Date | Description | European Patent Bulletin date, issue number |
---|---|---|
03.11.2017 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 06.12.2017 [2017/49] |
26.07.2017 | New entry: Application deemed to be withdrawn: despatch of communication + time limit | |
04.02.2017 | New entry: Additional fee for renewal fee: despatch of communication + time limit | |
14.12.2015 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | |
05.06.2015 | Change - designated states | published on 08.07.2015 [2015/28] |
05.06.2015 | Change - request for examination | published on 08.07.2015 [2015/28] |
02.06.2015 | Amendment by applicant | |
31.10.2014 | Publication of search report | published on 03.12.2014 [2014/49] |
31.10.2014 | Change - classification | published on 03.12.2014 [2014/49] |
31.10.2014 | Change - classification | published on 03.12.2014 [2014/49] |
21.10.2014 | Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin | published on 22.10.2014 [2014/43] |
19.09.2014 | Request for examination filed | published on 22.10.2014 [2014/43] |