Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2785007

EP2785007 - Managing streamed communication [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  22.07.2016
Database last updated on 16.10.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip19.10.2018Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): AL
published on 21.11.2018  [2018/47]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
British Telecommunications public limited company
81 Newgate Street
London EC1A 7AJ / GB
[2014/40]
Inventor(s)01 / Timothy Sean STEVENS
8 Melton Meadow Road
Suffolk, IP12 1SB Woodbridge / GB
02 / Ian Christopher KEGEL
High Banks, 109 Ipswich Road
Suffolk, IP12 4BY Woodbridge / GB
 [2014/40]
Representative(s)Geffen, Nigel Paul
BT Intellectual Property Department
Ground Floor
BT Faraday Building
1 Knightrider Street
London EC4V 5BT / GB
[N/P]
Former [2014/40]Geffen, Nigel Paul
BT Group Legal
Intellectual Property Department
PP C5A, BT Centre
81 Newgate Street
London EC1A 7AJ / GB
Application number, filing date13250048.928.03.2013
[2014/40]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2785007
Date:01.10.2014
Language:EN
[2014/40]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2785007
Date:16.09.2015
Language:EN
[2015/38]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP20.09.2013
ClassificationInternational:H04L29/06, H04L12/54
[2014/40]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2015/38]
Former [2014/40]AL,  AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  HR,  HU,  IE,  IS,  IT,  LI,  LT,  LU,  LV,  MC,  MK,  MT,  NL,  NO,  PL,  PT,  RO,  RS,  SE,  SI,  SK,  SM,  TR 
TitleGerman:Verwaltung von gestreamter Kommunikation[2014/40]
English:Managing streamed communication[2014/40]
French:Gestion de communication transmise en continu[2014/40]
Examination procedure16.10.2014Examination requested  [2014/48]
07.04.2015Communication of intention to grant the patent
03.08.2015Fee for grant paid
03.08.2015Fee for publishing/printing paid
03.08.2015Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  07.04.2015
Opposition(s)17.06.2016No opposition filed within time limit [2016/34]
Fees paidRenewal fee
05.01.2015Renewal fee patent year 03
Lapses during opposition  TooltipHU28.03.2013
AL16.09.2015
AT16.09.2015
BE16.09.2015
BG16.09.2015
CY16.09.2015
CZ16.09.2015
DK16.09.2015
EE16.09.2015
ES16.09.2015
FI16.09.2015
HR16.09.2015
IT16.09.2015
LT16.09.2015
LV16.09.2015
MC16.09.2015
MK16.09.2015
NL16.09.2015
PL16.09.2015
RO16.09.2015
RS16.09.2015
SE16.09.2015
SI16.09.2015
SK16.09.2015
SM16.09.2015
TR16.09.2015
NO16.12.2015
GR17.12.2015
IS16.01.2016
PT18.01.2016
IE28.03.2016
LU28.03.2016
CH31.03.2016
LI31.03.2016
MT31.03.2016
[2018/47]
Former [2018/38]HU28.03.2013
AT16.09.2015
BE16.09.2015
BG16.09.2015
CY16.09.2015
CZ16.09.2015
DK16.09.2015
EE16.09.2015
ES16.09.2015
FI16.09.2015
HR16.09.2015
IT16.09.2015
LT16.09.2015
LV16.09.2015
MC16.09.2015
MK16.09.2015
NL16.09.2015
PL16.09.2015
RO16.09.2015
RS16.09.2015
SE16.09.2015
SI16.09.2015
SK16.09.2015
SM16.09.2015
TR16.09.2015
NO16.12.2015
GR17.12.2015
IS16.01.2016
PT18.01.2016
IE28.03.2016
LU28.03.2016
CH31.03.2016
LI31.03.2016
MT31.03.2016
