Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2810845

EP2810845 - Structure suitable to form part of a floor, a sidewall or a ceiling of a gangway [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  15.02.2019
Database last updated on 07.12.2019
FormerThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  09.03.2018
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  02.11.2017
FormerRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  20.09.2017
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  24.04.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip24.05.2019Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): SI
published on 26.06.2019  [2019/26]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Dellner Couplers AB
Vikavägen 144
791 95 Falun / SE
[2015/45]
Former [2014/50]For all designated states
Ego International B.V.
Weegschaalstraat 3
5632 CW Eindhoven / NL
Inventor(s)01 / Smith, Graham Steven
Prospect, Glascoed
Pontypool NP4 0TZ / GB
 [2014/50]
Representative(s)von Renesse, Dorothea
König-Szynka-Tilmann-von Renesse
Patentanwälte Partnerschaft mbB
Postfach 11 09 46
40509 Düsseldorf / DE
[2014/50]
Application number, filing date13275136.307.06.2013
[2014/50]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2810845
Date:10.12.2014
Language:EN
[2014/50]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2810845
Date:11.04.2018
Language:EN
[2018/15]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP07.03.2014
ClassificationInternational:B61D17/20, B60D5/00, B61D17/22
[2014/50]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2015/30]
Former [2014/50]AL,  AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  HR,  HU,  IE,  IS,  IT,  LI,  LT,  LU,  LV,  MC,  MK,  MT,  NL,  NO,  PL,  PT,  RO,  RS,  SE,  SI,  SK,  SM,  TR 
TitleGerman:Struktur zur Formung eines Teils eines Fußbodens, einer Seitenwand oder einer Decken eines Gangs[2014/50]
English:Structure suitable to form part of a floor, a sidewall or a ceiling of a gangway[2014/50]
French:Structure apte à former une partie d'un plancher, d'une paroi ou d'un plafond d'une passerelle[2014/50]
Examination procedure10.06.2015Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
10.06.2015Examination requested  [2015/30]
25.04.2017Communication of intention to grant the patent
05.09.2017Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO
03.11.2017Communication of intention to grant the patent
28.02.2018Fee for grant paid
28.02.2018Fee for publishing/printing paid
28.02.2018Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Divisional application(s)EP18163595.4  / EP3366542
The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  25.04.2017
Opposition(s)14.01.2019No opposition filed within time limit [2019/12]
Fees paidRenewal fee
29.06.2015Renewal fee patent year 03
29.06.2016Renewal fee patent year 04
29.06.2017Renewal fee patent year 05
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAL11.04.2018
AT11.04.2018
CZ11.04.2018
DK11.04.2018
EE11.04.2018
FI11.04.2018
HR11.04.2018
IT11.04.2018
LT11.04.2018
LV11.04.2018
MC11.04.2018
NL11.04.2018
RO11.04.2018
RS11.04.2018
SI11.04.2018
SK11.04.2018
SM11.04.2018
IE07.06.2018
LU07.06.2018
BE30.06.2018
BG11.07.2018
NO11.07.2018
GR12.07.2018
PT13.08.2018
[2019/26]
Former [2019/24]AL11.04.2018
AT11.04.2018
CZ11.04.2018
DK11.04.2018
EE11.04.2018
