Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2784987

EP2784987 - Access network management [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application has been refused
Status updated on  08.05.2015
Database last updated on 18.05.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip08.05.2015New entry: Additional fee for renewal fee: despatch of communication + time limit 
08.05.2015Refusal of applicationpublished on 10.06.2015  [2015/24]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
British Telecommunications public limited company
81 Newgate Street
London EC1A 7AJ / GB
[2014/40]
Representative(s)Lau, Chi-Fai
BT Intellectual Property Department
Ground Floor
BT Faraday Building
1 Knightrider Street
London EC4V 5BT / GB
[N/P]
Former [2014/40]Lau, Chi-Fai
BT Group Legal
Intellectual Property Department
PP C5A, BT Centre
81 Newgate Street, London
EC1A 7AJ / GB
Application number, filing date13250047.128.03.2013
[2014/40]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2784987
Date:01.10.2014
Language:EN
[2014/40]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP22.08.2013
ClassificationInternational:H04L12/28, H04L12/24, H04M3/42, // H04M11/06
[2014/40]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2014/40]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
TitleGerman:Zugriffsnetzwerkverwaltung[2014/40]
English:Access network management[2014/40]
French:Gestion de réseau d'accès[2014/40]
Examination procedure28.03.2013Examination requested  [2014/40]
19.12.2014Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: Examination on filing A.90(5) [2015/24]
29.12.2014Application refused, date of legal effect [2015/24]
Fees paidPenalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
31.03.201503   M06   Not yet paid
Documents cited:Search[X]EP2023536  (ALCATEL LUCENT [FR]) [X] 1-4 * paragraph [0001] * * paragraph [0006] - paragraph [0007] * * paragraph [0010] - paragraph [0011] * * paragraph [0014] - paragraph [0016] * * paragraph [0018] * * paragraph [0021] - paragraph [0026] * * paragraph [0028] - paragraph [0032] *;
 [A]EP2533436  (UNIV LELAND STANFORD JUNIOR [US]) [A] 1-4 * paragraph [0026] * * paragraph [0041] - paragraph [0043] * * paragraph [0045] - paragraph [0047] * * paragraph [0051] *;
 [A]US7065072  (QUILES WILLIAM [US], et al) [A] 1-4 * paragraph [0025] - paragraph [0026] * * paragraph [0030] - paragraph [0031] * * paragraph [0034] - paragraph [0035] *;
 [A]US6690786  (KOWAL JAMES ALLEN [US], et al) [A] 1-4 * paragraph [0003] * * paragraph [0008] - paragraph [0010] * * paragraph [0027] * * paragraph [0031] * * paragraph [0037] *