Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2750308

EP2750308 - Determining and indicating the number of reference resources needed for achieving a CQI level [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  24.08.2018
Database last updated on 18.05.2019
FormerThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  15.09.2017
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  08.05.2017
FormerExamination is in progress
Status updated on  02.12.2016
Most recent event   Tooltip23.11.2018Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): CH, LI, SI
published on 26.12.2018  [2018/52]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Industrial Technology Research Institute
No. 195, Sec. 4, Chung Hsing Road
Chutung, Hsinchu 310 / TW
[2014/27]
Inventor(s)01 / Lee, Chien-Min
8F, 88, Sec. 1, Hsin Tai Wu Rd., Xizhi Dist.
New Taipei City 221 / TW
 [2017/42]
Former [2014/27]01 / Lee, Chien-Min
8F, 88, Sec. 1, Hsin Tai Wu Rd., Xizhi Dist.
221 New Taipei City / TW
Representative(s)Becker Kurig Straus
Patentanwälte
Bavariastrasse 7
80336 München / DE
[2014/27]
Application number, filing date13199646.427.12.2013
[2014/27]
Priority number, dateUS201261746570P28.12.2012         Original published format: US 201261746570 P
US20131414057626.12.2013         Original published format: US201314140576
[2014/27]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP2750308
Date:02.07.2014
Language:EN
[2014/27]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP2750308
Date:20.08.2014
Language:EN
[2014/34]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2750308
Date:18.10.2017
Language:EN
[2017/42]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP17.07.2014
ClassificationInternational:H04B17/24, H04L1/00, H04W72/02, H04L5/00, // H04W72/04
[2017/20]
Former International [2014/27]H04B17/00, H04L1/00, H04W72/12, // H04W24/10
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2017/42]
Former [2014/27]AL,  AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  HR,  HU,  IE,  IS,  IT,  LI,  LT,  LU,  LV,  MC,  MK,  MT,  NL,  NO,  PL,  PT,  RO,  RS,  SE,  SI,  SK,  SM,  TR 
TitleGerman:Bestimmung und Anzeige der Anzahl der zur Erreichung eines CQI-Levels benötigten Referenzressourcen[2014/27]
English:Determining and indicating the number of reference resources needed for achieving a CQI level[2014/27]
French:Détermination et indication du nombre de ressources de référence nécessaire pour obtenir un niveau CQI[2014/27]
Examination procedure06.02.2015Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
06.02.2015Examination requested  [2015/12]
19.06.2015Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
30.11.2015Reply to a communication from the examining division
01.08.2016Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
01.12.2016Reply to a communication from the examining division
09.05.2017Communication of intention to grant the patent
05.09.2017Fee for grant paid
05.09.2017Fee for publishing/printing paid
05.09.2017Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Divisional application(s)EP15154452.5  / EP2894805
The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  19.06.2015
Opposition(s)19.07.2018No opposition filed within time limit [2018/39]