Former [2018/31]HU28.03.2013
AT16.09.2015
BE16.09.2015
CY16.09.2015
CZ16.09.2015
DK16.09.2015
EE16.09.2015
ES16.09.2015
FI16.09.2015
HR16.09.2015
IT16.09.2015
LT16.09.2015
LV16.09.2015
MC16.09.2015
MK16.09.2015
NL16.09.2015
PL16.09.2015
RO16.09.2015
RS16.09.2015
SE16.09.2015
SI16.09.2015
SK16.09.2015
SM16.09.2015
TR16.09.2015
NO16.12.2015
GR17.12.2015
IS16.01.2016
PT18.01.2016
IE28.03.2016
LU28.03.2016
CH31.03.2016
LI31.03.2016
MT31.03.2016
Former [2018/29]HU28.03.2013
AT16.09.2015
BE16.09.2015
CZ16.09.2015
DK16.09.2015
EE16.09.2015
ES16.09.2015
FI16.09.2015
HR16.09.2015
IT16.09.2015
LT16.09.2015
LV16.09.2015
MC16.09.2015
MK16.09.2015
MT16.09.2015
NL16.09.2015
PL16.09.2015
RO16.09.2015
RS16.09.2015
SE16.09.2015
SI16.09.2015
SK16.09.2015
SM16.09.2015
TR16.09.2015
NO16.12.2015
GR17.12.2015
IS16.01.2016
PT18.01.2016
IE28.03.2016
LU28.03.2016
CH31.03.2016
LI31.03.2016
Former [2018/28]HU28.03.2013
AT16.09.2015
BE16.09.2015
CZ16.09.2015
DK16.09.2015
EE16.09.2015
ES16.09.2015
FI16.09.2015
HR16.09.2015
IT16.09.2015
LT16.09.2015
LV16.09.2015
MC16.09.2015
MK16.09.2015
MT16.09.2015
NL16.09.2015
PL16.09.2015
RO16.09.2015
RS16.09.2015
SE16.09.2015
SI16.09.2015
SK16.09.2015
SM16.09.2015
NO16.12.2015
GR17.12.2015
IS16.01.2016
PT18.01.2016
IE28.03.2016
LU28.03.2016
CH31.03.2016
LI31.03.2016
Former [2017/47]AT16.09.2015
BE16.09.2015
CZ16.09.2015
DK16.09.2015
EE16.09.2015
ES16.09.2015
FI16.09.2015
HR16.09.2015
IT16.09.2015
LT16.09.2015
LV16.09.2015
MC16.09.2015
MT16.09.2015
NL16.09.2015
PL16.09.2015
RO16.09.2015
RS16.09.2015
SE16.09.2015
SI16.09.2015
SK16.09.2015
NO16.12.2015
GR17.12.2015
IS16.01.2016
PT18.01.2016
IE28.03.2016
LU28.03.2016
CH31.03.2016
LI31.03.2016
Former [2017/07]AT16.09.2015
BE16.09.2015
CZ16.09.2015
DK16.09.2015
EE16.09.2015
ES16.09.2015
FI16.09.2015
HR16.09.2015
IT16.09.2015
LT16.09.2015
LV16.09.2015
MC16.09.2015
NL16.09.2015
PL16.09.2015
RO16.09.2015
RS16.09.2015
SE16.09.2015
SI16.09.2015
SK16.09.2015
NO16.12.2015
GR17.12.2015
IS16.01.2016
PT18.01.2016
IE28.03.2016
LU28.03.2016
CH31.03.2016
LI31.03.2016
Former [2017/03]AT16.09.2015
BE16.09.2015
CZ16.09.2015
DK16.09.2015
EE16.09.2015
ES16.09.2015
FI16.09.2015
HR16.09.2015
IT16.09.2015
LT16.09.2015
LV16.09.2015
MC16.09.2015
NL16.09.2015
PL16.09.2015
RO16.09.2015
RS16.09.2015
SE16.09.2015
SI16.09.2015
SK16.09.2015
NO16.12.2015
GR17.12.2015
IS16.01.2016
PT18.01.2016
LU28.03.2016
Former [2016/49]AT16.09.2015
CZ16.09.2015
DK16.09.2015
EE16.09.2015
ES16.09.2015
FI16.09.2015
HR16.09.2015
IT16.09.2015
LT16.09.2015
LV16.09.2015
MC16.09.2015
NL16.09.2015
PL16.09.2015
RO16.09.2015
RS16.09.2015
SE16.09.2015
SI16.09.2015
SK16.09.2015
NO16.12.2015
GR17.12.2015
IS16.01.2016
PT18.01.2016
LU28.03.2016
BE31.03.2016
Former [2016/47]AT16.09.2015
CZ16.09.2015
DK16.09.2015
EE16.09.2015
ES16.09.2015
FI16.09.2015
HR16.09.2015
IT16.09.2015
LT16.09.2015
LV16.09.2015
NL16.09.2015
PL16.09.2015
RO16.09.2015
RS16.09.2015
SE16.09.2015
SK16.09.2015
NO16.12.2015
GR17.12.2015
IS16.01.2016
PT18.01.2016
LU28.03.2016
BE31.03.2016
Former [2016/39]AT16.09.2015
CZ16.09.2015
DK16.09.2015
EE16.09.2015
ES16.09.2015
FI16.09.2015
HR16.09.2015
IT16.09.2015
LT16.09.2015
LV16.09.2015
