Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2886494

EP2886494 - Conveyor device for conveying suspended objects [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  02.02.2018
Database last updated on 17.08.2019
FormerThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  24.02.2017
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  24.11.2016
Most recent event   Tooltip21.06.2019Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): MC
published on 24.07.2019  [2019/30]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Dematic Logistics GmbH
Schelpmilser Weg 14b
33609 Bielefeld / DE
[2017/30]
Former [2015/26]For all designated states
SDI Group Germany Material Handling Solutions GmbH
Schelpmilserweg 14 b
33609 Bielefeld / DE
Inventor(s)01 / OTTO Thomas
Sennehof 13a
33659 Bielefeld / DE
 [2015/26]
Representative(s)Specht, Peter , et al
Loesenbeck - Specht - Dantz
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte
Am Zwinger 2
33602 Bielefeld / DE
[2015/26]
Application number, filing date13199375.023.12.2013
[2015/26]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2886494
Date:24.06.2015
Language:DE
[2015/26]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2886494
Date:29.03.2017
Language:DE
[2017/13]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP26.06.2014
ClassificationInternational:B65G19/02, B65G47/61, B65G9/00
[2015/26]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2016/04]
Former [2015/26]AL,  AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  HR,  HU,  IE,  IS,  IT,  LI,  LT,  LU,  LV,  MC,  MK,  MT,  NL,  NO,  PL,  PT,  RO,  RS,  SE,  SI,  SK,  SM,  TR 
TitleGerman:Fördervorrichtung zur Beförderung von hängenden Gegenständen[2015/26]
English:Conveyor device for conveying suspended objects[2015/26]
French:Dispositif de transport pour le transport d'objets suspendus[2015/26]
Examination procedure18.12.2015Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
18.12.2015Examination requested  [2016/04]
25.11.2016Communication of intention to grant the patent
15.02.2017Fee for grant paid
15.02.2017Fee for publishing/printing paid
15.02.2017Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  25.11.2016
Opposition(s)03.01.2018No opposition filed within time limit [2018/10]
Fees paidRenewal fee
11.12.2015Renewal fee patent year 03
02.01.2017Renewal fee patent year 04
Lapses during opposition  TooltipEE29.03.2017
HR29.03.2017
LT29.03.2017
LV29.03.2017
MC29.03.2017
MT29.03.2017
RO29.03.2017
RS29.03.2017
SI29.03.2017
SK29.03.2017
SM29.03.2017
BG29.06.2017
GR30.06.2017
IS29.07.2017
PT31.07.2017
IE23.12.2017
LU23.12.2017
[2019/30]
Former [2018/45]EE29.03.2017
HR29.03.2017
LT29.03.2017
LV29.03.2017
MT29.03.2017
RO29.03.2017
RS29.03.2017
SI29.03.2017
SK29.03.2017
SM29.03.2017
BG29.06.2017
GR30.06.2017
IS29.07.2017
PT31.07.2017
IE23.12.2017
LU23.12.2017
Former [2018/43]EE29.03.2017
HR29.03.2017
LT29.03.2017
LV29.03.2017
MT29.03.2017
RO29.03.2017
RS29.03.2017
SI29.03.2017
SK29.03.2017
SM29.03.2017
BG29.06.2017
GR30.06.2017
IS29.07.2017
PT31.07.2017
LU23.12.2017
Former [2018/25]EE29.03.2017
HR29.03.2017
LT29.03.2017
LV29.03.2017
RO29.03.2017
RS29.03.2017
SI29.03.2017
SK29.03.2017
SM29.03.2017
BG29.06.2017
GR30.06.2017
IS29.07.2017
PT31.07.2017
Former [2017/51]EE29.03.2017
HR29.03.2017
LT29.03.2017
LV29.03.2017
RO29.03.2017
RS29.03.2017
SK29.03.2017
SM29.03.2017
BG29.06.2017
GR30.06.2017
IS29.07.2017
PT31.07.2017
Former [2017/49]EE29.03.2017
HR29.03.2017
LT29.03.2017
LV29.03.2017
RO29.03.2017
RS29.03.2017
SK29.03.2017
BG29.06.2017
GR30.06.2017
IS29.07.2017
Former [2017/41]HR29.03.2017
LT29.03.2017
LV29.03.2017
RS29.03.2017
BG29.06.2017
GR30.06.2017
Documents cited:Search[Y]EP1531133  (WF LOGISTIK GMBH [DE]) [Y] 1-7,9,10 * column 5, line 43 - column 7, line 11; figure - *;
 [Y]EP1258439  (GAERTNER FRANZ [DE]) [Y] 1-7,9,10 * paragraphs [0032] - [0035]; figure - *;
 [A]EP1690811  (DUERKOPP ADLER AG [DE]) [A] 1 * column 2, line 7 - column 3, line 9; figure - *