Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2784728

EP2784728 - Community travel booking [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  28.08.2015
Database last updated on 19.10.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip28.08.2015Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 30.09.2015  [2015/40]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Amadeus S.A.S.
485 Route du Pin Montard
Sophia Antipolis
06410 Biot / FR
[2014/40]
Inventor(s)01 / Geraci, Frederic
777 Chemin Plan Sarrain-Pulsatier
006370 Mouans-Sartoux / FR
02 / Laruelle, Frederic
28 Chemin de la Peyregoue
06600 Antibes / FR
 [2014/40]
Representative(s)Samson & Partner Patentanwälte mbB
Widenmayerstrasse 6
80538 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2014/40]Samson & Partner
Widenmayerstrasse 5
80538 München / DE
Application number, filing date13290073.928.03.2013
[2014/40]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2784728
Date:01.10.2014
Language:EN
[2014/40]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP11.06.2013
ClassificationInternational:G06Q10/02
[2014/40]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2014/40]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
TitleGerman:Gemeinschaftsreisebuchung[2014/40]
English:Community travel booking[2014/40]
French:Réservation de voyage communautaire[2014/40]
Examination procedure28.03.2013Examination requested  [2014/40]
02.04.2015Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2015/40]
12.05.2015Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time  [2015/40]
Fees paidPenalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
31.03.201503   M06   Not yet paid
Documents cited:Search[IL]  - EPO, "Mitteilung des Europ�ischen Patentamts vom 1. Oktober 2007 �ber Gesch�ftsmethoden = Notice from the European Patent Office dated 1 October 2007 concerning business methods = Communiqu� de l'Office europ�en des brevets,en date du 1er octobre 2007, concernant les m�thodes dans le domaine des activit�s �conomiques", JOURNAL OFFICIEL DE L'OFFICE EUROPEEN DES BREVETS.OFFICIAL JOURNAL OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT OFFICE.AMTSBLATTT DES EUROPAEISCHEN PATENTAMTS., OEB, MUNCHEN., DE, DE, (20071101), vol. 30, no. 11, ISSN 0170-9291, pages 592 - 593, XP007905525 [I] 1-15 * the whole document * [L] 1-15