NL16.09.2015
PL16.09.2015
RO16.09.2015
RS16.09.2015
SE16.09.2015
SK16.09.2015
NO16.12.2015
GR17.12.2015
IS16.01.2016
PT18.01.2016
BE31.03.2016
Former [2016/37]AT16.09.2015
CZ16.09.2015
EE16.09.2015
ES16.09.2015
FI16.09.2015
HR16.09.2015
IT16.09.2015
LT16.09.2015
LV16.09.2015
NL16.09.2015
PL16.09.2015
RO16.09.2015
RS16.09.2015
SE16.09.2015
SK16.09.2015
NO16.12.2015
GR17.12.2015
IS16.01.2016
PT18.01.2016
BE31.03.2016
Former [2016/24]AT16.09.2015
CZ16.09.2015
EE16.09.2015
ES16.09.2015
FI16.09.2015
HR16.09.2015
IT16.09.2015
LT16.09.2015
LV16.09.2015
NL16.09.2015
PL16.09.2015
RO16.09.2015
RS16.09.2015
SE16.09.2015
SK16.09.2015
NO16.12.2015
GR17.12.2015
IS16.01.2016
PT18.01.2016
Former [2016/23]CZ16.09.2015
EE16.09.2015
ES16.09.2015
FI16.09.2015
HR16.09.2015
IT16.09.2015
LT16.09.2015
LV16.09.2015
NL16.09.2015
RO16.09.2015
RS16.09.2015
SE16.09.2015
SK16.09.2015
NO16.12.2015
GR17.12.2015
IS16.01.2016
Former [2016/22]CZ16.09.2015
EE16.09.2015
ES16.09.2015
FI16.09.2015
HR16.09.2015
IT16.09.2015
LT16.09.2015
LV16.09.2015
NL16.09.2015
RS16.09.2015
SE16.09.2015
NO16.12.2015
GR17.12.2015
IS16.01.2016
Former [2016/21]ES16.09.2015
FI16.09.2015
HR16.09.2015
IT16.09.2015
LT16.09.2015
LV16.09.2015
NL16.09.2015
RS16.09.2015
SE16.09.2015
NO16.12.2015
GR17.12.2015
Former [2016/20]ES16.09.2015
FI16.09.2015
HR16.09.2015
LT16.09.2015
LV16.09.2015
NL16.09.2015
RS16.09.2015
SE16.09.2015
NO16.12.2015
GR17.12.2015
Former [2016/14]FI16.09.2015
HR16.09.2015
LT16.09.2015
LV16.09.2015
NL16.09.2015
RS16.09.2015
SE16.09.2015
NO16.12.2015
GR17.12.2015
Former [2016/10]FI16.09.2015
HR16.09.2015
LT16.09.2015
LV16.09.2015
RS16.09.2015
SE16.09.2015
NO16.12.2015
GR17.12.2015
Former [2016/09]FI16.09.2015
LT16.09.2015
LV16.09.2015
NO16.12.2015
GR17.12.2015
Former [2016/08]LT16.09.2015
NO16.12.2015
Former [2016/07]LT16.09.2015
Documents cited:Search[A]EP1777962  (ALCATEL LUCENT [FR]; INTERUNIVERSITAIRE MICROELECTR [BE]; UNIV GENT [B) [A] 1-14 * paragraph [0003] * * paragraph [0007] - paragraph [0008] * * paragraph [0022] - paragraph [0025] *;
 [A]  - TETSUYA KUSUMOTO ET AL, "Strategies towards robust and stable application layer multicast", PACKET VIDEO 2007, IEEE, PI, (20071101), doi:10.1109/PACKET.2007.4397048, ISBN 978-1-4244-0980-8, pages 253 - 262, XP031170621 [A] 1-14 * page 253 - page 257 *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/PACKET.2007.4397048
 [AD]  - XING JIN ET AL, "Serving dynamic groups in application-level multicast", HIGH PERFORMANCE SWITCHING AND ROUTING, 2005. HPSR. 2005 WORKSHOP ON HONG KONG, CHINA 12-14 MAY, 2005, PISCATAWAY, NJ, USA,IEEE, (20050512), doi:10.1109/HPSR.2005.1503269, ISBN 978-0-7803-8924-3, pages 432 - 436, XP010832812 [AD] 1-14 * page 432 - page 434 *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/HPSR.2005.1503269
by applicantUS2008008089
 US7564876
    - JINLIANG FAN; MOSTAFA AMAR, DYNAMIC TOPOLOGY CONFIGURATION IN SERVICE OVERLAY NETWORKS: A STUDY OF RECONFIGURATION POLICIES, URL: http://www.cc.aatech.edu/-ammar/papers/infocom06-JLfan.pdf
    - XING JIN; WAN-CHING WONG; S.-H. GARY CHAN, SERVING DYNAMIC GROUPS IN APPLICATION-LEVEL MULTICAST, URL: www.cse.ust.hk/-qchan/papers/HPSR05 SALM.pdf