Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2768185

EP2768185 - Signalling congestion [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application has been refused
Status updated on  06.02.2015
Database last updated on 22.05.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip06.02.2015Refusal of applicationpublished on 11.03.2015  [2015/11]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
British Telecommunications public limited company
81 Newgate Street
London EC1A 7AJ / GB
[2014/34]
Representative(s)Geffen, Nigel Paul , et al
BT Intellectual Property Department
Ground Floor
BT Faraday Building
1 Knightrider Street
London EC4V 5BT / GB
[N/P]
Former [2014/34]Geffen, Nigel Paul , et al
BT Group Legal
Intellectual Property Department
PP C5A, BT Centre
81 Newgate Street
London EC1A 7AJ / GB
Application number, filing date13250017.413.02.2013
[2014/34]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2768185
Date:20.08.2014
Language:EN
[2014/34]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP23.04.2013
ClassificationInternational:H04L12/66
[2014/34]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2014/34]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
TitleGerman:Überlastsignalisierung[2014/34]
English:Signalling congestion[2014/34]
French:Signalisation de congestion[2014/34]
Examination procedure13.02.2013Examination requested  [2014/34]
06.10.2014Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: Examination on filing A.90(5) [2015/11]
16.10.2014Application refused, date of legal effect [2015/11]
Documents cited:Search[A]US2007230493  (DRAVIDA SUBRAHMANYAM [US], et al) [A] 1-16 * figures 6, 13, 17, 35, 57 * * page 4, paragraph 87 * * page 8, paragraph 121 * * page 11, paragraph 141 * * page 12, paragraphs 153, 159 * * page 18, paragraphs 202, 203 * * page 25, paragraphs 268, 269 * * page 26, paragraph 269 - paragraph 272 *;
 [A]US2010214912  (KHADDAM MAZEN [US]) [A] 1-16 * figures 2, 3 * * page 1, paragraph 11 * * page 2, paragraph 27 * * page 3, paragraphs 30, 37 * * page 4, paragraphs 37, 38, 46 * * page 5, paragraph 48 *;
 [A]US2012170472  (CHEN EDMUND [US], et al) [A] 1-16 * figures 1, 2, 4 * * page 1, paragraph 2 - paragraph 4 * * page 2, paragraph 24 * * page 3, paragraphs 25, 26 *
by applicant   - R.J. GIBBENS; F. P. KELLY, "Resource pricing and the evolution of congestion control", AUTOMATICA, (1999), page 35
    - "Buffer Overflow Asymptotics for a Switch Handling Many Traffic Sources", COSTAS COURCOUBETIS; RICHARD WEBER, Journal of Applied Probability, (1996), vol. 33, pages 886 - 903
    - KUNNIYUR; SRIKANT, "Analysis and Design of an Adaptive Virtual Queue (AVQ) Algorithm for Active Queue Management", PROC. ACM SIGCOMM'01, COMPUTER COMMUNICATION REVIEW, (200110), vol. 31, no. 4