FI11.04.2018
HR11.04.2018
IT11.04.2018
LT11.04.2018
LV11.04.2018
MC11.04.2018
NL11.04.2018
RO11.04.2018
RS11.04.2018
SK11.04.2018
SM11.04.2018
IE07.06.2018
LU07.06.2018
BE30.06.2018
BG11.07.2018
NO11.07.2018
GR12.07.2018
PT13.08.2018
Former [2019/19]AL11.04.2018
AT11.04.2018
CZ11.04.2018
DK11.04.2018
EE11.04.2018
FI11.04.2018
HR11.04.2018
IT11.04.2018
LT11.04.2018
LV11.04.2018
MC11.04.2018
NL11.04.2018
RO11.04.2018
RS11.04.2018
SK11.04.2018
SM11.04.2018
IE07.06.2018
LU07.06.2018
BG11.07.2018
NO11.07.2018
GR12.07.2018
PT13.08.2018
Former [2019/17]AL11.04.2018
AT11.04.2018
CZ11.04.2018
DK11.04.2018
EE11.04.2018
FI11.04.2018
HR11.04.2018
IT11.04.2018
LT11.04.2018
LV11.04.2018
MC11.04.2018
NL11.04.2018
RO11.04.2018
RS11.04.2018
SK11.04.2018
SM11.04.2018
LU07.06.2018
BG11.07.2018
NO11.07.2018
GR12.07.2018
PT13.08.2018
Former [2019/15]AL11.04.2018
AT11.04.2018
CZ11.04.2018
DK11.04.2018
EE11.04.2018
FI11.04.2018
HR11.04.2018
IT11.04.2018
LT11.04.2018
LV11.04.2018
MC11.04.2018
NL11.04.2018
RO11.04.2018
RS11.04.2018
SK11.04.2018
SM11.04.2018
BG11.07.2018
NO11.07.2018
GR12.07.2018
PT13.08.2018
Former [2019/11]AL11.04.2018
AT11.04.2018
CZ11.04.2018
DK11.04.2018
EE11.04.2018
FI11.04.2018
HR11.04.2018
IT11.04.2018
LT11.04.2018
LV11.04.2018
NL11.04.2018
RO11.04.2018
RS11.04.2018
SK11.04.2018
SM11.04.2018
BG11.07.2018
NO11.07.2018
GR12.07.2018
PT13.08.2018
Former [2019/10]AL11.04.2018
AT11.04.2018
CZ11.04.2018
DK11.04.2018
EE11.04.2018
FI11.04.2018
HR11.04.2018
LT11.04.2018
LV11.04.2018
NL11.04.2018
RO11.04.2018
RS11.04.2018
SK11.04.2018
BG11.07.2018
NO11.07.2018
GR12.07.2018
PT13.08.2018
Former [2019/09]AL11.04.2018
DK11.04.2018
EE11.04.2018
FI11.04.2018
HR11.04.2018
LT11.04.2018
LV11.04.2018
NL11.04.2018
RS11.04.2018
BG11.07.2018
NO11.07.2018
GR12.07.2018
PT13.08.2018
Former [2019/08]AL11.04.2018
DK11.04.2018
FI11.04.2018
HR11.04.2018
LT11.04.2018
LV11.04.2018
NL11.04.2018
RS11.04.2018
BG11.07.2018
NO11.07.2018
GR12.07.2018
PT13.08.2018
Former [2019/03]AL11.04.2018
FI11.04.2018
HR11.04.2018
LT11.04.2018
LV11.04.2018
NL11.04.2018
RS11.04.2018
BG11.07.2018
NO11.07.2018
GR12.07.2018
PT13.08.2018
Former [2018/52]AL11.04.2018
FI11.04.2018
HR11.04.2018
LT11.04.2018
LV11.04.2018
NL11.04.2018
RS11.04.2018
BG11.07.2018
NO11.07.2018
GR12.07.2018
Former [2018/51]AL11.04.2018
FI11.04.2018
HR11.04.2018
LT11.04.2018
LV11.04.2018
NL11.04.2018
RS11.04.2018
BG11.07.2018
NO11.07.2018
Former [2018/50]AL11.04.2018
FI11.04.2018
HR11.04.2018
LT11.04.2018
NL11.04.2018
BG11.07.2018
NO11.07.2018
Former [2018/47]AL11.04.2018
FI11.04.2018
LT11.04.2018
NL11.04.2018
NO11.07.2018
Former [2018/46]AL11.04.2018
LT11.04.2018
NL11.04.2018
NO11.07.2018
Former [2018/43]NL11.04.2018
Documents cited:Search[XI]EP0208436  (NARITA MFG LTD [JP]) [X] 1-3,6,7,15-19 * the whole document * [I] 8-10,14,20,29;
 [A]DE29500795U  (HUEBNER GUMMI & KUNSTSTOFF [DE]) [A] 1-20 * the whole document *;
 [A]EP2500230  (HUEBNER GMBH [DE]) [A] 1-20 * the whole document *;
 [A]EP0227310  (NARITA MFG LTD [JP], et al) [A] 1-20 * the whole document *;
 [A]EP0625459  (HUEBNER GUMMI & KUNSTSTOFF [DE]) [A] 1-20 * the whole document *;
 [XI]DE202013100563U  (TEUFL MANFRED [AT], et al) [X] 21-25 * the whole document * [I] 29;
 [XI]EP2172383  (FAIVELEY SA [FR]) [X] 26-28 * the whole document * [I] 29;
 [A]FR2823265  (FAIVELEY TRANSPORT [FR]) [A] 1-29 * the whole document *