blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

Deep link introduced in Malta Register

Click here for more information on the deep linking.

2019.01.28

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

Event history: EP2887656


Date  Description European Patent Bulletin date, issue number
11.06.2019 New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent
24.05.2019 Change - classification published on  26.06.2019  [2019/26]
24.05.2019 Change - classification published on  26.06.2019  [2019/26]
24.05.2019 Change - German title published on  26.06.2019  [2019/26]
24.05.2019 Change - English title published on  26.06.2019  [2019/26]
24.05.2019 Change - French title published on  26.06.2019  [2019/26]
08.02.2019 New entry: Reply to examination report
02.01.2019 New entry: Renewal fee paid
10.10.2018 New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit
03.01.2018 New entry: Renewal fee paid
02.09.2017 New entry: Decision on request for further processing
01.09.2017 New entry: Receipt of request for further processing
01.09.2017 New entry: Fee payment for request for further processing
25.08.2017 New entry: Reply to examination report
22.06.2017 New entry: Application deemed to be withdrawn: despatch of communication + time limit
27.01.2017 New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit
13.01.2017 First examination report
03.01.2017 New entry: Renewal fee paid
22.01.2016 Change - designated states published on  24.02.2016  [2016/08]
22.01.2016 Change - request for examination published on  24.02.2016  [2016/08]
05.01.2016 New entry: Renewal fee paid
07.12.2015 Change - representative
01.12.2015 Amendment by applicant
23.06.2015 Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin published on  24.06.2015  [2015/26]
22.05.2015 Request for examination filed published on  24.06.2015  [2015/26]