Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2793295

EP2793295 - Rechargeable battery [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  03.11.2017
Database last updated on 18.05.2019
FormerRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  26.07.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip03.11.2017Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 06.12.2017  [2017/49]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Samsung SDI Co., Ltd.
150-20, Gongse-ro, Giheung-gu
Yongin-si, Gyeonggi-do / KR
[2014/43]
Inventor(s)01 / Han, Min-Yeol
Legal & IP Team
Samsung SDI Co., Ltd.
150-20, Gongse-ro
Giheung-gu, Yongin-si
Gyeonggi-do / KR
 [2014/43]
Representative(s)Mounteney, Simon James
Marks & Clerk LLP
15 Fetter Lane
London EC4A 1BW / GB
[N/P]
Former [2014/43]Mounteney, Simon James
Marks & Clerk LLP
90 Long Acre
London
WC2E 9RA / GB
Application number, filing date13199140.820.12.2013
[2014/43]
Priority number, dateKR2013004375419.04.2013         Original published format: KR 20130043754
[2014/43]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP2793295
Date:22.10.2014
Language:EN
[2014/43]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP2793295
Date:03.12.2014
Language:EN
[2014/49]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP31.10.2014
ClassificationInternational:H01M2/26, H01M2/30, H01M2/34, H01M10/04, // H01M10/058
[2014/43]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2015/28]
Former [2014/43]AL,  AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  HR,  HU,  IE,  IS,  IT,  LI,  LT,  LU,  LV,  MC,  MK,  MT,  NL,  NO,  PL,  PT,  RO,  RS,  SE,  SI,  SK,  SM,  TR 
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
TitleGerman:Wiederaufladbare Batterie[2014/43]
English:Rechargeable battery[2014/43]
French:Batterie rechargeable[2014/43]
Examination procedure27.05.2015Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
27.05.2015Examination requested  [2015/28]
01.07.2017Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2017/49]
27.07.2017Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time  [2017/49]
Fees paidRenewal fee
10.12.2015Renewal fee patent year 03
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
31.12.201604   M06   Not yet paid
Documents cited:Search[XAY]EP2495785  (SB LIMOTIVE CO LTD [KR]) [X] 1 * abstract * * paragraphs [0036] - [0074] * * claims 1-15 * * figures 2-4 * [A] 4,6,7 [Y] 8-11,15;
 [XAY]CN201994346U  (DONGGUAN AMPEREX TECH LTD, et al) [X] 1 * abstract * * the whole document * * figure 1 * * claims 1-7 * [A] 6,7 [Y] 2,3,5;
 [Y]US2005266279  (KIM JUN H [KR]) [Y] 2,3,5 * paragraphs [0008] - [0016] * * figure 1 *;
 [Y]US2011244281  (BYUN SANGWON [KR]) [Y] 8-10 * paragraphs [0030] - [0037] * * figures 3A, 3B, 7, 9 *;
 [X]JP2008186591  (MITSUBISHI HEAVY IND LTD, et al) [X] 1 * abstract * * paragraphs [0006] , [0 22] * * figure 1 *;
 [A]CN201134459Y  (TIANJIN LISHEN BATTERY CO LTD [CN]) [A] 1,6,7 * abstract *;
 [YA]US2012100418  (RAMAKRISHNAN AVINAASH [US], et al) [Y] 11 * abstract * [A] 12-14;
 [YA]JP2012252818  (YAZAKI CORP) [Y] 11 * abstract * [A] 12-14;
 [Y]EP2372808  (SB LIMOTIVE CO LTD [KR]) [Y] 15 * abstract * * paragraphs [0060] - [0066] - [0 73] * * figures 3,5 *