Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2793071

EP2793071 - Alignment of radiation beams for a spectral beam combiner [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application has been refused
Status updated on  27.03.2015
Database last updated on 21.10.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip27.03.2015Refusal of applicationpublished on 29.04.2015  [2015/18]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
BAE Systems PLC
6 Carlton Gardens
London SW1Y 5AD / GB
[2014/43]
Representative(s)BAE SYSTEMS plc Group IP Department
Farnborough Aerospace Centre
Farnborough
Hampshire GU14 6YU / GB
[2014/43]
Application number, filing date13275091.017.04.2013
[2014/43]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2793071
Date:22.10.2014
Language:EN
[2014/43]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP24.09.2013
ClassificationInternational:G02B27/10, G02B6/293
[2014/43]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2014/43]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
TitleGerman:Ausrichtung von Strahlen für einen spektralen Strahlvereiniger[2014/43]
English:Alignment of radiation beams for a spectral beam combiner[2014/43]
French:Alignement de faisceaux de rayonnement pour combinaison spectrale de faisceaux[2014/43]
Examination procedure17.04.2013Examination requested  [2014/43]
26.11.2014Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: Examination on filing A.90(5) [2015/18]
06.12.2014Application refused, date of legal effect [2015/18]
Documents cited:Search[XYI]US6591040  (DEMPEWOLF JOSEPH R [US] ET AL) [X] 1-5,7,8,10 * abstract * * column 6 - column 9 * [Y] 6 [I] 9,11;
 [Y]US6411424  (RAJ KANNAN [US]) [Y] 6 * abstract * * column 2, line 32 - column 3, line 46 *;
 [XYI]  - TSO YEE FAN ET AL, "Laser beam combining for power and brightness scaling", AEROSPACE CONFERENCE PROCEEDINGS, 2000 IEEE MARCH 18-25, 2000, PISCATAWAY, NJ, USA,IEEE, (20000318), vol. 3, ISBN 978-0-7803-5846-1, pages 49 - 54, XP010518673 [X] 1-5,7,8,10 * abstract * * chapter 1*; *chapter 3*; *chapter 4, page 53* [Y] 6 [I] 9,11
 [A]  - ERIK J BOCHOVE, "Theory of Spectral Beam Combining of Fiber Lasers", IEEE JOURNAL OF QUANTUM ELECTRONICS, IEEE SERVICE CENTER, PISCATAWAY, NJ, USA, (20020501), vol. 38, no. 5, ISSN 0018-9197, XP011065173 [A] 1-11 * the whole document *