Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2818925

EP2818925 - Mask [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusExamination is in progress
Status updated on  28.07.2019
Database last updated on 21.10.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip28.07.2019New entry: Application deemed to be withdrawn: despatch of communication + time limit 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Shanghai Avic Optoelectronics Co. Ltd
3388th Huaning Rd
Minhang District
Shanghai 201108 / CN
For all designated states
Tianma Micro-Electronics Co., Ltd.
7F 64th Building
Jinlong Industrial Zone
Majialong, Nanshan District
Shenzhen Guangdong 518052 / CN
[N/P]
Former [2015/01]For all designated states
Shanghai Avic Optoelectronics Co. Ltd
3388th Huaning Rd
Minhang District
Shanghai 201108 / CN
For all designated states
Tianma Micro-Electronics Co., Ltd.
7F 64th Building
Jinlong Industrial Zone
Majialong, Nanshan District
Shenzen Guangdong 518052 / CN
Inventor(s)01 / Qin, Dandan
3388th huaning Rd, Minhang District
201108 Shanghai / CN
02 / Xia, Zhiqiang
3388th huaning Rd, Minhang District
201108 Shanghai / CN
 [2015/01]
Representative(s)Epping - Hermann - Fischer
Patentanwaltsgesellschaft mbH
Schloßschmidstraße 5
80639 München / DE
[2015/01]
Application number, filing date13199381.823.12.2013
[2015/01]
Priority number, dateCN20131026154027.06.2013         Original published format: CN201310261540
[2015/01]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2818925
Date:31.12.2014
Language:EN
[2015/01]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP27.03.2014
ClassificationInternational:G03F1/54, G02F1/1339
[2015/01]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2015/01]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
TitleGerman:Maske[2015/01]
English:Mask[2015/01]
French:Masque[2015/01]
Examination procedure23.12.2013Examination requested  [2015/01]
20.01.2015Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
15.05.2015Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
15.09.2015Reply to a communication from the examining division
29.07.2019Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  15.05.2015
Fees paidRenewal fee
22.12.2015Renewal fee patent year 03
23.12.2016Renewal fee patent year 04
21.12.2017Renewal fee patent year 05
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
31.12.201806   M06   Not yet paid
Cited inInternational search[XI]JPH11133442  (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD) [X] 1-6,8-10 * abstract * [I] 7
 [XI]JP2012118219  (SEIKO EPSON CORP) [X] 1,10 * figures 1,2,5,7 * [I] 7
 [A]JP2001235756  (SEIKO EPSON CORP) [A] 1-10 * figure 7 *
 [A]EP0731387  (SAMSUNG ELECTRONICS CO LTD [KR]) [A] 1-9 * the whole document *
 [A]US2004009413  (LIZOTTE TODD E [US]) [A] 1-9 * the whole document *