Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2816470

EP2816470 - Augmented deployment specification for software compliance [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application has been refused
Status updated on  12.06.2015
Database last updated on 15.07.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip12.06.2015Refusal of applicationpublished on 15.07.2015  [2015/29]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
British Telecommunications public limited company
81 Newgate Street
London EC1A 7AJ / GB
[2014/52]
Representative(s)Roberts, Scott Anthony
BT Intellectual Property Department
Ground Floor
BT Faraday Building
1 Knightrider Street
London EC4V 5BT / GB
[N/P]
Former [2014/52]Roberts, Scott Anthony
BT Legal
Intellectual Property Department
PP: C5A, BT Centre
81 Newgate Street
London EC1A 7AJ / GB
Application number, filing date13250071.119.06.2013
[2014/52]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2816470
Date:24.12.2014
Language:EN
[2014/52]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP17.10.2013
ClassificationInternational:G06F9/44, G06F11/30
[2014/52]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2014/52]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
TitleGerman:Erweiterte Bereitstellungsspezifikation für Software-Compliance[2014/52]
English:Augmented deployment specification for software compliance[2014/52]
French:Spécification de déploiement augmentée pour conformité de logiciels[2014/52]
Examination procedure19.06.2013Examination requested  [2014/52]
11.02.2015Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: Examination on filing A.90(5) [2015/29]
21.02.2015Application refused, date of legal effect [2015/29]
Documents cited:Search[X]US2013132933  (RAJARAM SADAGOPAN [IN], et al) [X] 1-15 * paragraph [0001] - paragraph [0005] * * paragraph [0020] * * paragraph [0038] *;
 [X]US2008222631  (BHATIA RITU [US], et al) [X] 1-15 * paragraph [0001] - paragraph [0050] *;
 [A]EP2568383  (ACCENTURE GLOBAL SERVICES LTD [IE]) [A] 1-15 * paragraph [0001] - paragraph [0006] *
by applicantUS2011321033