]US2013286262  (HAYASHI KENKICHI [JP], et al) [X] 1-3,6-7 * figure 9 *;
 [X]US2012098975  (CHAO CALVIN YI-PING [TW], et al) [X] 1,3-7 * paragraphs [0033] , [0034] , [0083]; figures 1,20,21, 26 *;
 [DA]EP0898249  (OMEGA ELECTRONICS SA [CH]) [DA] 9-10 * the whole document *;
 [A]EP0516449  (SONY CORP [JP]) [A] 9-10 * claim 2 *
 [Y]  - "Manual MacFinish 2D 100", (20121231), URL: http://www.timetronics.be/Manuals/2012v1 Manual MacFinish 2D 100 English.pdf, (20140409), XP055113153 [Y] 8 * pages 20-23 *
by applicantEP0898249