Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2887656

EP2887656 - Method for adjusting a colour filter for a digital sensor [Right-click to bookmark this link]
Former [2015/26]Method for adjusting a colour filter for a digital sensor and related filter
[2019/26]
StatusGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  11.06.2019
Database last updated on 15.07.2019
FormerExamination is in progress
Status updated on  13.01.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip11.06.2019New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Swiss Timing Ltd.
Rue de l'Envers 1
2606 Corgémont / CH
[2015/26]
Inventor(s)01 / Richard, Pascal
Chemin du Milieu 4
2606 Corgémont / CH
02 / Blondeau, Fabien
Ch. des Bassins 10
2054 Chézard St-Martin / CH
03 / Müller, Jens Hermann
Trufanowst.31
04105 Leipzig / DE
04 / Gress, Oliver
Arno-Nietzsche-Str.19
04277 Leipzig / DE
 [2015/26]
Representative(s)Goulette, Ludivine , et al
ICB
Ingénieurs Conseils en Brevets SA
Faubourg de l'Hôpital 3
2001 Neuchâtel / CH
[N/P]
Former [2015/26]Gilligmann, Benoît Philippe , et al
ICB
Ingénieurs Conseils en Brevets SA
Faubourg de l'Hôpital 3
2001 Neuchâtel / CH
Application number, filing date13199041.820.12.2013
[2015/26]
Filing languageFR
Procedural languageFR
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2887656
Date:24.06.2015
Language:FR
[2015/26]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP29.04.2014
ClassificationInternational:H04N9/04, H04N5/369, G02B5/20
[2019/26]
Former International [2015/26]H04N9/04
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2016/08]
Former [2015/26]AL,  AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  HR,  HU,  IE,  IS,  IT,  LI,  LT,  LU,  LV,  MC,  MK,  MT,  NL,  NO,  PL,  PT,  RO,  RS,  SE,  SI,  SK,  SM,  TR 
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
TitleGerman:Justiermethode eines Farbfilters für einen digitalen Sensor[2019/26]
English:Method for adjusting a colour filter for a digital sensor[2019/26]
French:Méthode pour l'ajustement d'un filtre couleur pour capteur numérique[2019/26]
Former [2015/26]Justiermethode eines Farbfilters für einen digitalen Sensor, und entsprechender Filter
Former [2015/26]Method for adjusting a colour filter for a digital sensor and related filter
Former [2015/26]Méthode pour l'ajustement d'un filtre couleur pour capteur numérique et filtre associé
Examination procedure26.11.2015Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
04.01.2016Examination requested  [2016/08]
17.01.2017Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
23.06.2017Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time
24.08.2017Reply to a communication from the examining division
01.10.2018Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
06.02.2019Reply to a communication from the examining division
12.06.2019Communication of intention to grant the patent
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  17.01.2017
Request for further processing for:The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the examination report
24.08.2017Request for further processing filed
24.08.2017Full payment received (date of receipt of payment)
Request granted
01.09.2017Decision despatched
Fees paidRenewal fee
23.12.2015Renewal fee patent year 03
22.12.2016Renewal fee patent year 04
21.12.2017Renewal fee patent year 05
20.12.2018Renewal fee patent year 06
Documents cited:Search[XYI]JPS6477288  (CANON KK) [X] 1-4 * abstract * * figure 2 * [Y] 6 [I] 5;
 [X]US2007024931  (COMPTON JOHN T [US], et al) [X] 1-3 * paragraph [0076]; figure 11D *;
 [AD]EP0898249  (OMEGA ELECTRONICS SA [CH]) [AD] 7-13 * the whole document *;
 [A]EP0516449  (SONY CORP [JP]) [A] 7-13 * claim 2 *
 [Y]  - "Manual MacFinish 2D 100", (20121231), URL: http://www.timetronics.be/Manuals/2012v1 Manual MacFinish 2D 100 English.pdf, (20140409), XP055113153 [Y] 6 * pages 20-23 *
by applicantEP0898249