Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2811256

EP2811256 - Drag reduction system [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application has been refused
Status updated on  15.06.2017
Database last updated on 15.06.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip15.06.2017Refusal of applicationpublished on 07.06.2017  [2017/23]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
BAE Systems PLC
6 Carlton Gardens
London SW1Y 5AD / GB
[2014/50]
Representative(s)BAE SYSTEMS plc Group IP Department
Farnborough Aerospace Centre
Farnborough
Hampshire GU14 6YU / GB
[2014/50]
Application number, filing date13275132.204.06.2013
[2014/50]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2811256
Date:10.12.2014
Language:EN
[2014/50]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP07.11.2013
ClassificationInternational:F42B10/40, F42B10/66
[2014/50]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2014/50]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
TitleGerman:Widerstandsverminderungssystem[2014/50]
English:Drag reduction system[2014/50]
French:Système de réduction de traînée[2014/50]
Examination procedure04.06.2013Examination requested  [2014/50]
17.12.2014Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: Examination on filing A.90(5) [2017/23]
27.12.2014Application refused, date of legal effect [2017/23]
Fees paidPenalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
30.06.201503   M06   Not yet paid
30.06.201604   M06   Not yet paid
Documents cited:Search[IY]US3345948  (SARVIS JOHN W) [I] 1,4-7,9 * column 1, lines 11-30 * * column 1, lines 57-72 * * column 2, lines 5-11 * * column 2, lines 12-27 * * column 2, lines 55-56 * * column 3, lines 7-18 * * column 3, lines 30-35 * * figure 1 * * figure 4 * * figure 5 * [Y] 2,3,8,10,11;
 [Y]FR2674952  (BAUDROUS BERNARD [FR], et al) [Y] 2,3 * abstract * * page 1, lines 7-14 * * page 1, lines 15-20 * * page 1, lines 21-27 * * page 1, lines 28-31 * * page 2, lines 30-35 * * page 3, lines 23-27 * * page 5, lines 4-8 * * page 13, lines 16-19 * * figures 1-5 *;
 [Y]US7624941  (PATEL MEHUL [US], et al) [Y] 8,10,11 * abstract * * column 1, lines 16-26 * * column 1, lines 28-45 * * column 2, lines 23-35 * * column 4, lines 35-45 * * column 6, lines 37-53 * * column 8, lines 3-16 * * figure 2 * * figure 8 *;
 [A]US5353711  (BOTTICELLI RICHARD D [US], et al) [A] 1,11 * abstract * * column 1, lines 10-19 * * column 1, lines 42-49 * * column 1, lines 50-57 * * column 2, lines 3-12 * * column 2, lines 13-17 * * column 2, lines 18-28 * * column 2, lines 40-47 * * column 2, lines 59-66 * * column 3, lines 25-31 * * figure 1 *;
 [A]US3994234  (LITZ CHARLES J) [A] 1,11 * abstract * * column 1, lines 7-13 * * column 1, lines 18-19 * * column 1, lines 34-45 * * column 1, lines 46-52 * * column 2, lines 20-23 * * column 2, lines 36-48 * * figure 1 * * figure 2 * * figure 3 *;
 [A]US4353303  (BELL FRANK H) [A] 1,11 * the whole document *
by applicantUS5886289