EP2887579 - Data communications performance monitoring using principal component analysis [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 06.11.2015 Database last updated on 23.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.11.2015 | Refusal of application | published on 09.12.2015 [2015/50] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states BAE Systems PLC 6 Carlton Gardens London SW1Y 5AD / GB | [2015/26] | Representative(s) | BAE SYSTEMS plc Group IP Department Warwick House P.O. Box 87 Farnborough Aerospace Centre Farnborough Hampshire GU14 6YU / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2015/26] | BAE SYSTEMS plc Group IP Department P.O. Box 87 Warwick House Farnborough Aerospace Centre Farnborough Hampshire GU14 6YU / GB | Application number, filing date | 13275328.6 | 19.12.2013 | [2015/26] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2887579 | Date: | 24.06.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/26] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 11.03.2014 | Classification | IPC: | H04L12/24, H04L12/26 | [2015/26] | CPC: |
H04L41/145 (EP);
H04L41/16 (EP);
H04L43/16 (EP);
H04L41/5067 (EP);
H04L43/062 (EP);
H04L43/065 (EP);
H04L43/08 (EP)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2015/26] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Überwachung der Datenkommunikationsleistung mittels einer Hauptkomponentenanalyse | [2015/26] | English: | Data communications performance monitoring using principal component analysis | [2015/26] | French: | Surveillance de la performance de la communication au moyen d'une analyse de composants principaux | [2015/26] | Examination procedure | 19.12.2013 | Examination requested [2015/26] | 14.07.2015 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: Examination on filing A.90(5) [2015/50] | 24.07.2015 | Application refused, date of legal effect [2015/50] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]WO2007002838 (UNIV BOSTON [US], et al) [Y] 1-13 * page 7, line 25 - page 12, line 18; figures 2A-2I *; | [A]US2007088534 (MACARTHUR J W [US], et al) [A] 1-13 * paragraph [0066] - paragraph [0067] *; | [Y]US2010027431 (MORRISON PATRICK SHANE [US], et al) [Y] 1-13 * paragraph [0030] - paragraph [0067] * * figures 1-6 *; | [A]US2011250895 (WOHLERT RANDOLPH [US], et al) [A] 1-13* paragraph [0084] * | by applicant | - TECHNICAL REPORTS, URL: http://www.broadband-forum.org | - I.T. JOLLIFFE, Principal Component Analysis, SPRINGER |