blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

Deep link introduced in Malta Register

Click here for more information on the deep linking.

2019.01.28

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

All documents: EP2887656 Dossier alert: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):   EP2887656



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated






Date Document type Procedure Number of pages
Total number of pages: 169
12.06.2019 Bibliographic data of the European patent application Search / examination 2
12.06.2019 Communication about intention to grant a European patent Search / examination 5
12.06.2019 Intention to grant (signatures) Search / examination 1
12.06.2019 Text intended for grant Search / examination 23
12.06.2019 Text intended for grant (clean copy) Search / examination 23
06.02.2019 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
06.02.2019 Amended claims with annotations Search / examination 3
06.02.2019 Claims Search / examination 3
06.02.2019 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
06.02.2019 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 2
01.10.2018 Annex to the communication Search / examination 3
01.10.2018 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 2
01.09.2017 Decision to allow further processing Search / examination 1
24.08.2017 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
24.08.2017 Amended claims with annotations Search / examination 4
24.08.2017 Claims Search / examination 3
24.08.2017 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 2
24.08.2017 Request for further processing Search / examination 2
23.06.2017 Application deemed to be withdrawn (no reply to communication from the Examining Division) Search / examination 1
17.01.2017 Annex to the communication Search / examination 3
17.01.2017 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 2
09.01.2017 Examination started Search / examination 1
24.10.2016 Notification regarding date of start of examination with possibility to withdraw Search / examination 1
08.07.2016 Request for change of applicant's representative Search / examination 4
10.12.2015 Communication of amended entries concerning the representative Search / examination 1
27.11.2015 Claims Search / examination 3
27.11.2015 Claims Search / examination 3
27.11.2015 Letter filed before dispatch of the 1st communication from the Examining Division(examination procedure) Search / examination 2
26.11.2015 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
26.11.2015 Amended claims filed after receipt of (European) search report Search / examination 3
26.11.2015 Amended claims with annotations Search / examination 3
26.11.2015 Amendments received before examination Search / examination 2
26.11.2015 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
29.06.2015 Reminder period for payment of examination fee/designation fee and correction of deficiencies in Written Opinion/amendment Search / examination 2
28.05.2015 Notification of forthcoming publication Search / examination 2
13.11.2014 Brief communication to applicant/representative (Legal Division) Search / examination 1
24.10.2014 Letter concerning the inventor Search / examination 1
20.10.2014 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
20.10.2014 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
20.10.2014 Letter concerning the inventor Search / examination 1
17.10.2014 Designation of inventor Search / examination 1
17.10.2014 Letter concerning the inventor Search / examination 1
10.10.2014 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
10.10.2014 Designation of inventor Search / examination 1
10.10.2014 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
10.10.2014 Letter concerning the inventor Search / examination 1
29.04.2014 Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report Search / examination 1
29.04.2014 European search opinion Search / examination 3
29.04.2014 European search report Search / examination 2
11.04.2014 Search started Search / examination 1
20.12.2013 Abstract Search / examination 1
20.12.2013 Acknowledgement of receipt of electronic submission of the request for grant of a European patent Search / examination 2
20.12.2013 Claims Search / examination 3
20.12.2013 Description Search / examination 18
20.12.2013 Designation of inventor Search / examination 1
20.12.2013 Designation of inventor Search / examination 1
20.12.2013 Drawings Search / examination 2
20.12.2013 Request for grant of a European patent Search / examination 6