Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2789999

EP2789999 - Spectral imaging [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application has been refused
Status updated on  13.03.2015
Database last updated on 16.10.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip13.03.2015Refusal of applicationpublished on 15.04.2015  [2015/16]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
BAE Systems PLC
6 Carlton Gardens
London SW1Y 5AD / GB
[2014/42]
Representative(s)BAE SYSTEMS plc Group IP Department
P.O. Box 87
Warwick House
Farnborough Aerospace Centre
Farnborough
Hampshire GU14 6YU / GB
[2014/42]
Application number, filing date13275088.610.04.2013
[2014/42]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2789999
Date:15.10.2014
Language:EN
[2014/42]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP29.07.2013
ClassificationInternational:G01J3/02, G01J3/28
[2014/42]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2014/42]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
TitleGerman:Spektralbildgebung[2014/42]
English:Spectral imaging[2014/42]
French:Imagerie spectrale[2014/42]
Examination procedure10.04.2013Examination requested  [2014/42]
19.11.2014Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: Examination on filing A.90(5) [2015/16]
29.11.2014Application refused, date of legal effect [2015/16]
Documents cited:Search[XDA]WO2011138606  (BAE SYSTEMS PLC [GB]; LAYCOCK LESLIE CHARLES [GB]; GRIFFITH MICHAEL ST) [XD] 1-3,7-16 * page 19 - page 20; figures 1, 6-10 * [A] 4-6;
 [Y]US2003086091  (HINNRICHS MICHELE [US] ET AL) [Y] 1-3,7-16 * abstract *;
 [A]US6295118  (TAKEUCHI SEIJI [US]) [A] 4-6 * abstract *
 [Y]  - ARENBERG J ET AL, "Architectures for Space Astronomical Telescopes Using Fresnel Optics", 2006 IEEE AEROSPACE CONFERENCE; BIG SKY, MONTANA; MARCH 4 - 11, 2006, IEEE OPERATIONS CENTER, PISCATAWAY, NJ, (20060304), doi:10.1109/AERO.2006.1655891, ISBN 978-0-7803-9545-9, pages 1 - 13, XP010928557 [Y] 1-3,7-16 * figures 4,9 *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/AERO.2006.1655891
 [A]  - VALLEY, REZA DODGE, SCHWIEGERLING ET AL, "Flat liquid crystal diffractive lenses with variable focus and magnification", SPIE, PO BOX 10 BELLINGHAM WA 98227-0010 USA, (20101231), vol. 7786, XP040527301 [A] 4-6 * the whole document *
by applicantWO2011138606