Fees paidRenewal fee
10.12.2015Renewal fee patent year 03
13.12.2016Renewal fee patent year 04
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAT18.10.2017
CZ18.10.2017
DK18.10.2017
EE18.10.2017
ES18.10.2017
FI18.10.2017
HR18.10.2017
LT18.10.2017
LV18.10.2017
PL18.10.2017
RO18.10.2017
RS18.10.2017
SE18.10.2017
SI18.10.2017
SK18.10.2017
SM18.10.2017
IE27.12.2017
LU27.12.2017
MT27.12.2017
BE31.12.2017
CH31.12.2017
LI31.12.2017
BG18.01.2018
NO18.01.2018
GR19.01.2018
IS18.02.2018
[2018/52]
Former [2018/50]AT18.10.2017
CZ18.10.2017
DK18.10.2017
EE18.10.2017
ES18.10.2017
FI18.10.2017
HR18.10.2017
LT18.10.2017
LV18.10.2017
PL18.10.2017
RO18.10.2017
RS18.10.2017
SE18.10.2017
SK18.10.2017
SM18.10.2017
IE27.12.2017
LU27.12.2017
MT27.12.2017
BE31.12.2017
BG18.01.2018
NO18.01.2018
GR19.01.2018
IS18.02.2018
Former [2018/45]AT18.10.2017
CZ18.10.2017
DK18.10.2017
EE18.10.2017
ES18.10.2017
FI18.10.2017
HR18.10.2017
LT18.10.2017
LV18.10.2017
PL18.10.2017
RO18.10.2017
RS18.10.2017
SE18.10.2017
SK18.10.2017
SM18.10.2017
IE27.12.2017
LU27.12.2017
MT27.12.2017
BG18.01.2018
NO18.01.2018
GR19.01.2018
IS18.02.2018
Former [2018/43]AT18.10.2017
CZ18.10.2017
DK18.10.2017
EE18.10.2017
ES18.10.2017
FI18.10.2017
HR18.10.2017
LT18.10.2017
LV18.10.2017
PL18.10.2017
RO18.10.2017
RS18.10.2017
SE18.10.2017
SK18.10.2017
SM18.10.2017
LU27.12.2017
MT27.12.2017
BG18.01.2018
NO18.01.2018
GR19.01.2018
IS18.02.2018
Former [2018/40]AT18.10.2017
CZ18.10.2017
DK18.10.2017
EE18.10.2017
ES18.10.2017
FI18.10.2017
HR18.10.2017
LT18.10.2017
LV18.10.2017
PL18.10.2017
RO18.10.2017
RS18.10.2017
SE18.10.2017
SK18.10.2017
SM18.10.2017
BG18.01.2018
NO18.01.2018
GR19.01.2018
IS18.02.2018
Former [2018/37]AT18.10.2017
CZ18.10.2017
DK18.10.2017
EE18.10.2017
ES18.10.2017
FI18.10.2017
HR18.10.2017
LT18.10.2017
LV18.10.2017
PL18.10.2017
RS18.10.2017
SE18.10.2017
SK18.10.2017
SM18.10.2017
BG18.01.2018
NO18.01.2018
GR19.01.2018
IS18.02.2018
Former [2018/35]AT18.10.2017
CZ18.10.2017
DK18.10.2017
EE18.10.2017
ES18.10.2017
FI18.10.2017
HR18.10.2017
LT18.10.2017
LV18.10.2017
RS18.10.2017
SE18.10.2017
SK18.10.2017
BG18.01.2018
NO18.01.2018
GR19.01.2018
IS18.02.2018
Former [2018/24]AT18.10.2017
ES18.10.2017
FI18.10.2017
HR18.10.2017
LT18.10.2017
LV18.10.2017
RS18.10.2017
SE18.10.2017
BG18.01.2018
NO18.01.2018
GR19.01.2018
IS18.02.2018
Former [2018/22]ES18.10.2017
FI18.10.2017
LT18.10.2017
NO18.01.2018
Documents cited:Search[XAI]US2005170782  (RONG ZHIGANG [US], et al) [X] 7 * paragraph [0002] - paragraph [0007] * * paragraph [0029] - paragraph [0037] * [A] 1-6,10-12 [I] 8,13;
 [XAI]EP1770889  (FUJITSU LTD [JP]) [X] 7 * paragraph [0003] - paragraph [0005] * * paragraph [0043] - paragraph [0063] * * paragraph [0070] * [A] 1-6,10-12 [I] 8,9,13;
 [XI]US2012008574  (XIAO GUOJUN [CN], et al) [X] 14 * paragraph [0011] * * paragraph [0037] - paragraph [0039] * * paragraph [0064] - paragraph [0068] * * paragraph [0075] - paragraph [0078] * [I] 15;
 [A]EP2012455  (NEC CORP [JP]) [A] 14,15 * abstract *;
 [XP]WO2013119158  (ERICSSON TELEFON AB L M [SE], et al) [XP] 14,15 * page 5, line 17 - page 6, line 2 * * page 9, line 6 - line 27 * * page 12, line 25 - line 33 * * page 15, line 28 - page 24, line 7 *